Bill A. Busbice et al v. James David Williams et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-04077

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 8, 2017 at 1:49 AM EST (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bill A. Busbice, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Lawrence Gale +1 949 622 2704 +1 949 622 2739 paul.gale@troutmansanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Howard Prouty +1 916 319 0860 +1 916 319 0155 tprouty@cde.ca.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Siavash Daniel Rashtian +1 949 622 2700 +1 949 622 2739 daniel.rashtian@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Ecibsub, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Lawrence Gale +1 949 622 2704 +1 949 622 2739 paul.gale@troutmansanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Howard Prouty +1 916 319 0860 +1 916 319 0155 tprouty@cde.ca.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Siavash Daniel Rashtian +1 949 622 2700 +1 949 622 2739 daniel.rashtian@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Olla Productions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Lawrence Gale +1 949 622 2704 +1 949 622 2739 paul.gale@troutmansanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Howard Prouty +1 916 319 0860 +1 916 319 0155 tprouty@cde.ca.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Siavash Daniel Rashtian +1 949 622 2700 +1 949 622 2739 daniel.rashtian@troutmansanders.com
v.
No Logo Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Does, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Garuda Partners, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Gerald R. Seppala, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Highgate Pass, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo James David Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/09/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Luxe One, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Moment Factory, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Steven J. Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Visions LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
No Logo Barry J. Reiss, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgee And Abramoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Burgee +1 818 264 7575 +1 818 264 7576 jburgee@bandalaw.net
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (156) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Writ of Execution - Issued 125 , returned executed upon Steven J. Brown on 1/11/17. Remarks: Mailed on 1/18/17. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Writ of Execution - Issued 125 , returned executed upon Steven J. Brown on 1/11/17. Remarks: Mailed on 1/18/17. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Writ of Execution - Issued 125 , returned executed upon Steven J. Brown on 1/11/17. Remarks: Mailed on 1/18/17. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court hereby GRANTS the Request and orders as follows:1. Any registered process server who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above-entitled case and any related cases. 2. The U.S. Marshals Office will remain the Levying Officer. (cr) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
            REQUEST for Order for Service of Process by Registered Process Server filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gale, Paul)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Writ of Execution issued against Steven J. Brown re: Judgment, 117 . (mrgo)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Writ of Execution against Steven J. Brown)(Gale, Paul)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC aEcibsub, LLC, and against Steven James Brown in the principal amount of $ 3,450,000.00, interest in the amount of $ 771.28, RE: Judgment 117 . (mg) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC, and Ecibsub, LLC, and against Gerald R. Seppala in the principal amount of $ 100,000.00, interest in the amount of $ 22.35 RE: Judgment 116 . (mg) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC, and Ecibsub, LLC, and against James David Williams in the principal amount of $ 6,950,000.00, interest in the amount of $ 1,553.75, RE: Judgment 117 . (mg) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. If there are no amounts for principal, attorney fees, costs or interest, please enter a zero (0) on each line. Leave the Attested part blank for clerk's use. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (mg) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. If there are no amounts for principal, attorney fees, costs or interest, please enter a zero (0) on each line. Leave the Attested part blank for clerk's use. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (mg) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. If there are no amounts for principal, attorney fees, costs or interest, please enter a zero (0) on each line. Leave the Attested part blank for clerk's use. Please return this form with the corrected document when returned to the clerk's office for filing. (mg) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs are granted judgment against Defendant James David Williams in the amount of $6,950,000.00; and against Defendant Steven J. Brown in the amount of $3,450,000.00, for a total judgment of $10,400,000.00. (mg) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 116 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT GERALD R. SEPPALA by Judge Percy Anderson: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs are granted judgment against Defendant Gerald R. Seppala, in the amount of $100,000.00. (mg) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Percy Anderson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The above-captioned action, including all claims and causes of action, is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) as to all remaining parties, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the parties' settlement agreement. (mg) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court hereby Grants Plaintiffs' 110 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Judgment and will enter the proposed stipulated judgments. (mg) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                    RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Judgment (Entry of Stipulated Judgments) 110 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      OBJECTION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Judgment (Entry of Stipulated Judgments) 110 filed by Defendant Gerald R. Seppala. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burgee, John)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                        OBJECTION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Judgment (Entry of Stipulated Judgments) 110 filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, James David Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burgee, John)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Judgment (Entry of Stipulated Judgments) filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas H. Prouty, # 2 Exhibit A & B to Prouty Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Stipulation for Judgment and Entry of Judgment as to Defendant Gerald Seppala, # 5 Proposed Judgment Against Defendant Gerald Seppala, # 6 Stipulation for Judgment and Entry of Judgment as to Defendants James David Williams and Steven Brown, # 7 Proposed Judgment Against Defendant James Williams and Steven Brown) (Prouty, Thomas)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT BARRY J. REISS 106 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The above-captioned action, including all claims and causes of action, is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) as against Defendant BARRY J. REISS only, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (lom) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER 104 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs' counsel shall not publish or disseminate the copies of Defendant Steven J. Brown's ("Brown") passport and driver's license that were provided by Brown to Plaintiffs' counsel as part of the parties' settlement agreement (the "Brown Identification"). Upon Brown's full satisfaction of his obligations under the parties' settlement agreement, Plaintiffs' counsel shall destroy the Brown Identification in their possession, to the extent not previously destroyed. Plaintiffs' counsel shall maintain the Brown Identification as confidential information on an attorneys-eyes-only basis; however, Plaintiffs counsel may disclose the Brown Identification to the Court and other courts of competent jurisdiction and their respective personnel after taking appropriate steps to request that such information is filed under seal in connection with the enforcement of the settlement. (lom) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Dismissing Case
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 106 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action, including all claims and causes of action, is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) as to all remaining parties, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to GLOBAL SETTLEMENT filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Barry J. Reiss, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of John G. Burgee/Burgee & Abramoff, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney 100 filed by Defendants Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC. (Burgee, John)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Barry J. Reiss filed by Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Steven J. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. The parties may contact the deputy clerk of the court to calendar the appearance. If the parties do not dismiss the action or do not place the settlement on the record, the matter will remain on the Courts active trial calendar with all pretrial and trial dates in effect. (kss) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of John G. Burgee/Burgee & Abramoff, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Counsel for Defendants Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burgee, John)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DECLARATION of John G. Burgee in opposition to MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 [#82] previously scheduled for hearing on 07/27/2015 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              DECLARATION of Steven J. Brown in opposition to MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Defendant Steven J. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Dr. Ismael Silva, Jr. re MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Gerald R. Seppala. as to Gerald R. Seppala, Bankruptcy Court case number 14-43737-MER. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - H)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is a Motion filed by John G. Burgee to withdraw as counsel of record for defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation ("Bipartisan"), Highgate Pass, LLC ("Highgate"), Garuda Partners, Ltd. ("Garuda"), and Legacy Film Crest, LLC ("Legacy") 78 . On 7/8/2015, the Court granted a Stipulation regarding Mr. Burgee's withdrawal as counsel of record for Bipartisan, Highgate, and Garuda. In the Motion, Mr. Burgee indicates that Legacy is suspended and therefore cannot participate in litigation. Mr. Burgee's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Legacy is granted. Mr. Burgee shall serve Legacy and David Williams with this Order no later than 7/13/2015. No later than 8/3/2015, Legacy shall show cause, in writing, why its Answer should not be stricken and its default entered. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to Pursue Claims Against Defendant James David Williams in this Court and of Filing of Motion For Relief From Automatic Stay in the Bankruptcy Court filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gale, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Highgate Pass, LLC, and Garuda Partners, Ltd., pursuant to the Order of 7/8/2015 88 . (gk) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 80 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John G. Burgee and Burgee & Abramoff, P.C. will be granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Highgate Pass, LLC and Garuda Partners, Ltd. and will be withdrawn and relieved as counsel upon service of a copy of the order entered based upon this Stipulation on each of these parties. Upon the withdrawal of counsel, the default of Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Highgate Pass, LLC and Garuda Partners, Ltd. on the Complaint will irrevocably be entered in this action. (gk) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Steven Brown in opposition to MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Defendant Steven J. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of John G. Burgee in opposition to MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received defendant James David Williams' Notice of Bankruptcy 84 . The automatic staydoes not apply to claims asserted against defendants Steven J. Brown, Gerald R. Seppala, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Moment Factory, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Visions, LLC, Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Highgate Pass, LLC, Garuda Partners, Ltd., or Barry J. Reiss. Therefore, only the claims alleged against Williams are subject to the automatic stay. The remainder of this action is not stayed, and all pretrial and trial dates remain in effect. No later than 14 days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file in this Court either a dismissal of their claims against Williams (if they intend to pursue their claims against Williams in the bankruptcy case) or a Notice indicating that they intend to pursue the claims against Williams in this Court. If Plaintiffs intend to pursue their claims against Williams in this Court, they must, no later than 7/20/2015, file in this Court proof that they have filed an appropriate motion in the Bankruptcy Court seeking relief from the automatic stay. Failure to timely seek relief from the automatic stay may result in dismissal of the claims against Williams without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant James David Williams. as to James David Williams, Bankruptcy Court case number 1:15-BK-12157 MT. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 82 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Exhibit F - Q)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in further support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 (re: Defendants' Further Failure to Appear for Deposition as Additional Update on Discovery Issues Under Submission) filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Order re Withdrawal of Counsel of Record for Certain Defendants and Entry of Default filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING CERTAIN STIPULATED DEPOSITIONS by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich, re Stipulation for Order 76 . See document for details. (yb) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND Amended MOTION of John G. Burgee/Burgee & Abramoff, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 75 filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order Setting Depositions filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: 6/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of John G. Burgee/Burgee & Abramoff, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in further support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 (re: Defendants' Failure to Appear for Deposition and Claimed Unavailability for Deposition as Further Update on Discovery Issues Under Submission) filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 (Response to Defendants' Supplemental Filings re In Camera Review of Allegedly Privileged Documents) filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas H. Prouty, # 2 Exhibit A - D)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Barry J. Reiss in opposition to MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 (Supplemental) filed by Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of J. David Williams in opposition to MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 re: in Camera Review of Privileged Documents filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Corrected NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Steven J. Brown, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss of Privileged Documents. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss of Privileged Documents. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 5/11/15 to 5/11/15 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Court will contact Thomas H. Prouty at thomas.prouty@troutmansanders.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 5/11/15. FEE PAID. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John G. Burgee in opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 (Supplemental) filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas H. Prouty, # 2 Exhibit A - C)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re: MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. 05/11/2015 has been rescheduled. Hearing re-set for May 11, 2015 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 690. Status conference to address outstanding discovery issues [#64} is set for hearing May 11, 2015, 2 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' NON-COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER, AND REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS OUSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Barry J. Reiss in opposition to MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 (executed copy) filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Barry J. Reiss in opposition to MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 and Declaration of John G. Burgee filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Burgee, John) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS TO BE PRODUCED BY THIRD-PARTY WME by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re Order 59 . See document for details. (yb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS TO BE PRODUCED BY THIRD-PARTY WME [#58] by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. See document for details. (yb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Order re Confidentiality Order Applicable to Documents to be Produced by Third-Party WME filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 (Supplemental) filed by Defendants Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 10, # 2 Exhibit 11 - 20, # 3 Exhibit 21 - 30, # 4 Exhibit 31 - 36, # 5 Exhibit 37 - 49)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Bill A. Busbice, Jr. in support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - K)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael D. Friedman in support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - F)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception 50 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Determination of Application of Crime-Fraud Exception filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich:, RE: MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 . The request for sanctions is submitted for decision. See document for details.Court Recorder: CS 04-06-2015. (yb) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 4/6/15 to 4/6/15 filed by plaintiff Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Court will contact Paul L. Gale at paul.gale@troutmansanders.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Pre-Trial Proceeding: 4/6/15. FEE PAID. (Gale, Paul) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12-17, # 4 Exhibit 18-27)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Chris Haley in Support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Prouty, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of John Burgee in opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation re: Visions Discovery, # 2 Joint Stipulation re Brown Discovery, # 3 Joint Stipulation re Luxe One Discovery, # 4 Joint Stipulation re Legacy Film Crest Discovery, # 5 Joint Stipulation re Moment Factory Discovery, # 6 Joint Stipulation re Williams Discovery, # 7 Joint Stipulation re Seppala Discovery, # 8 Joint Stipulation re Bipartisan Coalition Discovery, # 9 Joint Stipulation re Highgate Pass Discovery, # 10 Joint Stipulation re Reiss Discovery, # 11 Joint Stipulation re Garuda Partners Discovery)(Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 Declaration of John G. Burgee filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams, Consol Defendant Barry J. Reiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 3-5, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 6-8, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 9-11, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 12-14, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 15-17)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich re: MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 previously scheduled for 03/09/2015 10:00 A.M. has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich in Courtroom 690, Roybal Federal Courthouse. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Siavash Daniel Rashtian counsel for Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Filed by Plaintiffs BILL A. BUSBICE, JR., OLLA PRODUCTIONS, LLC, and ECIBSUB, LLC. (Attorney Siavash Daniel Rashtian added to party Bill A. Busbice, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Siavash Daniel Rashtian added to party Ecibsub, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Siavash Daniel Rashtian added to party Olla Productions, LLC(pty:pla))(Rashtian, Siavash) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prouty in Support of MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions 39 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31, # 6 Exhibit 32, # 7 Exhibit 33, # 8 Exhibit 34, # 9 Exhibit 35, # 10 Exhibit 36, # 11 Exhibit 37, # 12 Exhibit 38, # 13 Exhibit 39, # 14 Exhibit 40, # 15 Exhibit 41-43, # 16 Exhibit 44-45)(Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Document Production, and Request for Sanctions filed by plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On 11/10/2014, the Court ordered the parties to show cause in writing, by no later than 11/24/2014, why these cases should not be consolidated 36 . Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr., Olla Productions, LLC, and Ecibsub, LLC have filed a response indicating that they favor consolidation (CV 14-04077 PA (AJWx), Docket No. 37 ). In light of the common questions of law and fact presented, the Court orders the two actions consolidated. The lower numbered case, CV 14-04077 PA (AJWx), is hereby designated the Master File. All documents filed hereafter shall bear the Master File case number CV 14-04077 PA (AJWx). All pleadings filed in case number CV 14-07063 PA (AJWx) prior to the date of this order shall be treated as if they had been filed in the Master File. The Court dismisses case number CV 14-07063 PA (AJWx). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, 36 (Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court orders the parties to show cause in writing why these cases should not be consolidated. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). The parties responses to this order to show cause, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages, shall be filed by 11/24/2014. (vv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying 22 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (jloz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of the Parties' Selection of Private Mediator filed by plaintiff Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLCto Order to Show Cause,, 30 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul L. Gale, # 2 Exhibit A - G)(Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (jloz) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. SEE ORDER. (im) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than October 10, 2014, why one or more defendants should not be dropped from this case for improper joinder. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 18, 20, 21; see also Coughlin,130 F.3d at 1351 (finding misjoinder where "[e]ach claim raises potentially different issues, and must be viewed in a separate and individual light by the Court"). In response to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs may, if they so choose, dismiss their claims against certain defendants in this action and file separate actions with new complaints and filing fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Before the Court is a Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Visions LLC and Gerald R. Seppala (Docket No. 21 ) and a Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Moment Factory, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, and James David Williams (Docket No. 22 ). Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearings calendared for October 6, 2014 at 1:30 p.m., are vacated, and the matters taken off calendar. The Court takes the matters under submission. The Clerk will notify the parties once the Court has issued a decision. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for Monday, October 6, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. ( Discovery cut-off 7/27/2015, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/10/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2015 at 01:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 10/6/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (jloz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 22 filed by Defendants Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Moment Factory, LLC, James David Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 21 filed by Defendants Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burgee, John) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC.. (Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Paul L. Gale in opposition to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 21 , MOTION to Compel Arbitration 22 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - G)(Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Arbitration 21 , MOTION to Compel Arbitration 22 filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Gale, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Moment Factory, LLC, James David Williams. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/6/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Burgee, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. (rne) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying BILL A. BUSBICE, JR., OLLA PRODUCTIONS, LLC, EDIBSUB, LLC, JAMES DAVID WILLIAMS, STEVEN J. BROWN, GERALD R. SEPPALA,LEGACY FILM CREST, LLC, MOMENT FACTORY, LLC, LUXE ONE, INC., VISIONS LLC, BIPARTISAN COALITION FOR AMERICAN SECURITY CORPORATION, HIGHGATE PASS, LLC, GARUDA PARTNERS, LTD.. (Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Does(pty:dft))(Burgee, John) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, 1 filed by Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams.(Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Steven J. Brown(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Garuda Partners, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Highgate Pass, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Legacy Film Crest, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Luxe One, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Moment Factory, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Gerald R. Seppala(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party Visions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Gerard Burgee added to party James David Williams(pty:dft))(Burgee, John) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Garuda Partners, Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Highgate Pass, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Visions LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Gerald R. Seppala. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Luxe One, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Moment Factory, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Legacy Film Crest, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Gerald R. Seppala waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Gerald R. Seppala. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon Steven J. Brown waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Donald Kindwald, Esq.. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. upon James David Williams waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/19/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. Waiver of Service signed by James David Williams. (Prouty, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gale, Paul) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Ecibsub, LLC, Olla Productions, LLC. (ghap) (mg). (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),, 1 as to Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams. (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Defendants Bipartisan Coalition for American Security Corporation, Steven J. Brown, Does 1-10, inclusive, Garuda Partners, Ltd., Highgate Pass, LLC, Legacy Film Crest, LLC, Luxe One, Inc., Moment Factory, LLC, Gerald R. Seppala, Visions LLC, James David Williams.Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich.(Filing fee $ 400:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Ecibsub, LLC, Bill A. Busbice, Jr, Olla Productions, LLC. (ghap) (mg). (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?