First Northern Bank & Trust Co v. IRS
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-3358

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 1:01 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011710196 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James T. Shoemaker on behalf of Appellant(s) First Northern Bank & Trust Co.. (LHA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011694757 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Justin Blewitt, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) The United States of America. (JJB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011693152 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant First Northern Bank & Trust Co, filed. (LHA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011693149 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant First Northern Bank & Trust Co advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Suzanne A. Halko. (LHA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011693146 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant First Northern Bank & Trust Co, filed. (LHA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011693143 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant First Northern Bank & Trust Co, received. (LHA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011693140 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lars H. Anderson on behalf of Appellant(s) First Northern Bank & Trust Company.--[Edited 07/30/2014 by MLR] (LHA)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011688954 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant First Northern Bank & Trust Co in District Court No. 3-13-cv-01446. (MLR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?