Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. v. Corel Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00968

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 5:44 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 Joshua J. Bennett +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jbennett@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mangrum Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Brett Aaron Mangrum +1 469 401 2659 brett@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warren Rhoades Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder swarren@wriplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Scott Rhoades srhoades@wriplaw.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 Joshua J. Bennett +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jbennett@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mangrum Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Brett Aaron Mangrum +1 469 401 2659 brett@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warren Rhoades Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder swarren@wriplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Scott Rhoades srhoades@wriplaw.com
No Logo Corel, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantey Hanger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph H Duggins +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 rduggins@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph H Duggins +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 rduggins@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Alan Fredricks +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 sfredricks@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Alan Fredricks +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 sfredricks@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Avery Vickers +1 817 877 2849 +1 817 877 2807 pvickers@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Avery Vickers +1 817 877 2849 +1 817 877 2807 pvickers@canteyhanger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A David +1 585 295 4497 +1 585 295 8475 mdavid@hblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A David +1 585 295 4497 +1 585 295 8475 mdavid@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ONE PARK PLACE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
v.
No Logo Corel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantey Hanger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph H Duggins +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 rduggins@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Alan Fredricks +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 sfredricks@canteyhanger.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Avery Vickers +1 817 877 2849 +1 817 877 2807 pvickers@canteyhanger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Daley Cornish +1 315 425 2737 +1 315 425 8585 kcornish@hblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A David +1 585 295 4497 +1 585 295 8475 mdavid@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ONE PARK PLACE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas John Nash +1 315 425 2828 +1 315 703 7364 dnash@hiscockbarclay.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
TERMINATED: 03/28/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 10/21/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
No Logo Jeff Kaplan, Mediator
No Logo Minitab, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 audrey.lo@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com
No Logo Perkinelmer, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Ann Alquist +1 860 275 0137 +1 860 275 0343 EAAlquist@DayPitney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cecilia Zhang Stiber +1 203 977 7300 +1 203 977 7301 cstiber@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew C Acosta +1 214 953 5806 +1 214 661 6607 macosta@jw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy Allen +1 512 236 2090 +1 512 391 2102 stacyallen@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2014 Audra G Welter +1 713 752 4284 awelter@jw.com
Sony Creative Software Inc. Sony Creative Software Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com
PRO HAC VICE Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE FAHD KHALID MAJIDUDDIN +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 fmajiduddin@lernerdavid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo RICHARD D. EGAN, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by O'KEEFE, EGAN, PETERMAN & ENDERS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D Egan +1 512 347 1611 +1 512 347 1615 regan@oepelaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Patent
  Entries (242) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that the parties shall submit all documents necessary for the closing of this case on or before 3-23-2016. The Court has set a Settlement Conference for 3-24-2016 at 4:00 p.m., if closing documents are not filed. Lead Counsel for all parties will be required to appear at the Settlement Conference, if held. Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2016 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/23/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2015 re 153 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Court Reporter L Hardwick.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 154 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel with Emergency Briefing filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/7/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2015 re 134 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Eight Subpoenas with Memorandum in Support and 126 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 121 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edgar Leon Carter; James Robert Arnett, II and Joshua James Bennett terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 117 Motion for leave to extend mediation date deadline up to and including April 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/3/2015. (sm, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the claim constructions for the patent-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/15/14. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 102 Emergency MOTION to Stay OPPOSED filed by PerkinElmer, Inc. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant's Emergency Motion within two days from the date of this Order. There SHALL be no reply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re 39 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, NOTICE REGARDING REQUESTED TIME FOR MARKMAN HEARING (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell for purposes of claim construction only. The undersigned will continue to oversee all other matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua James Bennett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US 7,024,696, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary, # 3 Exhibit 3 - PerkinElmer Extrinsic Evidence, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Websters Encyclopedic Unabridged Dictionary Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 5 - PerkinElmer Defendant_s Preliminary Constructions, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Uniloc PR 4-2 Preliminary Constructions, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Uniloc R 4-2 Construction)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Loveless, Ryan) Modified on 7/18/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Sony Creative Software Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Minitab, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc. Defendant PerkinElmer, Inc.'s Technical Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Arnett, II on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Arnett, James) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Carter, Edgar) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by PerkinElmer, Inc. pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Cecilia Zhang Stiber on behalf of PerkinElmer, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4665285. (Stiber, Cecilia) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth A Alquist on behalf of PerkinElmer, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4665231. (Alquist, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 82 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Audra Gonzalez Welter hereby withdrawn as counsel for PerkinElmer. Stacy Allen will remain as lead counsel for PerkinElmer in the above-styled case. The Clerk of the Court shall remove Audra Gonzalez Welter from the list of persons authorized to receive electronic notices in the above-styled case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Audra Gonzalez Welter as Attorney for Record for Defendants PerkinElmer by PerkinElmer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by PerkinElmer, Inc. pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of PR 4-1 (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Wayne Hartsell; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Edward E Casto, Jr terminated as counsel for Uniloc Parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Minitab, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Minitab, Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 73 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Corel Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees and costs of court to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Corel Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 71 Motion to Stay. All deadlines specific to Corel Inc. for Plaintiffs Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc. and Defendant Corel Inc. are stayed up to and including 1-29-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines as to Corel Inc. by Corel Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc. ('696) Notice of Change of Lead Counsel from Audra Welter to Stacy Allen (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 68 Motion to Stay. All deadlines specific to Corel Inc. in the above-captioned action are hereby STAYED to 1-14-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines as to Corel Inc. by Corel Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for Corel Inc. to disclose e-mail custodians and to comply with the disclosures required by the Court's Discovery Order are hereby extended to 12-13-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines by Corel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for Corel Inc. to disclose e-mail custodians and to comply with the disclosures required by the Court's Discovery Order are hereby extended to 12-06-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines by Corel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 62 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Sony Creative Software Inc. are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Plaintiffs and Defendant Sony Creative Software Inc. shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Sony Creative Software Inc. by Sony Creative Software Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Minitab, Inc. of Compliance of Identification of Email Custodians (Lo, Audrey) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Minitab, Inc. Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Corel Inc. of Compliance Regarding Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Sony Creative Software Inc. (Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by PerkinElmer, Inc. (Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-3. Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4. Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions) (Allen, Stacy) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines for Defendant Corel Inc. and Plaintiffs to exchange e-mail custodians and for Corel Inc. to comply with the Additional Disclosures required the Court's Discovery Order are hereby extended to 11-22-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/30/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Certain Discovery Deadlines by Corel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv968 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to comply with the deadlines regarding joining additional parties, asserting any counterclaims, and adding any inequitable conduct allegations to pleadings is extended to 11-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to submit their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4Invalidity Contentions is now 11-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Extend Certain Deadlines by Corel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions by Corel Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael A David on behalf of Corel Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4346771. (David, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Corel Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Proposed Discovery Order (Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 2/2/2015. The Hon William Royal Furgeson, Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 1/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/11/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Corel Inc. Corel's Notice of Agreement Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Corel's Proposed Protective Order)(Vickers, Philip) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Eric M Albritton as Counsel of Record by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 27 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Amended Counterclaims of Defendant Corel, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Corel Inc.'s ANSWER to 25 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Corel Inc..(Fredricks, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Corel Inc., filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to File Amended Complaint as it Pertains to Defendant Corel Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant Corel, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Avery Vickers on behalf of Corel Inc. (Vickers, Philip) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ralph H Duggins on behalf of Corel Inc. (Duggins, Ralph) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corel Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Corel Corporation for Corel Inc., Corel Inc.. (Fredricks, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Corel Inc..(Fredricks, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn D Cornish on behalf of Corel Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4012994. (Cornish, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas J Nash on behalf of Corel Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4012437. (Nash, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Corel Inc. on 1/4/2013, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Corel Inc..( Fredricks, Scott) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Corel Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Corel Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927638.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024, 696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?