Zazzali v. Swenson et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00086
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2018 at 7:34 PM EDT (6.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Trustee James R Zazzali, Plaintiff

Represented by Duke Scanlan & Hall, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keely E Duke +1 208 342 3310 +1 208 342 3299 ked@dukescanlan.com
Space Kevin Alan Griffiths +1 208 342 3310 +1 208 342 3299 kag@dukescanlan.com

Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B. Conlan +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 596 0545 mconlan@gibbonslaw.com
Space Samuel I Portnoy sportnoy@gibbonslaw.com
Space Michael F. Quinn +1 973 596 4707 +1 973 639 6290 mquinn@gibbonslaw.com
Space Brett Steven Theisen +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 639 6496 btheisen@gibbonslaw.com
Space CHRISTOPHER T. WALSH +1 973 596 4500 cwalsh@gibbonslaw.com
v.
No Logo ABC Entities 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Arizona Department Of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Cygan +1 602 542 8391 kim.cygan@azag.gov
Space Valerie Love Marciano +1 602 542 8325 +1 602 542 4385 Valerie.Marciano@azag.gov
No Logo California Franchise Tax Board, Defendant

Represented by Office of the California Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd M Bailey +1 916 845 6340 +1 916 845 3648 Todd.Bailey@ftb.ca.gov
No Logo California State and Consumer Services Agency, Defendant
No Logo Charles Hassard, Defendant

Represented by Stewart Taylor & Morris PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte N Stewart +1 208 345 3333 +1 208 345 4461 stewart@stm-law.com
Space Craig G. Taylor +1 208 345 3333 +1 208 345 4461 cgtaylor@stm-law.com
No Logo Colorado Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James B Holden +1 720 508 6340 james.holden@state.co.us
No Logo Douglas L. Swenson, Defendant

Represented by CALFO HARRIGAN LEYH & EAKES, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo J Calfo +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoharrigan.com
Space Shane P. Cramer +1 206 623 1700 shanec@calfoharrigan.com
Space Patricia A Eakes +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 pattye@calfoharrigan.com
Space Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 andreao@calfoharrigan.com

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kira Dale Pfisterer +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 kdp@hepworthlaw.com
No Logo Farrell Bennett, Defendant

Represented by Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacy J. McNeill +1 801 438 2000 +1 801 438 2050 smcneill@btjd.com
No Logo Gary Bringhurst, Defendant

Represented by barnumlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall S Barnum +1 208 336 3600 +1 208 342 3077 randall@barnumlaw.com

Represented by McKenzie Law Offices, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis David McKenzie +1 208 344 4379 +1 208 331 2150 cdm@mckenzielawoffices.com
No Logo Georgia Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey Seidle Eshman +1 404 651 9457 aseidle@law.ga.gov

Represented by Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Robert Brown +1 208 334 7534 george.brown@tax.idaho.gov

Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Joy Leigh +1 404 463 6425 +1 404 657 3239 rleigh@law.ga.gov
No Logo Idaho State Tax Commission, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D Nicholas +1 208 334 2400 +1 208 334 2400 brian.nicholas@finance.idaho.gov
No Logo Illinois Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Indiana Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Iowa Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Direct: 515-281-5341

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Edward Waters +1 515 281 6427 +1 515 281 0763 john.waters@iowa.gov
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo John M. Mayeron, Defendant
No Logo Kansas Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Kansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall J Wharton +1 785 296 2381 randall.wharton@kdor.ks.gov
No Logo Louisiana Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Maine Revenue Services, Defendant

Represented by State of Maine Legislature

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS A. KNOWLTON +1 207 626 8832 thomas.a.knowlton@maine.gov
Space PAMELA W. WAITE pam.waite@maine.gov
No Logo Michigan Department of Treasury, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather L Donald +1 313 456 0140 donaldh@michigan.gov
No Logo Minnesota Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Missouri Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A Ginther +1 573 751 5531 +1 573 751 7232 id@dor.mo.gov
No Logo Nebraska Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Nebraska Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M Woodruff +1 402 471 5923 jim.woodruff@nebraska.gov
No Logo New Jersey Division Of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo New Mexico Tax & Revenue Department, Defendant

Represented by Office of the New Mexico Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C Jacobsen +1 505 222 9085 +1 505 222 9086 jjacobsen@nmag.gov
No Logo North Carolina Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Dalton Lennon +1 919 716 6550 dlennon@ncdoj.gov
No Logo Ohio Department of Taxation, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Ohio Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donn D Rosenblum +1 614 728 7865 +1 614 752 9070 donn.rosenblum@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Oregon Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn G. Wade +1 503 947 4400 +1 503 373 7067 carolyn.g.wade@doj.state.or.us
No Logo South Carolina Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by South Carolina Department of Revenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tasha B Thompson +1 803 898 5111 thompst@sctax.org
No Logo State of Wisconsin-Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Var Reeve, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ari David Kunofsky +1 202 353 9187 ari.d.kunofsky@usdoj.gov
No Logo Utah State Tax Commission, Defendant

Represented by State of Utah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W Lewis +1 801 366 0371 slewis@utah.gov
No Logo Virginia Department of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo Wisconsin Department of Revenue, Defendant

Represented by State of Wisconsin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F Mark Bromley +1 608 264 6201 +1 608 267 2223 bromleyfm@doj.state.wi.us
Other Parties
No Logo Dbsi, Inc., In Re
Officer/Director, Gigoptix, Inc.
Officer/Director, Iterra Communications, LLC
Officer/Director, Stellar Technologies, LLC
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (219) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Amended Document (Not Motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Take Deposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Response (Generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Show Cause
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Redacted Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Memorandum/Brief (generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/9/2016, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Response (Generic)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Supplement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 144 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James D Newbold for Illinois Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Entry of Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss, without prejudice, claims against Defendants Thomas Var Reeve and Charles Hassard. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Because this case is currently stayed, no default should have been entered, and the Court hereby STRIKES the entry of default. Defendant Douglas L. Swenson will have 21 days from the date on which the stay is lifted to advise the Court in writing in what manner he will be represented pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6(c)(1). If Defendant fails to appear in the action, either in person or through a newly appointed attorney within such 21 day period, Plaintiff may then move for entry of default. Having stricken the entry of default, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment (Dkt. No. 128 ) without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Entry of Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Valerie Love Marciano for Arizona Department of Revenue added. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00086-MJP, 1:12-cv-00224-MJP, 1:12-cv-00284-MJP, 1:13-cv-00350-MJP(Marciano, Valerie)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 123 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Valerie Love Marciano for Arizona Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Calfo Harrigan Leyh & Eakes LLP's and Hepworth, Janis & Kluksdal's Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6, re 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrea D Ostrovsky; Kira Dale Pfisterer; Angelo J Calfo and Patricia A Eakes terminated. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 non-opposition filed by James R Zazzali. Replies due by 8/4/2014.(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by James R Zazzali re 117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 non-opposition (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo re 117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 filed by Douglas L. Swenson . (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 Angelo J Calfo appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STAY- a stay of this matter is EXTENDED until ten days after the resolution of the United States' interlocutory appeal in the matter of Zazzali v. United States, no. 13-cv-497-S-MJP. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 113 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephen W Lewis for Utah State Tax Commission. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Douglas L. Swenson Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Cramer, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen W. Lewis. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1157274.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 111 Notice (Other) filed by James R Zazzali Plaintiff's Response to the "Notices" Filed by Defendant Douglas Swenson Seeking a Continuing Stay of Proceedings. (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Douglas L. Swenson re 108 Order, Re Joint Status Reports in DBSI-Related Cases (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT JOINT (RE: DKT. 108) by James R Zazzali. (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay /Extend Stay Ari David Kunofsky appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 5/12/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, Order Granting Defendant United States of America's Motion for Leave to Appeal, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT Parties shall file a joint status report which is due 10 days following a jury verdict in the criminal case 1:13-cr-91-BLW. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Audrey Seidle Eshman terminated. (Leigh, Robin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Robin J. Leigh. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1132223.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 4/7/2014 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maine Revenue Services re 104 Notice of Substitution (Knowlton, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Pamela W Waite terminated. (Knowlton, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas A Knowlton for Maine Revenue Services. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Knowlton. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1127563.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 3/27/2014 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN M. MAYERON granting 100 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily, Without Prejudice, Defendant John M. Mayeron Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 1/30/2014 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Audrey Seidle Eshman for Georgia Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Audrey Seidle Eshman. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1098090.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 1/13/2014 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 96 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Steven A Ginther for Missouri Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Steven A. Ginther. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1095259.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ON MOTION denying 42 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The Court DENIES the motion, but vacates the prior scheduling order. Having stayed the case, the Court will issue a revised scheduling order when the stay lifts and after the parties provide a revised joint status report. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE by James R Zazzali Correspondence to Judge Pechman from Jennifer Hradil (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/26/2013 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tucker & Associates, Telephone number 208-345-3704. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed. Redaction Request due 1/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2014.(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 58 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER STAYING CASE This case is stayed until 10 days after a verdict is reached in the criminal case, at which point the parties must provide a joint status report. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J Pechman: In Person Status Conference held on 11/26/2013. Counsel for Plaintiff: Keely Duke, Kevin Griffiths, Mark Conlan. Counsel for Defendants: Angelo Calfo, Craig Taylor, George Brown, Carolyn Wade, Ari Kunofsky. (Court Reporter/ESR Roxanne Patchell.) (jp) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 87 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kimberly Cygan for Arizona Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kimberly Cygan. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1090935.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/26/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/29/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 85 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Randall J Wharton for Kansas Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Randall J. Wharton. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1090298.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/23/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Graff Wade on behalf of Oregon Department of Revenue (Wade, Carolyn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 78 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Pamela W Waite for Maine Revenue Services. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 77 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James B Holden for Colorado Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 76 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Todd M Bailey for California Franchise Tax Board. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 75 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Heather L Donald for Michigan Department of Treasury. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE : A status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, November 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Boise Courtroom #1. The Court will permit telephonic appearance for those parties who will not argue any motions or present on the status of the case. Any person wishing to argue must be present in person. Dial in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 2777014, and security code 2222. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Pamela W. Waite. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1088480.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James B. Holden. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1088476.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Todd M. Bailey. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1088471.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Heather L. Donald. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1088466.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Summary Judgment and Motion for Relief Pursuant to FRCP 56(d). re 25 , re 4 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion pursuant to FRCP 56(d) is GRANTED. The United States' motion for summary judgment is STAYED until such time as discovery is opened between all parties to this litigation. Upon that occurrence, the parties are invited to submit a joint timeline for re-filing and re-briefing this motion. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order- Granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Protective Order.. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 66 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Donn D Rosenblum for Ohio Department of Taxation. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 65 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Edward Waters for Iowa Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 64 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney F Mark Bromley for Wisconsin Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 62 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Tasha B Thompson for South Carolina Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 61 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James C Jacobsen for New Mexico Tax & Revenue Department. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 60 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney James M Woodruff for Nebraska Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Donn D. Rosenblum. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086391.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John Edward Waters. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086390.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by F. Mark Bromley. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086380.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - On November 14, 2013, James Zazzali notified the Court of his non-opposition to Defendants' motions to withdraw the reference. 58 . Additionally, Zazzali sought an order stating that the Local Civil Rules for the District of Idaho shall govern this adversary proceeding going forward. Zazzali submitted a proposed order on this issue. The Court therefore construes this request as a motion. If Defendants oppose application of the Idaho Local Civil Rules to this case, they must file any opposition papers (5 pages or less) by Friday, November 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman (sbh).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Tasha B. Thompson. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086376.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James C. Jacobsen. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086368.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by James M. Woodruff. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1086364.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/13/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving 57 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney David D Lennon for North Carolina Department of Revenue. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by James R Zazzali re 53 Status Report, (Duke, Keely) Modified on 11/20/2013 to change into a pending motion per Docket Entry Order dkt 63 (jp).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by David D. Lennon. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1084448.)George Robert Brown appearing for Defendant Idaho State Tax Commission. Responses due by 12/9/2013 (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER (An in person Status Conference set for 11/26/2013 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge Marsha J Pechman.). Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORE INFORMATION re 44 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney George Robert Brown for Idaho State Tax Commission added. Attorney Brian D Nicholas terminated. (Brown, George)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT -Joint by Arizona Department of Revenue, Farrell Bennett, California Franchise Tax Board, California State and Consumer Services Agency, Colorado Department of Revenue, DBSI, Inc., Georgia Department of Revenue, Charles Hassard, Idaho State Tax Commission, Illinois Department of Revenue, Indiana Department of Revenue, Iowa Department of Revenue, John Does 1-50, Kansas Department of Revenue, Louisiana Department of Revenue, Maine Revenue Services, John M. Mayeron, Michigan Department of Treasury, Minnesota Department of Revenue, Missouri Department of Revenue, Nebraska Department of Revenue, New Jersey Division of Taxation, New Mexico Tax & Revenue Department, North Carolina Department of Revenue, Ohio Department of Taxation, Oregon Department of Revenue, South Carolina Department of Revenue, State of Wisconsin-Department of Revenue, Douglas L. Swenson, United States of America, Utah State Tax Commission, Thomas Var Reeve, Virginia Department of Taxation, Wisconsin Department of Revenue, James R Zazzali. (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 45 Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims against Mr. Bringhurst are dismissed. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT, ( Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2013.). Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) Modified on 10/8/2013 to edit the file date to reflect 10/7/13 (jp). (Entered: 10/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by James R Zazzali re 47 Order, Notice of Bankruptcy Court Order Limiting Automatic Stay to Charles Hassard Only (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. The case number shall be 1:13-cv-86-S-MJP. The parties shall use this case number on all future filings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Charles Hassard, John M. Mayeron, Thomas Var Reeve Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses (Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 46 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Charles Hassard. The instant case shall be automatically stayed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362 until the stay is lifted by the Bankruptcy Court or other motion is granted allowing the case to proceed without violating 11 U.S.C. 362. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING Upon the Record by Charles Hassard (Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss (Voluntarily) claims against defendant Gary Bringhurst Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 8/30/2013 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
STIPULATION re (364 in 1:12-cv-00224-EJL-MHW) Order, Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by James R Zazzali, James R. Zazzali, James R. Zazzali. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00224-EJL-MHW, 1:12-cv-00284-EJL-MHW, 1:13-cv-00086-EJL(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,,,, Scheduling Order Supplemental Declaration filed by James R Zazzali.(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,,,, Scheduling Order Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 7/11/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Walsh, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
REPLY re 37 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d) filed by United States of America Surreply Brief filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 112, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
DISREGARD - NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lawrence Boyle on behalf of All Parties Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00224-EJL-MHW, 1:12-cv-00284-EJL-MHW, 1:13-cv-00086-EJL(Boyle, Brian) Modified on 5/9/2013 to reflect disregard per Corrective Entry (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Randall S Barnum on behalf of Gary Bringhurst Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00086-EJL, 1:12-cv-00224-EJL-MHW(Barnum, Randall)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Randall S Barnum on behalf of Gary Bringhurst Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00224-EJL-MHW, 1:13-cv-00086-EJL(Barnum, Randall)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File A Surreply To The Trustees Motion Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d), and for good cause shown: IT IS ORDERED that the United States motion (Dkt. 34) is GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall file a substantially similar surreply to the one attached to its motion within three (3) business days. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dmc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Samuel I Portnoy for James R Zazzali Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Samuel I. Portnoy. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1012321.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 5/28/2013 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 56(d) Ari David Kunofsky appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 5/28/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply, # 2 Exhibit 112, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d) filed by James R Zazzali. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by James R Zazzali. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Conlan, # 2 Exhibit A)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Gary Bringhurst Acknowledging Receipt of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw re 24 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Gary Bringhurst . (McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d) filed by United States of America. Replies due by 4/25/2013.(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Second Declaration of Ari D. Kunofsky, # 2 Exhibit 108, # 3 Exhibit 109, # 4 Exhibit 110, # 5 Exhibit 111)(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Shane P. Cramer re 27 Response to Motion filed by Douglas L. Swenson . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Discovery of Litigation Work Product filed by Douglas L. Swenson. Replies due by 4/22/2013.(Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James R Zazzali. Replies due by 4/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Disputed Facts, # 2 Declaration of Mark Conlan, # 3 Exhibit A-Conlan, # 4 Exhibit B-Conlan, # 5 Exhibit C-Conlan, # 6 Exhibit D-Conlan, # 7 Exhibit E-Conlan, # 8 Exhibit F-Conlan, # 9 Exhibit G-Conlan, # 10 Exhibit H-Conlan, # 11 Exhibit I-Conlan, # 12 Exhibit J-Conlan, # 13 Declaration of Mark McKinlay, # 14 Exhibit A-McKinlay, # 15 Exhibit B-1-McKinlay, # 16 Exhibit B-2-McKinlay, # 17 Exhibit C-McKinlay, # 18 Exhibit D-McKinlay, # 19 Exhibit E-McKinlay, # 20 Exhibit F-McKinlay, # 21 Exhibit G-McKinlay, # 22 Exhibit H-1-McKinlay, # 23 Exhibit H-2-McKinlay)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d) Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 4/15/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Quinn)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Curtis David McKenzie terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 4/5/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B1, # 5 Exhibit B2, # 6 Exhibit C1, # 7 Exhibit C2, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Michael Quinn for James R Zazzali Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware Docket Sheet re 1 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,,,, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet cont., # 2 Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(krb) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Michael Quinn. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-993015.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 4/4/2013 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
Expedited MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Curtis David McKenzie appearing for Defendant Gary Bringhurst. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Barry Conlan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Conlan, Mark)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher Walsh for James R Zazzali Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brett Theisen for James R Zazzali Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Patricia A Eakes for Douglas L. Swenson Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrea D Ostrovsky for Douglas L. Swenson Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Angelo J Calfo for Douglas L. Swenson Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shane P Cramer for Douglas L. Swenson Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Walsh. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-991215.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brett Theisen. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-991200.)Keely E. Duke appearing for Plaintiff James R Zazzali. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Patricia A. Eakes. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-991050.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrea D. Ostrovsky. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-991047.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Angelo J. Calfo. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-991041.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shane P. Cramer. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-990885.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 3/29/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Kira Dale Pfisterer on behalf of Douglas L. Swenson (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment Ari David Kunofsky appearing for Defendant United States of America. Responses due by 3/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Concise Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Ari D. Kunofsky, # 4 Exhibit 101, # 5 Exhibit 102, # 6 Exhibit 103, # 7 Exhibit 104, # 8 Exhibit 105, # 9 Exhibit 106, # 10 Exhibit 107, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Kunofsky, Ari)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Alan Griffiths on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Griffiths, Kevin)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Keely E. Duke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duke, Keely)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
Case transferred in from District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court; Case Number Adversary 10-54649-PJW (Bankruptcy 08-12687-PJW). Certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Complaint, all Amended Complaints, and Answers obtained from PACER. Entire Delaware Adversary docket not placed on District of Idaho docket. Only attorneys admitted to District of Idaho added to Idaho docket. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Cover Letter, # 2 Docket Sheet, # 3 Complaint, # 4 Complaint Exhibits, # 5 First Amended Complaint, # 6 First Amended Complaint Exhibits, # 7 Answer of State of Wisconsin, # 8 Answer of Farrell Bennett, # 9 Second Amended Complaint, # 10 Answer of State of Wisconsin to Second Amended Compaint, # 11 Answer of Farrell Bennett, # 12 Answer of Charles Hassard and John M Mayeron to Second Amended Complaint, # 13 answer of Gary Bringhurst to Second Amended Complaint, # 14 Answer of Douglas L Swenson to Second Amended Complaint, # 15 answer of Thomas Var Reeve to Second Amended Complaint)(cjm)(Confirmation by returning transfer cover letter to Delaware Bankruptcy Court on 2/19/2013 by cjm.) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 490 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?