BKGTH Productions, LLC v. DOES 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-05310

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/3/2013 Motion for Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Initial Case Assignment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 79 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?