Pickering et al v. Defrance et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01207-VLB
District Judge Vanessa L. Bryant, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 30, 2019 at 2:31 PM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leal R. Pickering, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S. Loman +1 860 761 2530 +1 860 760 6231 atty_loman@att.net
No Logo Wanda Sampel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S. Loman +1 860 761 2530 +1 860 760 6231 atty_loman@att.net
v.
No Logo August Defrance, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
No Logo Louis, Julia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
No Logo Lukanik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
No Logo Robert Kraeger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
No Logo Romotti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
No Logo Schreiner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
Space Scott M. Karsten +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 skarsten@kt-lawfirm.com
Office New Haven
Filed 8/19/2014
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Hartford
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags EFILE,RAR,REFCNF
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Instrument Returned
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Release of Bond Obligation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: None Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Pre-Filing Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [53] Motion for Reconsideration for the reasons set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/25/2016. (Hudson, C)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 11/3/16. Jury Selection is moved to 12/2/16 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Jury Trial is scheduled for 12/12/16 at 8:30 AM, 12/13/16 at 8:30 AM, 12/15/16 at 8:30 AM, 12/16/16 at 1:00 PM, and 12/19/16 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties are instructed to file one proposed set of jury instructions and verdict form, indicating any language that is the subject of disagreement between the parties and briefly providing authority in support of each party's proposed language. Each party shall file three exhibit binders (including witness lists)--one to be delivered to the courtroom deputy, Chester Fernandez, in the Clerk's Office and two to Chambers. In addition, each party shall submit to the Courtroom Deputy electronic exhibit files that comply with file naming method on: http://ctd.uscourts.gov/jury-evidence-recording-system-jers. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 11/18/16. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/25/16.(Fernandez, C.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 10/21/2016. Total Time: 3 hours and 10 minutes. Case not settled. (Klebes, K)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                          Judge Robert A. Richardson no longer assigned to case. (Fernandez, C.)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016, Terminated: 10/25/2016 Motion for Reconsideration
                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [49] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Leal R. Pickering.Responses due by 11/3/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Loman, Mark)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 52 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Calendar EntryCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 1:00 PM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Klebes, K)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 10/21/16 at 1:00 P.M. with Judge Richardson. Pleas see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 10/13/16. (Klebes, K)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 1:00 PM in West Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Klebes, K)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 50 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/30/16.(Fernandez, C.)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [38] Motion for Summary Judgment in accordance with the Memorandum of Decision published herewith. The case is referred to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert Richardson for a settlement conference; all proceedings in connection therewith must be concluded prior to the November 3, 2016 joint trial memorandum deadline. The parties are directed to contact Judge Richardson's chambers jointly in a conference call by October 14, 2016 to schedule a settlement conference. The December 2016 trial and November 3, 2016 joint trial memorandum deadlines will not be continued for settlement purposes. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/30/2016. (Hudson, C)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/16/2016, Entered: 4/16/2016 AffidavitCourt Filing
                                            Second AFFIDAVIT re [41] Objection Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgement Signed By Leal R. Pickering filed by Leal R. Pickering. (Loman, Mark)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2016, Entered: 4/16/2016 Affidavit
                                              First AFFIDAVIT re [41] Objection Motion for Summary Judgment Signed By Wanda Sampel filed by Wanda Sampel. (Loman, Mark)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 46 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Order on Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [44] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/5/2016. (Nadler, S.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY to Response to [38] First MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016, Terminated: 4/5/2016 Motion for Leave to File
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum Out Of Time, Nunc Pro Tunc by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to MotionCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [42] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply for failure to show good cause as required by D. Conn. L. R. 7.. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/18/16. (Fernandez, C.)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016, Terminated: 3/18/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [38] First MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION for Summary Judgment until April 4, 2016 by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Allen, Patrick)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Objection
                                                          OBJECTION Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Leal R. Pickering. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Local Rule 56(a) Statement, # (2) Exhibit)(Loman, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting Plaintiff's [39] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendants' motion by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/18/2016. (Nadler, S.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/17/2016, Terminated: 2/18/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 7, 2016 to Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment by Leal R. Pickering. (Loman, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Trial Brief due by 11/2/2016 Jury Selection set for 12/6/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. See Order [33] (LaLone, L.)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016, Terminated: 2/2/2016 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment (Responses due by 2/22/2016, ) by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Statement of Material Facts, # (3) Exhibit List, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C, # (7) Exhibit D, # (8) Exhibit E, # (9) Exhibit F, # (10) Exhibit G, # (11) Exhibit H, # (12) Exhibit I, # (13) Exhibit J, # (14) Exhibit K, # (15) Exhibit L, # (16) Exhibit M)(Allen, Patrick) Modified on 2/2/2016 (Gould, K.).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2016 (Fernandez, Chester)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/15/2016. (Lewis, L.)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016, Terminated: 1/15/2016 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 1, 2016 To Extend The Current Deadline To File Dispositive Motions Set Deadlines/Hearings by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Allen, Patrick)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/23/15. (Lewis, L.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                            Set deadline: Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2016 (Grady, B.)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015, Terminated: 12/23/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2016 For Defendants To File Their Dispositive Motion by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following case management deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by 12/2/2015; Dispositive Motions are due by 1/4/2016; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 2/4/2016 and Jury Selection will take place on 03/31/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 11/2/2016 and Jury Selection will take place on 12/6/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/6/2015. (Lewis, L.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Court's Order [31] extending the deadlines in this case, the Court sets the following case management deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by 12/2/2015; Dispositive Motions are due by 1/4/2016; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 2/4/2016 and Jury Selection will take place on 4/5/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 11/2/2016 and Jury Selection will take place on 12/6/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/2015.(Nadler, S.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting, in part, Plaintiff's [30] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff requests a 60-day extension of time to permit for the deposition of an expert witness. Accordingly, the Court shall extend the dates in the Scheduling Order by 60 days. The Court is disinclined to grant any further extension requests. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/2015. (Nadler, S.)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015, Terminated: 6/30/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days Schedule Order by Leal R. Pickering. (Loman, Mark)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: 12/31/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time. The Scheduling Order remains in effect. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-31-14. (Bryant, Vanessa)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: 12/31/2014, Terminated: 12/31/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until February 13 and February 22, 2015 To Respond and/or Object to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production by August Defrance, Romotti. (Allen, Patrick)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting Plaintiffs' [26] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production by 1/29/2015. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/30/2014. (Nadler, S.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: 12/30/2014, Terminated: 12/30/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until January 29, 2015 Reply to Discovery Requests by Leal R. Pickering. (Loman, Mark)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                The Parties' Rule 26(f) Report [20] is approved and the Court sets the following case management deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by 10/2/2015; Dispositive Motions are due by 11/2/2015; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 12/4/2015 and Jury Selection will take place on 1/5/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 9/2/2016 and Jury Selection will take place on 10/4/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/19/2014.(Nadler, S.)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Response
                                                                                                  RESPONSE Replies to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Leal R. Pickering. (Loman, Mark)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE, JURY CLAIM by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner.(Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                      Docket Entry Correction re [21] Bond, replacement pdf. (Blue, A.)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Bond
                                                                                                        Security for Cost BOND in the amount of $ $500.00 posted by Leal R. Pickering, Wanda Sampel. Receipt Number 783748 (Blue, A.) Modified on 10/6/2014 to edit the text. (Blue, A.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2014: # (1) REPLACEMENT PDF) (Blue, A.).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allen, Patrick)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Order on Motion for Security for CostsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying [16] Motion for Security for Costs. The case having been removed from state court and therefore the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court apply. The federal rules require the posting of a bond, not the signing of a recognizance by a person acting as surety or voucher, as it permissible under Connecticut Practice Book Sections 8-3 through 8-4. Even if the plaintiff(s) actually posted a cash bond with the Superior Court there is no assurance if or how the Defendant would recover those funds at the culmination of this case. Plaintiffs provide no assurance and cite no authority to support the conclusion that, assuming a cash bond was posted, the funds would not be released as there is no longer a case pending in Superior Court. Further, Plaintiff has not identified the procedural means by which Defendants could recover the funds. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9-19-14. (Bryant, Vanessa)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/18/2014 Objection
                                                                                                              OBJECTION to Motion for Waiver of Security for Costs filed by Leal R. Pickering. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Loman, Mark)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                OBJECTION re [16] MOTION for Security for Costs Waiver of Security Cost filed by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014, Terminated: 9/19/2014 Motion for Security for Costs
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Security for Costs Waiver of Security Cost by Leal R. Pickering. (Attachments: # (1) State Court Writ)(Loman, Mark)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D Allen on behalf of August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner (Allen, Patrick)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Order on Motion for Security for Costs
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12] Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 09/12/2014. (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [11] MOTION for extension of time until 10/11/2014 within which defendants may respond to plaintiffs' complaint within the [1]] Notice of Removal. Signed by Clerk on 09/12/2014. (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Update Answer Deadline
                                                                                                                          Answer deadline updated for August Defrance to 10/11/2014; Louis Julia to 10/11/2014; Robert Kraeger to 10/11/2014; Lukanik to 10/11/2014; Romotti to 10/11/2014; Schreiner to 10/11/2014. (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014, Terminated: 9/12/2014 Motion for Security for Costs
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Security for Costs by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014, Terminated: 9/12/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until October 11, 2014 Within Which Defendants May Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint [1] Notice of Removal,, by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Lukanik, Romotti, Schreiner. (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Electronic Service Documents
                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of [2] Notice of Appearance filed by Louis Julia, August Defrance, Romotti, Schreiner, Lukanik, Robert Kraeger, [3] Notice (Other) filed by Louis Julia, August Defrance, Romotti, Schreiner, Lukanik, Robert Kraeger, [4] Notice (Other) filed by Louis Julia, August Defrance, Romotti, Schreiner, Lukanik, Robert Kraeger, [1] Notice of Removal,, filed by Louis Julia, August Defrance, Romotti, Schreiner, Lukanik, Robert Kraeger, [9] Protective Order, [8] Order Re: Chambers Practices, [5] Notice (Other) filed by Louis Julia, August Defrance, Romotti, Schreiner, Lukanik, Robert Kraeger, [7] Electronic Filing Order, [6] Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/20/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Removal Order)(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/19/2014.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Order Re: Chambers PracticesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/19/2014.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/19/2014.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                                        Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/19/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2014; Discovery due by 2/18/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2015. Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2014.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Michael Lukanik, Remotti, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o (STATEMENT OF SCOTT M. KARSTEN) (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Michael Lukanik, Remotti, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o (OF PENDING MOTIONS) (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Michael Lukanik, Remotti, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o (OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Karsten on behalf of August Defrance, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, Michael Lukanik, Remotti, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o (Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Lukanik, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, August Defrance, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o, Remotti from Middletown Superior Court, case number MMX-CV-14-6012354-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0205-3335736, filed by Michael Lukanik, Louis Julia, Robert Kraeger, August Defrance, Schreiner, Frank, Ofcr. Middletown Police Dept., I/o, Remotti. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) summons, state court, # (3) complaint, state court)(Karsten, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?