Adaptix, Inc. v. Ericsson, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00503

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 5:52 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adaptix, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony K Bruster +1 817 251 0610 +1 903 758 7397 akb@emafirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward K Chin +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ekc@emafirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Alexander Latchford +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 slatchford@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 ktg@c-m.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Clarence Williams +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 jaw@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes Messina Gilman & Hayes LLC - Boston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Fulford +1 617 439 4200 tfulford@hayesmessina.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Gilman +1 978 809 3854 +1 978 809 3869 rgilman@hayesmessina.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James McGonagle +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 djm@c-m.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E Millikin +1 978 809 3855 +1 978 809 3869 cmillikin@hayesmessina.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes, Messina, Gilman & Hayes, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly K Corcoran +1 617 345 6900 +1 617 443 1999 mcorcoran@hayesmessina.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Iaconis +1 617 345 6900 +1 617 443 1999 jiaconis@hayesmessina.com
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015 Steven Edward Lipman +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 slipman@hayesmessina.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Joelle Fitzpatrick +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 meredithf@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Wright +1 512 450 4225 +1 903 758 7397 andrew@brusterpllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
No Logo Ericsson, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery Scott Becker +1 214 953 6526 +1 214 661 4526 jeff.becker@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Ericsson, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Scott Becker +1 214 953 6526 +1 214 661 4526 jeff.becker@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jugle steven.jugle@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Scott Becker +1 214 953 6526 +1 214 661 4526 jeff.becker@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jugle steven.jugle@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB, Defendant
Officially listed as "Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Scott Becker +1 214 953 6526 +1 214 661 4526 jeff.becker@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jugle steven.jugle@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Mark Kubehl +1 214 953 6500 +1 214 661 4486 doug.kubehl@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Bell Rubenstein +1 214 953 6594 +1 214 661 4594 jonathan.rubenstein@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Adaptix, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cesari & McKenna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 ktg@c-m.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Gannon +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 ktg@c-m.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J Hayes +1 617 951 2500 +1 617 951 3927 pjh@c-m.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hayes, Messina, Gilman & Hayes, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015 Steven Edward Lipman +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 slipman@hayesmessina.com
TERMINATED: 01/20/2015 Steven Edward Lipman +1 978 809 3850 +1 978 809 3869 slipman@hayesmessina.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Joelle Fitzpatrick +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 meredithf@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Joelle Fitzpatrick +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 meredithf@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by 5170 Golden Foothill Parkway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Keyzer +1 916 243 5259 +1 916 404 0436 david@keyzerlaw.com
  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/13/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                      SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 161 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from 12/15/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts from 12/16/15 ALU Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Wells, # 5 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from 12/15/16 ALU Trial Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from 9/30/14 Deposition of Wells, # 7 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from 8/28/13 Deposition of Wells)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 196 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 161 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to the '808 Patent on Issue Preclusion Grounds) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 162 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rubenstein, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Wells Infringement Report, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from 12/1/15 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Verizons First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Sprints First Supplemental Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Green, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from 12/11/15 Trial Transcripts, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from 12/10/15 Trial Transcripts, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from 12/17/15 Trial Transcripts, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rubenstein, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from 9.22.14 Deposition of Green, # 3 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from 12.17.15 Deposition of Green)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Non-Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 136 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Chin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Mr. Green Verizon, # 4 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Mr. Green Sprint, # 5 Exhibit C - Expert Report of Mr. Green T-Mobile, # 6 Exhibit D - CV of Philip Green, # 7 Exhibit E - Stephen Becker Deposition Excerpt Nov 11 2014) (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Daubert Motion Briefing (Philip Green) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/1/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 105 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding AT&T Documents) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/18/2015. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Becker, Jeffery) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffery S. Becker, # 2 Exhibit 22 to Becker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 23 to Becker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 24 to Becker Declaration)(Becker, Jeffery) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Scheduling Order and for Leave to Participate in the Already Scheduled November 18, 2015 Hearing on Adaptix's Standing by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becker, # 2 Exhibit A-1 9/9/15 Correspondence from Gannon, # 3 Exhibit A-2 10/1/15 Correspondence from Gannon, # 4 Exhibit 1 Excerpts from 7/1/14 Liu Deposition, # 5 Exhibit 2 UWASH000046-49, # 6 Exhibit 3 Excerpts from Third Supp Answers to First Set of Interrogatories, # 7 Exhibit 4 Excerpts from Plaintiffs Responses to Supp Requests for Admissions, # 8 Exhibit 5 - UWASH000050-78, # 9 Exhibit 6 Excerpts from 10/9/15 Liu Deposition, # 10 Exhibit 7 - UWASH000001-45, # 11 Exhibit 8 Excerpts from Stoll Report, # 12 Exhibit 9 U.S. Patent No. 6,870,808, # 13 Exhibit 10 Excerpts from Declaration and Expert Report of Wicker, # 14 Exhibit 11 U.S. Patent No. 6,904,283, # 15 Exhibit 12 Kivanc Subcarrier Allocation, # 16 Exhibit 13 Yin An Efficient Multiuser, # 17 Exhibit 14 Liu OFDM Blind Carrier, # 18 Exhibit 15 Yin An SDMA Protocol, # 19 Exhibit 16 Excerpts from 7/2/14 Liu Deposition, # 20 Exhibit 17 Yin Dynamic Scheduling, # 21 Exhibit 18 Excerpts from Supplemental Stoll Report, # 22 Exhibit 19 Expert Report of Hicks, # 23 Exhibit 20 Excerpts from 6/25/14 Dodd Deposition, # 24 Exhibit 21 U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Objection to Claim Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and emailed to pltf fof service. (klb) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Ericsson, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. ADAPTIX, INC.'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Smiley, Keith) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4667747.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?