Reyes v. Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-05431

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:06 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carlos Reyes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea E. Batres +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick James Garvey +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 pgarvey@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Rodriguez +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 atarazi@laborlaws.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
v.
No Logo Joseph Zino, Defendant
No Logo Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 202

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Clark +1 631 261 1040 +1 631 956 9272 jim@jpclarklaw.com
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Counsel for Plaintiff Peter Romero,present. Counsel for Defendant James Clark, present. Settlement Conference held on 4/2/2015 at 2:30 PM. Case settled. A stipulation of discontinuance shall be filed by 5/11/2015. (Tape #FTR: 3:47-3:54.) (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Telephone Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Pre Motion Conference held on 9/5/2014, ( Jury Selection set for 11/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 920 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco., Jury Trial set for 11/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 920 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (Tape #ftr 4:35 - 4:37.) (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:denying 37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; Status Conference held on 7/21/2014. Parties to submit joint pre trial order by 8/21/14 (Tape #ftr 4:43-4:58 and 5:03-5:14.) (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                            REPLY in Support re 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Reply Declaration with Exhibit filed by Carlos Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement filed by All Defendants. (Clark, James) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement filed by All Defendants. (Clark, James) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement by Carlos Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Memorandum in Support) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Pre Motion Conference held on 6/3/2014, motion to be filed by 6/17/14; response by 7/2/14; reply by 7/11/14( oral argument set for 7/21/2014 04:30 PM in Courtroom 920 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (Tape #ftr 4:42 - 4:46.) (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION for pre motion conference for leave to amend complaint filed by All Defendants. (Clark, James) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Carlos Reyes. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for pre motion conference for leave to amend complaint by Carlos Reyes. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 Status Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation) filed by Carlos Reyes. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/1/2014. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                              STATUS REPORT by Carlos Reyes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Rodriguez on behalf of Carlos Reyes (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Andrea) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Letter Regarding Discovery by Carlos Reyes (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Disclosure filed by Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Clark, James) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Discovery , MOTION for Disclosure by Carlos Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Initial Disclosure, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Requests for the Production of Documents, # 3 Exhibit Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production, # 4 Exhibit Spreadsheet, # 5 Exhibit Spreadsheet) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/2/2014. (Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Carlos Reyes. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Garvey on behalf of Carlos Reyes (aty to be noticed) (Garvey, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Arcadio Romero on behalf of Carlos Reyes (notification declined or already on case) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 21 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/3/2013. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Protective Order and ConfidentialityOrder by Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Clark, James) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent MOTION for Protective Order and Cofidentiality Agreement by Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Clark, James) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 Letter MOTION to Compel Production of Tax Returns filed by Carlos Reyes. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter MOTION to Compel Production of Tax Returns by Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Clark, James) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Carlos Reyes. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2013. The Pre-Trial Conference will be held on January 15, 2014 at 3:30 p.m. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. (Buckel, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle:Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/8/2013. Discovery completed by 11/8/13 including experts. Plaintiff(s) shall serve all automatic disclosure (Rule 26(a)(1)) by 10 days. Defendant(s) shall serve all automatic disclosure (Rule 26(a)(1)) by 10 days. The parties shall serve document production/interrogatory demands by 5/3/13. The parties shall respond to outstanding document production/ interrogatories by 6/3/13. A Status Conference is set for 12/10/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle. So Ordered by Magistrate E. Thomas Boyle. (Tape #10:32-10:46.) (Major, Jasmine) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea E. Batres on behalf of Carlos Reyes (aty to be noticed) (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. (Clark, James) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Clark, James) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Request for Certificate of Default by Carlos Reyes (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Certificate of Default) (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Reyes. Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. served on 12/3/2012, answer due 12/24/2012. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Reyes. Joseph Zino served on 12/11/2012, answer due 1/1/2013. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Amended Summons Issued as to Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 amended summons) (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle. Counsel for plaintiff(s) or plaintiff pro se is obligated to serve a copy of this order on each defendant. See order for further instructions.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 11/14/2012. (Lundy, Lisa) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos Reyes. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Padilla, Kristin) Modified on 2/21/2013 to correct filed date (Padilla, Kristin). (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp.. (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Joseph Zino. (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Joseph Zino, Zino's Gateway Pizza & Restaurant Corp. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Carlos Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?