Gollin v. Eli Lilly And Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-61810

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 8:07 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Douglas Gollin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane Marger Moore +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 dmargermoore@baumhedlundlaw.com
Space Robert Brent Wisner +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 rbwisner@baumhedlundlaw.com
No Logo Lynn Gollin, Plaintiff
v.
Eli Lilly and Company Eli Lilly and Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Anderson +1 813 202 7100 +1 813 221 8837 sanderson@shb.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
    Courtesy Copy of Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 to Transfer Related Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in the Central District of California (dj) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
      Courtesy Copy of Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion Pursuant to 28 usa 1407 to Transfer Related Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in the Southern District of Indiana (dj) ( Attachment(s) (1) Memorandum in Support) (dj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2015: # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service) (dj). Modified on 7/31/2015 (dj). (Entered: 07/31/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
        Courtesy Copy of Plaintiffs' Second Corrected Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 to Transfer Related Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in the Southern District of Indiana filed Before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In Re: Cymbalta Products Liability Litigation (gp) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 19 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/31/2015. (ar2) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Douglas Gollin, Lynn Gollin. Replies due by 3/26/2015. (Moore, Diane) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Mediator Selection: F. Robert Santos selected.(Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana filed by Eli Lilly And Company. Replies due by 3/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Phyllis A. Jones, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/27/2015. (ar2) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael X. Imbroscio. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94942. (ksa) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            GENERAL ORDER on Discovery Objections and Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 2/26/2015. (ar2)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 1/17/2017 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 1/13/2017 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2016., Discovery due by 9/21/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 6/23/2016., In Limine Motions due by 12/30/2016., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/30/2016), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation & ORDER REFERRING Discovery Motions to United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/26/2015. (ar2)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Eli Lilly And Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - List of Related Cases)(Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Follow this Court's Orders. Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2015. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/23/2015. (ar2)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Change Venue by Douglas Gollin, Lynn Gollin. Responses due by 3/5/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R. Brent Wisner, # 2 Exhibit A to Wisner Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Wisner Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Wisner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Wisner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Wisner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Wisner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Wisner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Wisner Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Wisner Declaration)(Moore, Diane)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/13/2015. (ar2)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Phyllis A. Jones. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 94899. (ksa) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly And Company (Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 01/23/2015. (yar) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Consent to Designation for Robert Brent Wisner. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 6209. (ksa) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eli Lilly And Company. (Anderson, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Eli Lilly And Company. Answer due 1/19/2015. Re: 1 Complaint filed by Lynn Gollin, Douglas Gollin. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/24/2014. (dj)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint by Eli Lilly And Company. Attorney Scott Anderson added to party Eli Lilly And Company(pty:dft). (Anderson, Scott)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                            ORDER DENYING TRANSFER (Dated 12/10/2014) re: MDL 2576. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (gp)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Douglas Gollin, Lynn Gollin. Eli Lilly And Company served on 12/8/2014, answer due 12/30/2014. (Moore, Diane) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Douglas Gollin, Lynn Gollin. Eli Lilly And Company served on 12/9/2014, answer due 12/30/2014. (O'Brien, Kevin) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Courtesy Copy of MOTION Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 to Transfer Related Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in the Central District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service) (gp) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2014. (ar2)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/8/2014 in the amount of $400.00, receipt number FLS000005597 (drz) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Summons Issued as to Eli Lilly And Company. (drz) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: 1 Complaint filed by Lynn Gollin, Douglas Gollin. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (drz) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (drz) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly And Company. Filing fees $400.00, filed by Douglas Gollin, Lynn Gollin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(drz) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?