Feldman Law Firm LLP, et al v. Organizational Strategies Inc, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-3159

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 11:05 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011725279 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
ECF FILER: Motion to Withdraw Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP without costs. Certificate of Service dated 09/02/2014. (KEF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011725437 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), filed. (TMM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011686856 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
      BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP due on or before 09/02/2014. Appendix due on or before 09/02/2014. (CLW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011681784 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP, received. (KCL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011681780 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (KCL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011681663 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Katharine C. Lester on behalf of Appellant(s) Capstone Associated Services Ltd., Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd., Stewart A. Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP. (KCL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011681660 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Blake Rohrbacher on behalf of Appellant(s) Capstone Associated Services Ltd., Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd., Stewart A. Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP. (BKR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011681593 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. (KEF)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011680851 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (KEF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011680848 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                    ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, filed. (KEF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011680842 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                      ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, filed. (KEF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 003011680839 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                        ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Capstone Associated Services LTD, filed. (KEF)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011680831 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                          ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly E. Farnan, Blake Rohrbacher, Katharine C. Lester on behalf of Appellant(s) Capstone Associated Services Ltd., Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd., Stewart A. Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP. (KEF)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011679775 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Phillip A. Giordano on behalf of Appellee(s) Integration Casualty Corp., Optimal Casualty Corp., Organizational Strategies Inc and Systems Casualty Corp.. (NRL)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011679762 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William M. Kelleher on behalf of Appellee(s) Integration Casualty Corp., Optimal Casualty Corp., Organizational Strategies Inc and Systems Casualty Corp.. (NRL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011679749 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Neil R. Lapinski on behalf of Appellee(s) Nicolette Hendricks, William Hendricks, Integration Casualty Corp., Optimal Casualty Corp., Organizational Strategies Inc and Systems Casualty Corp.. (NRL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011679734 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Nicolette Hendricks, William Hendricks, Integration Casualty Corp, Optimal Casualty, Organizational Strategies Inc and Systems Casualty Corp, filed. (NRL)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011668630 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                    CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Capstone Associated Services LTD, Capstone Associated Services Wyoming LP, Capstone Insurance Management Ltd, Stewart A. Feldman and Feldman Law Firm LLP in District Court No. 1-14-cv-00648. (CLW)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?