BIN AMIN v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00923

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2021 at 5:59 PM DT (2.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MOHD FARIK BIN AMIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by DENBEAUX & DENBEAUX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua W. Denbeaux +1 201 664 8855 +1 201 666 8589 jdenbeaux@denbeauxlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan V. Tipograph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark P. Denbeaux +1 973 642 8822 +1 201 666 8589 mdenbeaux@yahoo.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ann Robbins-Segers +1 202 305 8975 kim.a.robbins-segers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONNIE THOMAS, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ann Robbins-Segers +1 202 305 8975 kim.a.robbins-segers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
No Logo JEFFREY HABERSON, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ann Robbins-Segers +1 202 305 8975 kim.a.robbins-segers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Ann Robbins-Segers +1 202 305 8975 kim.a.robbins-segers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Patrick D. Davis terminated. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                        STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed By The Parties by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. Attorney Kim Ann Robbins-Segers terminated. (Robbins-Segers, Kim) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                            STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by the Parties by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                              STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by the Parties by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed By the Parties by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed By the Parties by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS. (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Respondents' Certification Pertaining to the Production of Exculpatory Information by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Classified Filing by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 9/21/2012..... SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10021 filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)re 21 Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) Modified on 9/24/2012 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Respondents Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 10021 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burke Walthall on behalf of All Defendants (Walthall, Timothy) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Vacate the Scheduling Order and Enter a Limited Stay of Proceedings and Joint Motion for Leave to File Such Motion by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Leave to File on 6/14/2012 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Unclassified Factual Return and Motion to Replace the Unclassified Return with a Proposed Public Return by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Errata to their Factual Return Exhibits by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return and Statement of Legal Justification for Detention of Petitioner by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Ann Robbins-Segers on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION To Extend Deadlines In The Scheduling Order by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SHOW CAUSE Returned Unexecuted as to BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II re Order to Show Cause 4 (rdj) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by MOHD FARIK BIN AMIN (Denbeaux, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDERED that plaintiff provide the full name and address of the party identified as defendant(s) on the attached form and file it with the Court by November 10, 2011, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1(e), failure to comply with this Order may cause the dismissal of the case against the defendant(s). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/11/11. (dot ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SHOW CAUSE Returned Unexecuted as to ROBERT M. GATES re Order to Show Cause 4 (td, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK OBAMA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 9, 2011. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Order Regarding the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order, Case Management Order, and Scheduling Order by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DONNIE THOMAS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order, Case Management Order, and Scheduling Order by ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 9/7/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DONNIE THOMAS (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2011. Parties shall Meet and Confer by 9/6/201, move the Court for the entry of an appropriate protective order, case management order, and scheduling order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to furnish a copy of the Petition and a certified copy of this Order to Show Cause to the United States Marshal for the purpose of making service of the same on Respondents. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/16/11. (dot ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on June 22, 2011. (SM) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Beryl A. Howell no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616038923.) filed by MOHD FARIK BIN AMIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?