Yamauchi v. Cotterman et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01378

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 8:59 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jonathan Yamauchi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph V. Neill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Landis Hill +1 805 544 5541 +1 805 595 1020 JLBHill@aol.com
No Logo Grand Bank, Counter-Claimant
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America"
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Ahmed +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 sara.ahmed@bryancave.com
Space Kamao Courtney Shaw +1 310 576 2143 +1 310 576 2200 reboone@bryancave.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elyse Whitney Grant +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 elyse.grant@kyl.com
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Grand Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Invictus PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blair Jackson +1 888 349 8550 +1 801 415 9340 blair@invictuspc.com
No Logo John Cotterman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Trucker | Huss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle S. Lewis +1 415 788 3111 +1 415 421 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by Trucker Huss, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Bradford Huss +1 415 788 3111 +1 415 421 2017 bhuss@truckerhuss.com
No Logo Jonathan Yamauchi, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Grand Bank, Cross-claimant
No Logo John Cotterman, Cross-defendant
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 3/26/15 FURTHER CMC. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
              CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC from 3/10/15 to 3/26/15. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/12/2015 to 3/10/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Settlement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Statement of Recent Decision
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Objection
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing Re: 65 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint reset for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Further Case Management Conference reset for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Brief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Summons Reissued as to Bank of America, Citigroup, Inc, John Cotterman, Grand Bank. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joinder re 33 Reply to Opposition/Response, 34 First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, 49 Reply to Opposition/Response, 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Conditional Joinder in Defendant John Cotterman's Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike and Related Pleadings [Doc. ## 22, 33, 34, 49[ by Citigroup, Inc. (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY (re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byCitigroup, Inc. (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Opposition to Citi Group's Motion to Dismiss filed byJonathan Yamauchi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY (re 34 First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief ) In Support of Motion filed byJohn Cotterman. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jonathan Yamauchi as to Jonathan Yamauchi. Summons for Bank of America (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change CMC and Motion Dates to either September 4th or 11th filed by Jonathan Yamauchi, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change CMC and Motion Dates to either September 4th or 11th, 22 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change CMC and Motion Dates to either September 4th or 11th filed by Jonathan Yamauchi. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jonathan Yamauchi of Non-Availability of Counsel on August 28, 2014 (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 34 First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief ) Opposition to Motion to Strike and Request for Judicial Notice Declaration of Jesse L.B. Hill RJN filed byJonathan Yamauchi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed by John Cotterman, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE, 22 MOTION to Dismiss , 34 First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE filed by John Cotterman. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CMC AND MOTIONS: 22 MOTION to Dismiss, 34 First MOTION to Strike, and 37 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Citigroup (from 7/24/14 and 7/31/14 at 1:30 p.m.) to 7/31/14 at 9:30 a.m. Briefing schedule remains the same as previously set. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 7/31/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup, Inc (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 38 Brief, 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Citigroup's Motion to Dismiss by Citigroup, Inc. (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Defendant Citigroup's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byCitigroup, Inc. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citigroup Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Citigroup, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/9/2014. Replies due by 7/16/2014. (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen finding as moot 29 Motion to Appear by Telephone. CMC and motion to dismiss are set for 7/24/14. Counsel must appear in person. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Defendant John Cotterman (Huss, R.) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Strike Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi, Exhibit Thereto and Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition Brief filed by John Cotterman. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/2/2014. Replies due by 7/9/2014. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss ) In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice filed byJohn Cotterman. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Defendant John Cotterman's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Grand Bank byJohn Cotterman. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE resetting CMC from 7/3/14 to 7/24/14 at 1:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Grand Bank's Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference by Grand Bank. (Jackson, Blair) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Grand Bank. (Jackson, Blair) (Filed on 6/16/2014) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 2 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time for Citigroup, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Citigroup, Inc. (Grant, Elyse) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Request for Judicial Notice, Declaration of Jonathan Yamauchi filed byJonathan Yamauchi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Bank of America, Citigroup, Inc, John Cotterman, Grand Bank. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Order Citibank N.A. served on Bik Ying Ng on May 21, 2014, filed by Jonathan Yamauchi. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jonathan Yamauchi as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to be issued)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 22 MOTION to Dismiss by John Cotterman. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Cotterman. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/11/2014. Replies due by 6/18/2014. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Grand Bank by Plaintiff byJonathan Yamauchi. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Grand Bank ANSWER to Complaint by Jonathan Yamauchi, First CROSSCLAIM for Interpleader against John Cotterman, First COUNTERCLAIM for Interpleader against Jonathan Yamauchi byGrand Bank. (Jackson, Blair) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Blair R Jackson (Jackson, Blair) (Filed on 5/21/2014) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Grand Bank. (Jackson, Blair) (Filed on 5/21/2014) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE - LETTER FROM JUDGE CHEN RE: CONSENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on May 6, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Cotterman.. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 5/5/2014) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jonathan Yamauchi.. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan Yamauchi for John Cotterman and Grand Bank (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by John Cotterman, Jonathan Yamauchi. (Huss, R.) (Filed on 4/18/2014) Modified on 4/21/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Bank of America, Citigroup, Inc, John Cotterman, Grand Bank. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jonathan Yamauchi as to John Cotterman. Summons Returned Unexecuted for Reissue (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  [Proposed] Summons. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 4/12/2014) Modified on 4/14/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to John Cotterman. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons by Jonathan Yamauchi. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against John Cotterman, Bank of America, Citigroup, Inc., Grand Bank. Filed by Jonathan Yamauchi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 3/26/2014) Modified on 3/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET TO COMPLAINT Filed by Jonathan Yamauchi against John Cotterman against Jonathan Yamauchi ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8479667.). Filed byJonathan Yamauchi. (Hill, Jesse) (Filed on 3/25/2014) Modified on 3/26/2014 (ha, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?