Jaramillo v. Esperanza Financial Services et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07006
District Judge Blanche M. Manning, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose J. Jaramillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leibowitz Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David P Leibowitz, ESQ +1 847 249 9100 +1 847 249 9180 dleibowitz@lakelaw.com
v.
No Logo Esperanza Financial Services, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Defendant
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1"

Toggle Switch Represented by Potestivo & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Ann Kalarickal +1 312 263 0003 akalarickal@potestivolaw.com
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
Space Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
Office Chicago
Filed 12/13/2007
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Cook
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, COX
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 89 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to MOTION by Defendant US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint[78] (Kalarickal, Amy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant, WMC's Motion to dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint [83] is entered. Plaintiff to file a response to the motion by 9/18/2008. Defendant, WMC to reply by 10/2/2008. Ruling will be by mail unless otherwise notified. No appearance will be necessary on 8/28/2008. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
      LREF
      Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 notice of filing
      NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re Response[86] (Leibowitz, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 86 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Response
        RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo to motion to dismiss[83], motion to dismiss, [78] (Leibowitz, David)
          LREF
          Legal Document 84 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice of Motion
          NOTICE of Motion by Arika Joy Osacky for presentment of motion to dismiss[83] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/28/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Osacky, Arika)
            LREF
            Legal Document 83 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Osacky, Arika)
              LREF
              Legal Document 82 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order
              AGREED Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 8/19/2008(vmj, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 81 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Terminate Deadlines
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Enter Agreed Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines. The parties shall conclude written and oral discovery by 1/22/09. Plaintiff shall designate expert witnesses and provide disclosures required pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) by 3/22/09. Defendants shall designate expert witnesses and provide disclosures required pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) by 4/22/09. Depositions of expert witnesses will be taken by and all expert discovery will be completed by 7/22/09. Status hearing set for 9/22/08 at 9:30 a.m. is stricken. Status hearing set for 12/10/08 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed (vmj, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Terminate Hearings
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On the Court's own motion, status hearing set for 8/19/2008 is stricken and reset to 11/18/2008 at 11:00 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On defendant U.S. Bank's 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss [78], response to be filed by 8/26/2008. Reply to be filed by 9/9/2008. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Notice of Motion
                      NOTICE of Motion by Amy Ann Kalarickal for presentment of motion to dismiss, [78] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Kalarickal, Amy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION by Defendant US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Kalarickal, Amy)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: For the reasons stated below, the plaintiffs motion for default judgment [64-1] is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (rth, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 notice of filing
                            NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re amended complaint, [75] (Leibowitz, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Amended Complaint
                              Second AMENDED complaint by Jose J. Jaramillo against US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1, Esperanza Financial Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, WMC Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Leibowitz, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Amended Document
                              AMENDED notice of filing[73] (Leibowitz, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 notice of filing
                                NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re reply to response to motion[72] (Leibowitz, David)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by Jose J. Jaramillo to response in opposition to motion, [68] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Leibowitz, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                    NOTICE by Arika Joy Osacky of Change of Address (Osacky, Arika)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                      NOTICE by Patrick Thomas Stanton of Change of Address (Stanton, Patrick)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        RESPONSE by WMC Mortgage Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo for default judgment as to the First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant To Federal Truth In Lending Act[64] Against Esperanza Financial Services (Osacky, Arika)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Motion hearing held. On plaintiff's motion for default judgment [64] as to the first amended complaint to rescind mortgage pursuant to Federal Truth In Lending Act, enter default order as to Esperanza. Said motion is taken under advisement. WMC orally joins in U.S. Bank's response, but shall file a brief stating that it is joining the response. Reply to be filed by 7/15/2008. Ruling by mail. Mailed (vmj, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: US Banks motion to dismiss [53-1] is granted. The plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of entry of this order to replead consistent with this order and counsels Rule 11 obligations. Mailed notice (rth, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              RESPONSE by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo for default judgment as to the First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant To Federal Truth In Lending Act[64] (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to response to motion, [60] (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo for default judgment as to the First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant To Federal Truth In Lending Act (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Leibowitz, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Summons in a Civil Case; Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act served on Esperanza Financial Services c/o J. Steven Butkus on 01/08/2008 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 6/19/2008 is reset to 8/19/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 magistrate judge status hearing
                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Status hearing held. Joint oral motion for extension of time to complete discovery is granted. Discovery cut-off set for 9/22/08. The deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures is extended to 7/22/08. Status hearing set for 9/22/08 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vkd, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Response to Motion
                                                        RESPONSE by Jose J. Jaramillo to MOTION by Defendant US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint[53] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Leibowitz, David)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 notice of filing
                                                          NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re other[58] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 other
                                                            Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Jose J. Jaramillo (Leibowitz, David)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On defendant's motion to dismiss [53], response to be filed by 6/10/2008. Reply to be filed by 6/24/2008. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule
                                                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 by Amy Ann Kalarickal (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Amy Ann Kalarickal for presentment of motion to dismiss, [53] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/20/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008, Terminated: 6/27/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION by Defendant US Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-WMC1Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-WMC1 to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        AGREED ORDER. Signed by Judge Honorable Susan E. Cox on 5/9/08.(vkd, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 text entry
                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: The parties having submitted an agreed proposed order, the current deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures shall be extended to 5/30/08. Enter Agreed Order. Mailed notice (vkd, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Alias Summons, First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act, Exhibits A, B, and C served on U S Bank National Association, C/o Amy Kalarickal on May 6, 2008 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Alias Summons, First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act, Exhibits A, B, and C served on W M C Mortgage Corporation C/o Patrick Thomas Stanton on May 6, 2008 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Alias Summons, First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act, Exhibits A, B, and C served on Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, R/A C T Corporation Systems on May 6, 2008 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Alias Summons, First Amended Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act, Exhibits A, B, and C served on Esperanza Financial Services, C/o Guerard, Kalina, & Butkus on May 6, 2008 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert C. Regalado, Process Server by Jose J. Jaramillo regarding alias summons[45] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Alias Summons Issued
                                                                                      4 ALIAS Summons Issued as to US Bank National Association, Esperanza Financial Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, WMC Mortgage Corporation. (vmj, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 notice of filing
                                                                                        NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re amended complaint[43] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                          First AMENDED complaint by Jose J. Jaramillo against all defendants (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ENTER AGREED ORDER granting plaintiff leave to file his First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Honorable Susan E. Cox on 4/23/08.(vkd, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 text entry
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: The parties having submitted an agreed order for the Court's approval, Plaintiff is granted leave to file his First Amended Complaint. Enter Order. Mailed notice (vkd, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Set Deadlines
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: The parties will exchange initial disclosures on or before 4/30/08. The parties shall complete written and oral discovery by 7/22/08. Plaintiff shall designate expert witnesses and provide the disclosures required pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) by 9/5/08. Defendants shall designate expert witnesses and provide the disclosures required pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) by 10/5/08. Depositions of expert witnesses will be taken by and all expert discovery will be completed by 12/31/08. All dispositive motions shall be filed by 2/27/09. Mailed notice (vkd, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC has moved to dismiss the plaintiffs' complaint against it. The plaintiffs respond that they are "agreeable to dismissing this suit against Ocwen without prejudice." Accordingly, Ocwen's motion to dismiss [24] is granted. Ocwen is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. To the extent that the plaintiffs seek to amend their complaint, they either must request leave to do so before Magistrate Judge Cox with a properly noticed motion or present before her, a proposed order agreed to by all of the parties. Mailed (vmj, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 notice of filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re report of rule 26(f) planning meeting[37] of Filing (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jose J. Jaramillo (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 3/20/2008 is reset to 6/19/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 notice of filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re Response[34] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Response
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo to motion to dismiss[24] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 magistrate judge status hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Susan E. Cox:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 6/16/2008 at 09:30 AM. THe parties are directed to submit a proposed discovery schedule including expert disclosure dates as directed in open court by 3/24/2008.Advised in open court (jms, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 notice of filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jose J. Jaramillo re status report[31] Joint Initial Status Report (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                  STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Jose J. Jaramillo (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding set/reset hearings, [29] (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Susan E. Cox :Initial status hearing set for 3/17/08 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1342.The parties are directed to review and to file an initial status report by 3/13/08. The Order Setting Initial Status Report for Cases Assigned to Judge Cox is available in chambers or through Judge Cox's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff's counsel is requested to provide Defendants and/or their prospective counsel with a copy of this order. Mailed notice (vkd, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Status hearing set for 3/20/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (slb, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Expedited referral to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Susan E. Cox for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery motions, discovery supervision and settlement conference. (tlp,)Mailed notice.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 status hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning :Status hearing held on 2/21/200.Briefing as to motion to dismiss[24]is set as follows: Response due by 3/18/2008; Reply due by 4/3/2008. Parties to conduct rule 26(f) conference before the next hearing. Parties are to preset a joint status report with a proposed discovery schedule at the next hearing.Mailed notice (tlp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Amy Ann Kalarickal for presentment of motion to dismiss[24] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/21/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing to dismiss (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service by Arika Joy Osacky on behalf of WMC Mortgage Corporation regarding answer to complaint[22] (Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by WMC Mortgage Corporation(Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Defendants' motions for extension of time to 2/15/2008 to answer [12] [17] are granted. Defendant's motion for extension of time [15] is stricken as duplicative. Defendant's motion to strike documents 15 and 16 [19] is granted. Status hearing set for 2/21/2008 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                        Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's NOTICE of Motion by Amy Ann Kalarickal for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief,,,, [19] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/29/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing to strike notice of motion[16], MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint[15] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Docket Number 15, 15-2# (2) Exhibit 2, Docket Number 16)(Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                            Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Amy Ann Kalarickal for presentment of extension of time, [17], extension of time, [15] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/29/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 extension of time
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation Extending Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION extending defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC's deadline to respond to plaintiff's complaint (Kalarickal, Amy) Modified on 1/15/2008 (vmj, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation Extending Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendant WMC Mortgage Corp.'s Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Arika Joy Osacky on behalf of WMC Mortgage Corporation (Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Arika Joy Osacky for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer[12] before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 1/29/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation by Arika Joy Osacky (Osacky, Arika)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage Corporation by Patrick Thomas Stanton (Stanton, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing by Amy Ann Kalarickal (Kalarickal, Amy)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Summons and Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act served on Holly Blankenship as Operator for Ocwen Loan Servicing on 12/26/2007 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Summons and Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act served on Dawn Schultz as C T Corporation Process Specialist for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems on 12/26/2007 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo regarding Summons and Complaint to Rescind Mortgage Pursuant to Federal Truth in Lending Act served on Kim Leonard as Prentice Hall Corp., Process Specialist for WMC Mortgage Corporation on 12/26/2007 (Leibowitz, David)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Esperanza Financial Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, WMC Mortgage Corporation (hp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose J. Jaramillo by David Perry Leibowitz. (lcw, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL Cover Sheet. (lcw, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed by Jose J. Jaramillo; Jury Demand. (lcw, ) (Attachments) Modified on 12/14/2007 (lcw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?