Righetti v. United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-04328

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Michael Righetti, Plaintiff

Represented by Jones Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Aubrey Jones +1 775 853 6440 +1 775 853 6445 caj@cjoneslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly McInerney +1 775 849 3811 +1 775 849 3866 kelly@cjoneslawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Rci, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tal C. Chaiken +1 312 258 5623 +1 312 258 5600 tchaiken@schiffhardin.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula J Morency +1 312 258 5549 +1 312 258 5600 pmorency@schiffhardin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rocky N. Unruh +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 runruh@schiffhardin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com
No Logo Take you on Vacation, LLC, Defendant
No Logo United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT TAKE YOU ON VACATION, LLC re 63 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Michael Righetti, 62 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment by Clerk
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Clerk
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                  CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/25/2015 is continued to 7/1/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Case Management Statement is due by 6/17/2015. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Declination of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment - by the Clerk
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEAt Plaintiff's request, the case management conference currently scheduled for January 21, 2015 is continued to March 25, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. A joint case management statement is due ten court days beforehand. The Court will not entertain further requests for continuance.If Plaintiff intends to amend his complaint, he must do so by March 9, 2015. Any amendment after that will require a showing of good cause. Plaintiff should also expect at the March 25 hearing that the Court will order Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment as to any defendants who have been named in the current complaint but not yet appeared.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/14/2015) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                              CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/15/2014 is CONTINUED to 1/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/7/2015. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/3/2014 is CONTINUED to 10/15/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/1/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Take you on Vacation, LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation. (tnS) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                      THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corp., Take you on Vacation, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Righetti. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2014. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                          JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for: (1) Allowing Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint, (2) Dismissing Defendant RCI, LLC from this Action, Without Prejudice, and (3) Continue Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Righetti (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 3/5/2014). Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Paula J. Morency); (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8404784.) filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint byRCI, LLC. (Chaiken, Tal) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/26/2014 is CONTINUED to 3/5/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 2/19/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against RCI, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/31/2013) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 24 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint.The Initial Case Management Conference will remain as scheduled.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by RCI, LLC, Michael Righetti. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013) Modified on 12/18/2013 (lrc, COURT STAFF). DISREGARD THIS NOTICE FILED IN WRONG CASE!! Modified on 12/19/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Charles A. Jones In Support of Plaintiff's re 21 Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2013) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to (re 19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint) filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2013) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            [Proposed] Order Granting re 19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/16/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/2/2013). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/19/2014 is CONTINUED to 2/26/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 2/12/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Tal Cohen Chaiken (Chaiken, Tal) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial against RCI, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 11/18/2013) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 14 Stipulation.The Court adopts the parties' briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Initial Case Management Conference shall be continued to February 19, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. The Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 4, 2014.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/14/2013). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RCI, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by RCI, LLC, Michael Righetti. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/12/2013. Replies due by 1/9/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 10/24/2013) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/8/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Righetti. RCI, LLC served on 10/4/2013, answer due 10/25/2013. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Righetti.. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 10/7/2013) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to RCI. LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Righetti . (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act; Demand for Jury Trial against RCI. LLC. (Filing Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt Number 0971-8012864) Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013) Modified on 9/19/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?