Katie Lynn Birchard- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Utah Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-02552
District Judge William T. Thurman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2016 at 7:48 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tracy R Terhune, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy R Terhune
v.
No Logo Katie Lynn Birchard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ARNOLD & WADSWORTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew G. Wadsworth +1 801 475 0123 +1 801 475 0393 wadsworth@arnoldwadsworth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE JUSTICE FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/21/2014 Bryan Todd Adamson +1 435 986 8386 +1 435 986 8388 badamson@dixielegal.com
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 58 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):57 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) Notice Date 07/23/2014. (Admin.) (EOD: 07/23/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
    Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (Related Doc # 55) Attorney: Bryan Adamson.(gci) (EOD: 07/21/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
      Pending Order (Other) related documents(s): 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record (with client's consent) Filed by: (Adamson, Bryan) [Order# 257268] (EOD: 07/16/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
        Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Attorney: Bryan Adamson (with client's consent) Filed by on behalf of Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 07/16/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
          Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):53 Order Approving Settlement) Notice Date 02/14/2014. (Admin.) (EOD: 02/14/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
            Order Approving Settlement Agreement (related document(s):51)Defendant shall pay the plaintiff the sum of $2,500.00 to resolve all issues related to the judgment. Payments shall start on March 2014 for a total amount of $100.00 per month for 25 months. The Clerk of Court may close this adversary proceeding. (gci) (EOD: 02/12/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
              Pending Order (Other) related documents(s): 51 Settlement Agreement Filed by: (Adamson, Bryan) [Order# 245890] (EOD: 02/10/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                Settlement Agreement Re:(related document(s):1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tracy R Terhune) Signed by both Plaintiff and Defendant Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 01/31/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                  Motion in Limine and Memorandum in Support Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) Modified on 1/31/2014 (gci). (EOD: 01/30/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/12/2014, Entered: None
                    Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):48 Order on Motion for Contempt/Sanctions) Notice Date 01/12/2014. (Admin.) (EOD: 01/12/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                      Order Denying Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions (Related Doc # 36) Any of Defendant's exhibits that were objected to by the Plaintiff are not stipulated to be received into evidence. Trial to be held February 14, 2014 at 10:00 am. All parties to be present for the trial. Trial briefs and proposed findings of fact to be filed by February 4, 2014. Issue of assessing attorney's fees against the Plaintiff for causing the Final Pretrial Order to be modified is reserved by the Court. (fsl) (EOD: 01/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                        PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/9/2014 11:53:20 AM ]. File Size [ 4036 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:49 ]. (admin). (EOD: 01/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/22/2013, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):45 Order For Telephonic Hearing) Notice Date 12/22/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 12/22/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                            Order Granting Motion for Telephonic Hearing of Tracy R. Terhune at the January 9, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. (Related Doc # 39) (fsl) (EOD: 12/20/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                              Reply Memorandum to (related document(s):42 Objection) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 12/18/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                Declaration In Support Of Opposition (related document(s):42 Objection) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 12/16/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                  Objection to Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (related document(s):41 Objection) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 12/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    Objection to (related document(s):39 Motion for Telephonic Hearing) Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 12/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      Pending Order (Other) related documents(s): 39 Motion for Telephonic Hearing Filed by: (mfm) [Order# 241562] (EOD: 12/09/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                        Motion for Telephonic Hearing (related document(s):37 Notice of Hearing filed by Defendant Katie Lynn Birchard) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (mfm) (EOD: 12/09/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):35 Order) Notice Date 12/04/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 12/04/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing (related document(s):36 Motion for Contempt/Sanctions) Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard Hearing scheduled for 1/9/2014 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, St. George.Deadline for filing objections: 12/20/2013. (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 12/03/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                              Motion For Contempt/Sanctions Against Tracy R. Terhune Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 12/03/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                Stipulated Pretrial Order (related document(s):12 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters). The dates set forth in the Scheduling Order previously issued by the Court relating to filing of trial briefs, proposed findings and conclusions and exhibits remain in full force and effect. Trial set for February 14, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. 206 West Tabernacle, Courtroom 2B, St. George, Utah. (fsl) Modified on 12/3/2013 (fsl). (EOD: 12/02/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Objection to Defendant's List of Witnesses and Exhibits (related document(s):31 Notice of Witness List, Notice of Exhibit List) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 11/26/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Response to (related document(s):30 Objection) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (gci) (EOD: 11/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                      PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/14/2013 9:38:20 AM ]. File Size [ 2496 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:24 ]. (admin). (EOD: 11/19/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Witness List, Notice of Exhibit List Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 11/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Objection to (related document(s):28 Notice of Exhibit List) Objection to Plaintiff [sic] (Tracy Terhune) List of Exhibits and Witnesses Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 11/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) Pretrial Order related documents(s): 26 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by: (Adamson, Bryan) [Order# 238485] (EOD: 10/31/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Lists of Exhibits and Witnesses Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 10/30/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):26 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment) Notice Date 09/26/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 09/26/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment (Related Doc # 15) (fsl) (EOD: 09/24/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Pending Order (Hearing Held) related documents(s): 15 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: (Adamson, Bryan) [Order# 234597]. This order replaces the prior pending order# 234588. (EOD: 09/13/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Pending Order (Hearing Held) related documents(s): 15 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: (Adamson, Bryan) [Order# 234588] (EOD: 09/13/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/9/2013 9:29:42 AM ]. File Size [ 9504 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:39:36 ]. (admin). (EOD: 08/12/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Opposition Reply Memorandum to and Affidavit of Defendant (related document(s):15 Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) Modified on 6/18/2013 (fsl). (EOD: 06/17/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):20 Unsigned Order) Notice Date 06/12/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 06/12/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Unsigned Order (related document(s):19 Pending Order filed by fsl). Reason Order Was Unsigned: Requires a hearing. Please do not resubmit Order until after hearing on August 9th. (fsl) (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Pending Order (Hearing Scheduled/Reserved) related documents(s): 15 Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: (fsl) [Order# 227268] (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of Service (related document(s):15 Motion for Summary Judgment, 16 Notice of Hearing) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Memorandum/Declaration in Support (related document(s):15 Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Hearing (related document(s):15 Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Tracy R Terhune Hearing scheduled for 8/9/2013 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. (fsl) (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion for Summary Judgment to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Filed by Tracy R Terhune (fsl) (EOD: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):12 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters) Notice Date 02/02/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 02/02/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s):11 Unsigned Order) Notice Date 02/02/2013. (Admin.) (EOD: 02/02/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 10/31/2013. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/14/2013 at 09:30AM at Courtroom 2B, St. George. (mkh) (EOD: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unsigned Order (related document(s):7 Pending Order filed by mkh). Reason Order Was Unsigned: Order moot. Scheduling order to be entered by the court. Hearing stricken. (mkh) (EOD: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Stipulated Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Amended Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Amended Certificate of Service (related document(s):6 Motion for Telephonic Hearing) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (mkh) (EOD: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Stipulated Notice of Parties' Planning Meeting Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) (EOD: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Pending Order (Other) related documents(s): 6 Motion for Telephonic Hearing Filed by: (mkh) [Order# 216910] (EOD: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion for Telephonic Hearing (related document(s): deseqno29 Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference) Filed by Tracy R Terhune (mkh) (EOD: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Re: Order. (related document(s): deseqno29 Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference) Notice Date 12/30/2012. (Admin.) (EOD: 12/30/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (related document(s):1 Complaint) Filed by Katie Lynn Birchard (Adamson, Bryan) Modified on 12/28/2012 (mkh). (EOD: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Matthew Wadsworth. (mkh) (EOD: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Katie L. Birchard. (mkh) (EOD: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Adversary case 12-02552. (68 (Dischargeability-523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)):Complaint by Tracy R Terhune against Katie Lynn Birchard . Fee Amount $293 (avt) Modified on 11/28/2012 (mkh). (EOD: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 504 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?