Roosevelt Bates v. Philip J. Halvorson, Robert R. Venchiarutti et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. SC076324

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roosevelt Bates, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Does 1-25, inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Philip J. Halvorson, Defendant
No Logo Venchiarutti, Robert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert R. Venchiarutti"
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Request For Dismissal
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Minutes
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Minutes
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None Notice Of Ruling
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None Minutes
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Minutes
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Notice of mediation
                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None Statement of Agreement
                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None Amended Notice of Assignment of Mediator
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None Minutes
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None Notice of Assignment of Mediator
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Minutes
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Answer
                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None Answer
                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Addendum
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Notice
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Notice
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None Cover Sheet

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 483 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?