A.L. v. Jackson Co. School Board
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 14-12715

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 5:04 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107663814 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RETURNED UNFILED: The motion to reinstate appeal received from Attorney Rosemary N. Palmer for Appellants A.L. and P.L.B. and Party Rosemary N. Palmer is returned unfiled because the promised corrected brief has not been submitted.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107643199 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for extension to file corrected appellant brief [7265340-2] received from Attorney Rosemary N. Palmer for Appellants A.L. and P.L.B. and Party Rosemary N. Palmer is returned unfiled because the appeal is closed.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107618858 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE to Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellants A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer in 14-12715 [7249467-2], Motion filed by Appellants A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer in 14-12715 [7249467-3] filed by Attorney Bob Lynn Harris for Appellee Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Bob Harris)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107618024 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Corrected Motion to reinstate appeal [7249467-2], Motion [7249467-3] filed by Appellants A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer. (ECF: Rosemary Palmer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107615727 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ***Returned unfiled***MOTION to reinstate appeal, Accommodations for Appellant Counsels' Disability filed by A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [7249467-1]--[Edited 09/23/2014 by JC] (ECF: Rosemary Palmer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107594271 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants have failed to file a brief within the time fixed by the rules
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107580288 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Harry Matthew Fuqua for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Harry Fuqua)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107579292 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Summer Denay Brown for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Summer Brown)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107579280 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bob Lynn Harris for Appellee Jackson County School Board. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Bob Harris)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107579273 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bob Lynn Harris for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Bob Harris)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107557291 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rosemary N. Palmer for Appellants A.L. and P.L.B. and Party Rosemary N. Palmer. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Rosemary Palmer)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107531197 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer on 06/18/2014. Fee Status: IFP Granted (DE # 7) . No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants' brief is due on or before 07/28/2014. The appendix is due on or before 08/04/2014
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107594271 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                          ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants have failed to file a brief within the time fixed by the rules
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107580288 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Harry Matthew Fuqua for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Harry Fuqua)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107579292 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Summer Denay Brown for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Summer Brown)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107579280 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Bob Lynn Harris for Appellee Jackson County School Board. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Bob Harris)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107579273 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bob Lynn Harris for Jackson County School Board. (ECF: Bob Harris)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107557291 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rosemary N. Palmer for Appellants A.L. and P.L.B. and Party Rosemary N. Palmer. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Rosemary Palmer)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01107531197 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                      CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants A.L., P.L.B. and Rosemary N. Palmer on 06/18/2014. Fee Status: IFP Granted (DE # 7) . No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants' brief is due on or before 07/28/2014. The appendix is due on or before 08/04/2014
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?