Patel et al v. Gonzales et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-06521
District Judge Joan H. Lefkow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anjanaben Patel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kriezelman Burton & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Russell Burton +1 312 332 2550 jburton@krilaw.com
No Logo Vimalkumar Patel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kriezelman Burton & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Russell Burton +1 312 332 2550 jburton@krilaw.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Emilio Gonzales, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Chicago
Filed 11/16/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Cook
Terminated 1/31/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ASHMAN, TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 status hearingCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before Judge Joan H. Lefkow :Status hearing held on 1/31/2008. Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss without prejudice is granted. Case dismissed without prejudice with leave to reinstate by 4/1/2008. If plaintiff does not move to reinstate by 4/1/2008, dismissal will become a dismissal with prejudice without further order of the court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mad, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed
    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anjanaben Patel, Vimalkumar Patel as to Emilio Gonzales on 11/26/2007, answer due 12/16/2007; Michael Chertoff on 12/3/2007, answer due 12/23/2007. (Burton, Justin)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
      MINUTE entry before Judge Joan H. Lefkow :Status hearing set for 1/31/2008 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
        SUMMONS Issued as to Condoleezza Rice, Emilio Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, U.S. Attorney. (gmr, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Attorney Appearance
          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anjanaben Patel, Vimalkumar Patel by Justin Russell Burton. (gmr, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 civil cover sheet
            CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gmr, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed by Anjanaben Patel, Vimalkumar Patel; Filing fee $ 350.(gmr, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 69 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?