Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. PerkinElmer, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00972

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 5:00 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warren Rhoades Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder swarren@wriplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Scott Rhoades srhoades@wriplaw.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warren Rhoades Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder swarren@wriplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Scott Rhoades srhoades@wriplaw.com
v.
No Logo Perkinelmer, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy Allen +1 512 236 2090 +1 512 391 2102 stacyallen@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2014 Audra G Welter +1 713 752 4284 awelter@jw.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of PR 4-1 (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Wayne Hartsell; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Edward E Casto, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) Modified on 3/28/2014 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. OF CHANGE OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv968 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to comply with the deadlines regarding joining additional parties, asserting any counterclaims, and adding any inequitable conduct allegations to pleadings is extended to 11-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to submit their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions is extended to 11-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Motion for Leave to Extend Certain Deadlines) by PerkinElmer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions) by PerkinElmer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welter, Audra) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc. (Notice of Complaince of service of Defendant PerkinElmer, Inc.s Initial Disclosures) (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 2/2/2015. The Hon William Royal Furgeson Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 1/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/11/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc. (Defendants Notice of Agreement Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order) (Welter, Audra) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against PerkinElmer, Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant PerkinElmer, Inc. within five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant PerkinElmer, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Audra Gonzalez Welter on behalf of PerkinElmer, Inc. (Welter, Audra) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PerkinElmer, Inc. (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by PerkinElmer, Inc..(Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to PerkinElmer, Inc. on 1/4/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/25/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to PerkinElmer, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against PerkinElmer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927851.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?