GHANI v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00904

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 6:05 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ABDUL GHANI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TAMI LYN AZORSKY +1 202 496 7573 +1 202 496 7756 tazorsky@mckennalong.com
Space Stephanie L. Ellis +1 202 496 7172 sellis@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan B. Hoffman +1 202 496 7500 mbhoffman@mckennalong.com
Space Jason M. Silverman +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 jmsilverman@mckennalong.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Mark Barish +1 202 305 8970 daniel.barish@usdoj.gov
Space R. H. Bowles +1 202 616 0791 richard.h.bowles2@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Trish Maskew +1 202 305 7658 trish.maskew@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan S. Needle +1 202 305 0037 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.needle@usdoj.gov
Space Gary J. Newkirk +1 202 566 2736 gary.newkirk@usdoj.gov
Space David B. Shapiro +1 202 305 7671 david.b.shapiro@usdoj.gov
Space Keith Simmons +1 202 305 9203 keith.simmons2@usdoj.gov
Space Sherry Denise Soanes +1 202 532 4108 +1 202 305 7000 sherry.soanes@usdoj.gov
Space Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
No Logo BRUCE VARGO, Respondent
No Logo DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., Respondent
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Brinker International, Inc. Officer/Director, Brinker International, Inc.
Nacco Industries, Inc. Officer/Director, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Drilling Co /de/
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation
  Entries (122) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Hold in Abeyance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's First Motion in Limine by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE Joint Preliminary Statement by ABDUL GHANI, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Filing First Motion in Limine by ABDUL GHANI (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Filing Second Amended Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Classified Filing by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT : Joint Filing by ABDUL GHANI. (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                STATUS REPORT -- Supplemental Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered from JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                  STATUS REPORT by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                    ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Clarify Regarding Task Force Discovery and, If Necessary, to Vacate the August 30, 2013 Briefing Deadline by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER. Respondents need not disclose to Petitioner's counsel the classified information referenced in 96 their ex parte, in camera filing. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/12/2013. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Needle on behalf of BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF EX PARTE, IN CAMERA FILING by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Report and in the Alternative Motion to Strike Respondents' Expert Report by ABDUL GHANI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration and Exhibits)(Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Supplement to Petitioner's Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of classified filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, JEFFREY HABERSON, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONNIE THOMAS, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, STEVEN BLAISDELL, TOM COPEMAN, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE Lifting Protected Information Designation of Decisions By The Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force Approving Detainees For Transfer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Fried Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Chart Listing Current GTMO Detainees Approved For Transfer)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Classified Filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Petitioner's Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 6/22/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by ROBERT M. GATES, ABDUL GHANI, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO re Order, (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Amended Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Newkirk, Gary) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newkirk, Gary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Newkirk on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Newkirk, Gary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing the Public Factual Return for ISN 934 by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Part 6, # 8 Exhibit Part 7, # 9 Exhibit Part 8)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Ann Wolfe on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Trish Maskew on behalf of All Defendants (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 74 Sealed Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 934. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on June 13, 2011. (zcdw) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SEALED Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 934 filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE Consent Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 934 by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE by ABDUL GHANI re Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed MOU)(Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Ellis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ellis, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by ABDUL GHANI, BARACK H. OBAMA. (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK H. OBAMA. Attorney David B. Shapiro terminated. (Shapiro, David) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Keith Simmons terminated. (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tami Lynn Azorsky on behalf of ABDUL GHANI (Azorsky, Tami) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDUL GHANI. Attorney Megan B. Hoffman terminated. (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to 12 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Petitioner's Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by R. H. Bowles on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA (Bowles, R.) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Signed Memorandum of Understanding by ABDUL GHANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Petitioner's motion for discovery pursuant to section I(E)(2) of Case Management Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/12/2010. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY re 56 Notice (Other) filed by ABDUL GHANI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Petitioners Reply in Support of Petitioners Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Section I(E)(2) of the Case Management Order by ABDUL GHANI (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 43 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Section I(E)(2) of Case Management Order by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) Modified on 8/6/2010 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 43 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Section I(E)(2) of Case Management Order by ABDUL GHANI (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents' Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 43 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Section I(E)(2) of Case Management Order by ABDUL GHANI (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Respondents Opposition to Petitioners Motion for Additional Discovery - Classified Filing by ROBERT M. GATES, ABDUL GHANI, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Shapiro, David) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Shapiro on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Shapiro, David) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Section I(E)(2) of Case Management Order by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by MUHAMMED RAHIM, HAJJI NASSIM, MUSTAFA FARAJ MOHAMMAD, ABDUL GHANI, NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MOHAMMED HASHIM, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ABDUL HAFIZ, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY, ABDURAHMAN LNU, EDRESS LNU, SHARGOWI LNU, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ABU RAWDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Megan B. Hoffman on behalf of ABDUL GHANI (Hoffman, Megan) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED NOTICE filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED NOTICE filed by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK H. OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Signed Acknowledgment by ABDUL GHANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment)(Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment by ABDUL GHANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Keith David Simmons on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO. Attorney Sherry Denise Soanes terminated. (Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return for ISN 934 by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Barish, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Traverse by ABDUL GHANI (Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return for ISN 934 by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Appendix One, # 2 Appendix Two, # 3 Appendix Three, # 4 Appendix Four, # 5 Appendix Five, # 6 Appendix Six)(Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE E. VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPERMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPEMAN, BRUCE VARGO, TOM COPEMAN (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Respondents Certification of Production of Exculpatory Documents by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Unclassified Factual Return by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Barish, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Signed Memorandum of Understanding and Acknowledgment by ABDUL GHANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed MOU and Acknowledgment)(Silverman, Jason) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certification in ISN 934 Pursuant to I.D.1 of the CMO by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return for ISN 934 by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO re (11 in 1:09-cv-00904-RMC) Notice (Other) (Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Respondents' Statement of Legal Justification for Detention of ISN 934 by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Barish on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Barish, Daniel) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SHOW CAUSE Executed as to BRUCE VARGO pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 ; Date of Service of show cause order June 11, 2009. (rdj) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SHOW CAUSE Executed as to Petitioners Custodian (ABDUL GHANI) pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 ; Date of Service of show cause order June 3, 2009. (rdj) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SHOW CAUSE Executed as to ROBERT M. GATES pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 Date of Service of show cause order June 4, 2009. (rdj) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Factual Return for ISN 934 in Response to the Court's Order of May 18, 2009 by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 Date of Service of show cause order May 28, 2009. (rdj) Modified on 6/9/2009 to add service date of Show Cause Order(rdj). (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SHOW CAUSE Executed as to BARACK H. OBAMA pursuant to Order to Show Cause 2 Date of Service of show cause order May 28, 2009. (rdj) Modified on 6/9/2009 to add service date of Show Cause Order(rdj). (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry Denise Soanes on behalf of BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO (Soanes, Sherry) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that within 20 days of service of this Order and the habeas petition, Respondents shall file with the Court and serve on the Petitioner a statement showing why the writ of habeas corpus should not issue. The Clerk of Court is directed to furnish a copy of the petition and a certified copy of this Order to the United States Marshal for the purpose of making service of same on the named Respondents, Petitioner's custodian, and the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/18/09. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616020735.) filed by ABDUL GHANI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?