Houston v. Dealz Auto Trade et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01518-DAP
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated October 21, 2017 at 12:18 AM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Corveta Houston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Berler +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 566 9400 mikeb@clevelandconsumerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Ronald Frederick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald I. Frederick +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 781 1749 RonF@ClevelandConsumerLaw.com
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Credit Acceptance Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Frederick & Berler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Wertheim +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 566 9400 jimw@clevelandconsumerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Ronald Frederick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Wertheim +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 566 9400 jimw@clevelandconsumerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Candace Burnette +1 601 960 8400 +1 601 960 3520 cburnette@mcglinchey.com
v.
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Acceptance Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Frederick & Berler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Wertheim +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 566 9400 jimw@clevelandconsumerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Candace Burnette +1 601 960 8400 +1 601 960 3520 cburnette@mcglinchey.com
No Logo Dealz Auto Trade, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mac Murray Petersen & Shuster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shaun K. Petersen +1 614 939 9955 +1 614 939 9954 spetersen@mpslawyers.com
No Logo Corveta Houston, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Ronald Frederick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Berler +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 566 9400 mikeb@clevelandconsumerlaw.com
Space Ronald I. Frederick +1 216 502 1055 +1 216 781 1749 RonF@ClevelandConsumerLaw.com
No Logo Dealz Auto Trade, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mac Murray Petersen & Shuster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shaun K. Petersen +1 614 939 9955 +1 614 939 9954 spetersen@mpslawyers.com
Office Cleveland
Filed 7/10/2014
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 371 - Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Cuyahoga
Terminated 10/8/2015
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV-14-827795[Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags Baughman,Cat12,Termed
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Order and notice of Case Dismissal w/prejudice, re [27]. Judge Dan A. Polster (C,KA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Utility Event
    Pursuant to General Order 2015-12 Judge Dan Aaron Polster randomly assigned to case. (K,K)
      LREF
      Blank  Utility Event
      Pursuant to General Order 2015-12 Judge Dan Aaron Polster randomly assigned to case. (K,K)
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Notice
        Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Corveta Houston. (Frederick, Ronald)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Mediation ConferenceCourt Filing
          Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.Mediation Conference held on 5/15/2015; the case settled. Counsel recited the terms of the settlement on the record, and plaintiff and representatives of defendants accepted those terms as recited. Counsel to file a proposed settlement and dismissal entry by 6/15/15. The referral for pretrial supervision and mediation is terminated. (Court Reporter: ECRO D. Hach.)Time: 3.5 hours. (H,D)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 OrderCourt Filing
            Marginal Entry Order rescheduling mediation conference to be held on 5/15/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Note change in time only. (Related doc # [24]). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 4/29/15. (H,D)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
              Order scheduling mediation conference to be held on 5/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Related Doc # [23], [19]). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 3/23/2015. (S,G)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/9/2015. Counsel expressed desire to proceed to substantive mediation. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. Related document(s)[22]. (S,G)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                  Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/10/15. Counsel for defendant Credit Acceptance Corporation must deliver to counsel for plaintiff and counsel for defendant Dealz Auto Trade the current pay off amount of the underlying loan by 2/17/15. Counsel for plaintiff must deliver to counsel for defendants a revised settlement demand by 2/24/15. A telephone status conference is set for 3/9/2015 at 02:30 PM to be held before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel are urged to continue to discuss settlement and reach an agreement if possible by 3/9/15. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 25 minutes. (H,D)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                    Marginal Entry Order: The 2/11/2015 Telephonic Status Conference (Related Doc # [20]) is RESET to 2/10/2015 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Counsel have been provided with the call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 2/9/2015. (S,G)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Notice of Hearing or ConferenceCourt Filing
                      IMPORTANT: Notice of Telephonic Status Conference with counsel only set for 2/11/2015 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Counsel to contact the Court at 216-357-7220 to obtain the call-in information. (S,G)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: 1/29/2015 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                        Marginal Entry Order: The 2/2/2015 mediation is canceled and will be rescheduled at a later date (Related Doc # [18], [17], [16], [15]). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 1/29/2015. (S,G)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                          Marginal Entry Order canceling the 12/12/2014 mediation conference and resetting the mediation conference to be held on 2/2/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Please note change in date only. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 12/9/2014. (S,G) Modified text on 1/20/2015 (S,S).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Notice of Hearing or ConferenceCourt Filing
                            IMPORTANT: Notice of mediation conference to be held on 12/12/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Related document(s)[16], [15]. (H,D)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or SettlementCourt Filing
                              Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Baughman for Mediation. (G,CA)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.Case Management Conference conducted on 11/10/14. The parties have made substantial progress toward settlement. The case management conference is continued pending mediation. The case will be set for mediation before the assigned magistrate judge on December 12, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., subject to referral for mediation from District Judge Wells. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 30 minutes. (H,D)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Position Statement re: CMC Agenda
                                  Amended Position Statement re: Case Management Conference Agenda filed by Dealz Auto Trade. (Petersen, Shaun)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Position Statement re: CMC Agenda
                                    Position Statement re: Case Management Conference Agenda filed by All Defendants. (Petersen, Shaun)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Order on Motion to attend by telephoneCourt Filing
                                      Marginal Entry Order granting joint motion to reschedule case management conference and allow defendant Dealz Auto Trade, Inc.'s counsel to participate by telephone (Related Doc # [11], [10]). The 11/10/2014 Case Management Conference will commence at 2:00 PM at Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Counsel for Dealz Auto Trade, Inc. must contact the Court at 216.357.7220 to obtain the call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 10/21/2014. (S,G)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014, Terminated: 10/21/2014 Motion to attend by telephone
                                        Joint Motion to attend Case Management Conference by telephone and Joint Motion to reschedule Case Management Conference for November 10, 2014 at 2:00 PM filed by Defendant Dealz Auto Trade. (Petersen, Shaun) Modified text 10/21/2014 (K,K).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Case Management Conference Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          Case Management Conference Notice and Order with case management conference to be held on 11/10/2014 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Position statement(s) due on or before 11/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. on 10/6/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Position Statement) (S,G)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Order of ReferralCourt Filing
                                            Order referring case to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for the purpose of setting and conducting a Case Management Conference. Judge Lesley Wells (G,CA)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Answer to Complaint
                                              Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim against Corveta Houston filed by Credit Acceptance Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Retail Installment Contract)(Burnette, Maria)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                              Order [non-document]Granting Defendant Credit Acceptance Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until August 20, 2014 to answer Complaint. (Related Doc. #7) answer due 8/20/2014.. Judge Lesley Wells on 8/11/2014.(C,LS)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014, Terminated: 8/11/2014 Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 20, 2014 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corp.. (Burnette, Maria)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Notice
                                                  Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (i) filed by Dealz Auto Trade. (Petersen, Shaun)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Answer to Complaint
                                                    Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim against Credit Acceptance Corp. (Related Doc # [1]) filed by Dealz Auto Trade. (Petersen, Shaun) Modified text on 7/23/2014 (G,CA).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                      Order [non-document]Granting Defendant Credit Acceptance Corp's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 08/06/2014 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. (Related Doc. #[4]). Judge Lesley Wells on 7/21/2014.(C,LS) Modified on 7/22/2014 (G,CA).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014, Terminated: 7/21/2014 Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                        Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/06/2014 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Credit Acceptance Corp.. (Burnette, Maria)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Credit Acceptance Corp.. (Wertheim, James)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Magistrate Consent Form Issued
                                                            Magistrate Consent Form issued. (C,B)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Notice of Removal
                                                              Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-14-827795 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-6629028. Filed by Credit Acceptance Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet) (Wertheim, James) Modified text on 7/10/2014 (C,B).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
                                                              Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman. (C,B)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 207 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?