COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00582

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 11:28 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Competitive Enterprise Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P. O. Box 357

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hans Frank Bader +1 202 331 2278 +1 202 331 0640 hfb138@yahoo.com
v.
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives; failure to conform to the attached Order may, when appropriate, result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/11/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
              Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/16/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/16/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 4/14/2014, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/15/2014. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS (3) ISSUED ELECTRONICALLY as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice of Consent, # 4 Consent Form)(md, ) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of filing of corrected summons with correct case number and correction to case number listed on complaint by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons Corrected summons for U.S. Attorney with correct case number, # 2 Summons Corrected summons for EPA with correct case number, # 3 Summons Corrected summons for Attorney General with correct case number)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3679854) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Summons for the agency, EPA, # 4 Summons Summons for the Attorney General)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 37 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?