District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Virginia Western District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. v. Bradley
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-00114-MFU-JGW
Magistrate Judge Michael F. Urbanski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated October 15, 2017 at 12:36 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JORDAN, COYNE & SAVITS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia M. Sadler +1 703 246 0900 +1 703 591 3673 v.sadler@jocs-law.com
No Logo Bradley, Penny L., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Penny L. Bradley"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Dean Domonoske +1 540 442 7706 tom@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shelley Cupp Schulte, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Earl Cupp +1 540 432 9988 +1 540 432 9557 cupp@scs-work.com
v.
No Logo Bradley, Penny L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Penny L. Bradley"

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Litigation Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Dean Domonoske +1 540 442 7706 tom@clalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shelley Cupp Schulte, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Earl Cupp +1 540 432 9988 +1 540 432 9557 cupp@scs-work.com
No Logo Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JORDAN, COYNE & SAVITS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia M. Sadler +1 703 246 0900 +1 703 591 3673 v.sadler@jocs-law.com
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley (kld)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015, Terminated: 8/19/2015 USCA Order
    ORDER of USCA as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley (Attachments: # (1) Bill of Costs)(kld)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015, Terminated: 8/19/2015 USCA Judgment
    USCA JUDGMENT as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Judgment)(jat)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015, Terminated: 8/19/2015 USCA Memorandum
      USCA Memorandum Opinion from 4th Circuit re [131] Notice of Appeal, affirming decided on 7/28/2015. (jat)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014, Terminated: 8/19/2015 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
        NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley. USCA Case Number 14-2334. Case Manager: Michael Radday. (jat)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014, Terminated: 8/19/2015 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
          Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re [131] Notice of Appeal, NOTE: The Docketing Statement, Transcript Order Form and CJA-24(s) forms (if you are court appointed counsel) are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24(s) are applicable, complete items 1-14, 18 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript, and file each one separately in this case with the event Appeal Transcript - Proposed CJA 24. The CJA-24 forms will then be processed by the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office. (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 12/08/2014Terminated: 08/19/2015 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley. USCA Case Number 14-2334. Case Manager: Michael Radday. (jat) 134 Filed & Entered: 07/28/2015Terminated: 08/19/2015 USCA Memorandum USCA Memorandum Opinion from 4th Circuit re [131] Notice of Appeal, affirming decided on 7/28/2015. (jat) 135 Filed & Entered: 07/28/2015Terminated: 08/19/2015 USCA Judgment USCA JUDGMENT as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Judgment)(jat) 136 Filed & Entered: 08/19/2015Terminated: 08/19/2015 USCA Order ORDER of USCA as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley (Attachments: # (1) Bill of Costs)(kld) 137 Filed & Entered: 08/19/2015 USCA Mandate MANDATE of USCA as to [131] Notice of Appeal, filed by Penny L. Bradley (kld)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014, Terminated: 8/19/2015 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [128] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Penny L. Bradley. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0423-2132234. (Domonoske, Thomas)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on November 6, 2014 before Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sonia Ferris, Telephone number SoniaF@vawd.uscourts.gov or 540.434.3181 Ext. 7. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015. (sf)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by Gregg Elzey for proceedings held on November 6, 2014 reported by Court Reporter Sonia Ferris, OCR before Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 11/19/2014. (slt)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [55] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [59] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot [71] Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot [76] Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot [79] Motion for Leave to File; denying [81] Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot [97] Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot [109] Motion in Limine; on Motion to Exclude denying as moot [109]; denying as moot [115] Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot [117] Motion in Limine; denying as moot [119] Motion in Limine; denying as moot [121] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/6/14. (kld)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 127 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Docket Annotation
                    Exhibits added to docket entry #77, 84 & 88 - docs not allowed to be filed under seal(kld)
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Sealed Document
                      Sealed Documents provided for in camera review as per order dtd 10/9/14 (Attachments: # (1) confidential material, # (2) confidential material con't)(kld)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2014 re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Penny L. Bradley, [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. as well out all outstanding motions. Court is dismissing with prejudice. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (jat)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: [84] Motion for Leave to File; re: [100] Motion to Seal; finds as moot [96] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Court finds documents are not to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 11/6/14. (kld)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [97] MOTION to Amend/Correct [91] Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/2/2014, Entered: 11/2/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit regarding Summary Judgment Opposition Memorandum (Doc. 88) by Penny L. Bradley.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Wynn's Second Supplemental Interrogatory Response)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                Brief / Memorandum in Support re [119] MOTION in Limine Regarding FRE 1002 . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion in Limine
                                  MOTION in Limine Regarding FRE 1002 by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                    Brief / Memorandum in Support re [117] MOTION in Limine regarding Wynn's knowledge at its deposition . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion in Limine
                                      MOTION in Limine regarding Wynn's knowledge at its deposition by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 116 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment), [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [76] MOTION for Sanctions , [97] MOTION to Amend/Correct [91] Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions , [71] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order, [79] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Not Under Seal, [81] MOTION to Amend/Correct [10] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim : Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Pages Not Under Seal by Penny L. Bradley.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Email with designations, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [76] MOTION for Sanctions . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Wynn's Deposition excerpts, # (2) Exhibit 2- Emails regarding request to reopen deposition)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [81] MOTION to Amend/Correct [10] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- letter from counsel)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [76] MOTION for Sanctions . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Support re [109] MOTION in Limine MOTION to Exclude . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion in Limine
                                                    MOTION in Limine , MOTION to Exclude by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. (Sadler, Virginia) Modified on 11/4/2014 - removed referal to magistrate judge (kld).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 16)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                      ORAL ORDER terminating as moot [96] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion superseded at doc #97 which is before Judge Urbanski as it seeks to amend his previous order. Entered by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 10/27/14. (kld)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2014 re [96] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension to Comply with Court's Order filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., [100] MOTION to Seal filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., [84] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Not Under Seal filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Court Reporter Judy Webb, OCR.) (kld)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [96] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension to Comply with Court's Order, [100] MOTION to Seal , [84] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Not Under Seal : Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2014 11:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Court Reporter Needed.(kld)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                            Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [84] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Not Under Seal . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Certificate of Service
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. Amended (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [81] MOTION to Amend/Correct [10] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Support re [100] MOTION to Seal . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                    MOTION to Seal by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                      Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [79] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Not Under Seal . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/19/2014, Entered: 10/19/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [96] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension to Comply with Court's Order . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/19/2014, Entered: 10/19/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct [91] Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Minute Entry for October 7, 2014)(Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 10/28/2014 - removed referral to magistrate judge (kld).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014, Terminated: 10/27/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension to Comply with Court's Order by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment) . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Bradley deposition, # (2) Exhibit 2- Request to repurchase letter, # (3) Exhibit 3 Bradley Declaration with CAC letter)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [93] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Summary Judgment. Rebuttal briefs due by 10/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 10/16/14. (kld)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014, Terminated: 10/16/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of the Parties' Pending Motions for Summary Judgment by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying [65] Motion to Seal; denying [67] Motion for Protective Order; taking under advisement [71] Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/9/14. (kld)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2014 re [65] MOTION to Seal filed by Penny L. Bradley, [71] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order filed by Penny L. Bradley, [67] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (jat)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                        Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [60] Brief / Memorandum in Support, [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2- Armstrong May 29 Deposition, # (2) Exhibit 3 Armstrong Corporate Deposition, # (3) Exhibit Armstrong Stipulation by Counsel, # (4) Exhibit CAC Corporate Deposition, # (5) Exhibit 6 Wynn's Interrogatories, # (6) Exhibit CAC account letter, # (7) Exhibit 8 Bradley Deposition)(Domonoske, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2014: # (8) ex 1) (kld).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                        Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment), [56] Brief / Memorandum in Support, . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Objections
                                                                                          Objections by Counter Defendant Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. re [85] Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (No Interpreter requested) [54] Objection to Ruling of Magistrate Judge, [76] MOTION for Sanctions , [65] MOTION to Seal , [71] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order, [79] MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Not Under Seal, [67] MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2014 08:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit Not Under Seal by Penny L. Bradley.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Domonoske, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2014: # (2) exhibit) (kld).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [71] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [65] MOTION to Seal . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct [10] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Penny L. Bradley.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Amended Answer and Counterclaim without exhibits)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/2/2014 Court Order for TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Court Oral Order for Transcript (Daily Service) for Motion Hearing held on 9/11/14 (Log Notes - doc #53) reported by Court Reporter FTR before Judge Welsh. Entered by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/2/14. (kld)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Not Under Seal by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 10/6/2014 to remove magistrate referral (kld).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Additional Evidence
                                                                                                          Additional Evidence by Penny L. Bradley - Exhibit A for Memorandum in Support (Doc 77) of Motion for Sanctions (Doc 76) (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                            Brief / Memorandum in Support re [76] MOTION for Sanctions and Exhibit A, Exhibit B through F part of motion re sealing. filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2014: # (1) exhibits B-F) (kld).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                              MOTION for Sanctions by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (No Interpreter requested) [65] MOTION to Seal , [71] MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order, [67] MOTION for Protective Order , [54] Objections to Ruling of Magistrate Judge : Motions Hearing set for 10/7/2014 08:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Notice of Cancellation of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Notice of Cancellation of 11/6/14 Motion Hearing on Objections to Magistrate Judge Ruling (No Interpreter requested). Court WILL still hear Motions for Summary Judgment on 11/6/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER granting [70] Motion for Expedited Hearing on Objections. Entered by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/1/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                      Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [70] Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Objections [Doc. 54] . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Follow Order by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Incomplete Dealer Agreement)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Response re [54] Objections - Opposition to Wynn's Extended Care, Inc's Objection to Ruling of Magistrate Judge filed by Penny L. Bradley. (kld)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014, Terminated: 10/1/2014 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Objections [Doc. 54] by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Email Correspondence)(Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 9/29/2014 to remove referral text. Motion no longer referred. (kld).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                              Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [67] MOTION for Protective Order . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [67] MOTION for Protective Order . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 9/29/2014 - doc missing pages - refiled at doc #69 (kld).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014, Terminated: 10/9/2014 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia) Modified on 10/1/2014 to removal referral text. Motion no longer referred. (kld).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 Notice of Requested Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. re [54] Objections Objections to Ruling by Magistrate to be held on 11/06/2014, at 9:30, at U.S. District Court, Harrisonburg, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014, Terminated: 10/9/2014 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 9/29/2014 to remove removal information. Motion no longer referred. (kld).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment), [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for Thursday 11/6/2014 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (sd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document - Rate Chart as part of Exhibit 3 to [60] Brief / Memorandum in Support re [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (jat)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and modifying in part (court seals until further order of court) [57] Motion to Seal Rate Chart as part of Exhibit 3 re: [60] Exhibit to Brief / Memorandum in Support, [32] Exhibit B to First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 9/18/2014. (jat)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                              Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [58] Brief / Memorandum in Support, [57] MOTION to Seal Document . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                Brief / Memorandum in Support re [59] MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Support re [57] MOTION to Seal Document . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014, Terminated: 9/19/2014 Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                      Brief / Memorandum in Support re [55] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment) . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-Dealer Agreement, # (2) Exhibit 2-DealerKitpt.3, # (3) Exhibit 3-IRResponses, # (4) Exhibit 4-DealerKitpt.4, # (5) Exhibit 5-BradelyDepExcerpts, # (6) Exhibit 6-ArmstrongDepExcerpts, # (7) Exhibit 7-BuyersOrder, # (8) Exhibit 8-RISC, # (9) Exhibit 9-Aug.28Ltr)(Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014, Terminated: 11/6/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial Summary Judgment) by Penny L. Bradley. (Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: granting in part and denying in part [49] Motion for Protective Order; Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2014 re [49] MOTION for Protective Order and for Reconsideration filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. (Court Reporter Karen Dotson, FTR.) (kld)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Objections
                                                                                                                                                            Objections by Counter Defendant Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. re [52] Order on Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing,, (Sadler, Virginia) Modified on 10/1/2014 - to correct filed date (kld).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 FTR Log Notes with CertificateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge James G. Welsh on 9/11/14. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Karen Dotson, FTR (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion (No Interpreter requested) [49] MOTION for Protective Order and for Reconsideration : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Ms. Sadler to set up call, once all parties are on the line, call the court at 540-434-3181 ext. 0.(kld)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [49] MOTION for Protective Order and for Reconsideration . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014, Terminated: 9/12/2014 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order and for Reconsideration by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [45] Motion for Protective Order; terminating as moot [47] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 9/9/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014, Terminated: 9/9/2014 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order Interim by Penny L. Bradley, Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Interim Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [45] MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Different Paragraph 12. filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014, Terminated: 9/9/2014 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part [39] Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part [32] Motion to Compel. Entered by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 8/28/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2014 re [39] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., [32] First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Court Reporter Judy Webb, OCR.) (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [39] MOTION for Protective Order . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [32] First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Wynn's contract with Armstrong)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. re [39] MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014, Terminated: 8/28/2014 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT. (Counterclaim is still pending). Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/21/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (No Interpreter requested) [32] First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses : Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 10:30 AM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Court Reporter Needed.(kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/18/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadline extended to 9/15/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 8/18/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014, Terminated: 8/18/2014 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014, Terminated: 8/28/2014 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Penny L. Bradley.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Interrogatory Responses, # (2) Exhibit B Production of Document Responses)(Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: 6/10/2014 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [10] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc..(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [18] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/23/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/23/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Order for Proceedings held before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski: taking under advisement [18] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2014 re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (jat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion (No Interpreter requested) [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : previously set for 4/3/14 at 4:00 PM: Motion Hearing RESET for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Rule 26(f)Agreed Written Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Counter Defendant Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Pretrial Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Initial Pretrial Conference Call held in chambers on 3/4/2014. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , [19] Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by Penny L. Bradley. (Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: Initial Conference Call set for 3/4/2014 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Plaintiff to set up call, once all parties are on the line, call the court at 540-434-3181 ext. 0.(kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Notice of Requested Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , [19] Brief / Memorandum in Support Motion to Dismiss to be held on 4/3/2014, at 4:00, at U.S. District Court, Harrisonburg, before Judge Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Brief / Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief / Memorandum in Support re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014, Terminated: 5/27/2014 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/1/2014-12/2/2014 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/7/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order Cancelling DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Cancelling Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 2/3/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 In Chambers ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: In Chambers Conference Call held on 2/3/2014. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: In Chambers Conference call set for 2/3/2014 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Order Setting Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2014 10:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Confidential mediation statements due by 2:00 pm on 2/10/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 1/23/14. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Scheduling Letter (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. by Penny L. Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/21/14. (mka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Mediation Hearing set for 2/12/2014 10:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. (kld)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dean Domonoske on behalf of Penny L. Bradley (Domonoske, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: 1/10/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Earl Cupp on behalf of Penny L. Bradley (Cupp, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. waiver sent on 12/16/2013, answer due 2/14/2014.(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tom Domonoske & Tim Cupp on 12/16/2013 by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 1/15/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Sadler, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Penny L. Bradley.(jat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Phoenix American Holding, Inc. for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (jat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT AND PETITION TO ENJOIN ARBITRATION against Penny L. Bradley (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, Receipt No. 0423-1914702), filed by Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. 100 Day Notice due by 3/24/2014, 120 Day Service due by 4/11/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(jat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?