USA v. Sing
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cr-00212

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2020 at 8:26 PM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark J. Werksman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Mark J Werksman +1 213 688 0460 +1 213 624 1942 mwerksman@werksmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Touchton & Weinberger Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa A Weinberger +1 213 867 6350 +1 213 673 1386 melissa@twcounsel.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (215) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Petition on Probation and Supervised Release (Prob 12)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings September 22, 2015, September 24, 2015, September 25, 2015, September 29, 2015, January 4, 2016, April 25, 2016 and June 6, 2016 re Transcript 151 , 155 , 157 , 153 , 156 , 154 , 152 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Elias, Laura) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on June 6, 2016 at 1:10 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on April 25, 2016 at 2:20 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on January 4, 2016 at 12:16 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on September 29, 2015 at 9:47 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on September 25, 2015 at 9:37 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on September 24, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on September 22, 2015 at 9:52 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Laura Elias, phone number 213-894-0374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2017.(Elias, Laura) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings THURSDAY, AUGUST 20, 2015 11:36 A.M. re Transcript 148 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on THURSDAY, AUGUST 20, 2015 11:36 A.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, CONTACT: www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2017.(Nirenberg, C) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY AND CASE DOCUMENTS TO THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE; EXHIBIT A-MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings APRIL 24, 2014, 1:57 P.M. re Transcript 145 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(MacNeil, Sandra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on APRIL 24, 2014, 1:57 P.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SANDRA MACNEIL, phone number 213-894-5949; MACNEILSANDY@GMAIL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2016.(MacNeil, Sandra) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings 08/31/15 - 1:35 P.M re Transcript 143 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for proceedings held on 08/31/15 - 1:35 P.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez, phone number 213-894-2979; csrlisag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2016.(Gonzalez, Lisa) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re Notice of Appeal to USCA - Final Judgment 128 (Attachments: # 1 Designation Cont)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeal case number 16-50221, as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for Court Reporter. Order for: Criminal Appeal. Criminal case appeal. 60 day deadline automatically set. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: # 1 G-120 Cont, # 2 Voucher)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeal case number 16-50221, as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for Court Reporter. Order for: Criminal Appeal. Criminal case appeal. 60 day deadline automatically set. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: # 1 Voucher)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeal case number 16-50221, as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for Court Reporter. Order for: Criminal Appeal. Criminal case appeal. 60 day deadline automatically set. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: # 1 Voucher)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeal case number 16-50221, as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for Court Reporter. Order for: Criminal Appeal. Criminal case appeal. 60 day deadline automatically set. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: # 1 Voucher)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeal case number 16-50221, as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing for Court Reporter. Order for: Criminal Appeal. Criminal case appeal. 60 day deadline automatically set. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Attachments: # 1 Voucher)(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Elizabeth H Richardson-Royer on behalf of Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (Attorney Elizabeth H Richardson-Royer added to party Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing(pty:dft))(Richardson-Royer, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ORDER of USCA filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re Notice of Appeal 128 , CCA #16-50221. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court is denied as unnecessary. The motion of appellant's retained counsel, Melissa A. Weinberger, Esq., to withdraw as counsel of record and for appointment of appellate counsel is granted. Counsel will be appointed by separate order. The Clerk shall electronically serve this order on the appointing authority for the Central District of California, who will locate appointed counsel. [See document for details] (mat) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            VERIFICATION OF SURRENDER as to Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. The defendant was ordered to self-surrender to begin serving their sentence of imprisonment on 7/7/2016. The bond may be exonerated pending the verification as to whether the defendant is being electronically monitored by the U.S. Probation Office; confined to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons; or completed their jail time. As of 7/7/2016, it was verified the defendant has surrendered to the Bureau of Prisons. (gk) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. The Court hereby grants the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record 124 . Therefore, Werksman, Jackson Hathaway & Quinn, LLP is hereby relieved as defendant's counsel of record. Defendant, in pro per, filed his Notice of Appeal on 6/15/2016 128 . The portion within the above-referenced motion requesting assistance of appointed counsel, must be brought before the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (gk) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 127 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis as to Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1). (mat) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed 6/15/2016 124 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The Motion lacks a hearing date pursuant to Local Rules 6-1 and 7-4. Judge Snyder hears criminal motions on Mondays at 1:30 PM. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (gk) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-50221 as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA - Final Judgment 128 . (mat) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL to Appellate Court filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re Judgment and Commitment 123 . Filed on: 6/8/16; Entered on: 6/14/16; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (mat) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            AMENDED JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1), Count(s) 1s, 10s, 21s, 26s, and 30s, Defendant is committed on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment to the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months and one day, to be served concurrently. Supervised release for three years on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment, all such terms to run concurrently under the terms and conditions of the U. S. Probation Office and General Order 05-02. Special assessment of $500. All fines are waived. Count(s) 2s-9s, 11s-20s, 22s-25s, 27s-29s, and 31s-32s, The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant's Motion to Vacate Multiplicatus Counts 108 filed on 1/28/2016. Counts 2-9, 11-20, 22-25, 27-29, and 31-32, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Count(s) 33s, The Court found defendant not guilty as to Count 33 of the First Superseding Indictment. Count(s) 1-42, The underlying indictment is hereby dismissed. Defendant to surrender not later than 7/7/2016. Defendant advised of right of appeal. The Court hereby orders $500.00 belonging to and deposited by or on behalf of the defendant with the Court for the purposes of a criminal appearance bail bond to be applied to the payment of the special assessment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2044. The remaining bond shall be exonerated upon surrender. The Court further orders that defendant be permitted to travel to San Antonio, TX on 6/13/2016. Defendant shall return within 48 hours and check in with his Pretrial Officer within 24 hours of his return. (gk) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              AMENDED MINUTES OF SENTENCING Hearing 122 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1), Count(s) 1s, 10s, 21s, 26s, and 30s, Defendant is committed on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment to the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months and one day, to be served concurrently. Supervised release for three years on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment, all such terms to run concurrently under the terms and conditions of the U. S. Probation Office and General Order 05-02. Special assessment of $500. All fines are waived. Count(s) 2s-9s, 11s-20s, 22s-25s, 27s-29s, and 31s-32s, The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant's Motion to Vacate Multiplicatus Counts 108 filed on 1/28/2016. Counts 2-9, 11-20, 22-25, 27-29, and 31-32, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Count(s) 33s, The Court found defendant not guilty as to Count 33 of the First Superseding Indictment. Count(s) 1-42, The underlying indictment is hereby dismissed. Defendant to surrender not later than 7/7/2016. Defendant advised of right of appeal. The Court hereby orders $500.00 belonging to and deposited by or on behalf of the defendant with the Court for the purposes of a criminal appearance bail bond to be applied to the payment of the special assessment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2044. The remaining bond shall be exonerated upon surrender. The Court further orders that defendant be permitted to travel to San Antonio, TX on 6/13/2016. Defendant shall return within 48 hours and check in with his Pretrial Officer within 24 hours of his return. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Mark J. Werksman Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1), Count(s) 1s, 10s, 21s, 26s, and 30s, Defendant is committed on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment to the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months and one day, to be served concurrently. Supervised release for three years on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment, all such terms to run concurrently under the terms and conditions of the U. S. Probation Office and General Order 05-02. Special assessment of $500. All fines are waived. Count(s) 2s-9s, 11s-20s, 22s-25s, 27s-29s, and 31s-33s, The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant's Motion to Vacate Multiplicatus Counts 108 filed on 1/28/2016. Counts 2-9, 11-20, 22-25, 27-29, and 31-33, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The underlying indictment is hereby dismissed. Defendant to surrender not later than 7/7/2016. Defendant advised of right of appeal. The Court hereby orders $500.00 belonging to and deposited by or on behalf of the defendant with the Court for the purposes of a criminal appearance bail bond to be applied to the payment of the special assessment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2044. The remaining bond shall be exonerated upon surrender. The Court further orders that defendant be permitted to travel to San Antonio, TX on 6/13/2016. Defendant shall return within 48 hours and check in with his Pretrial Officer within 24 hours of his return. (gk) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF SENTENCING Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1), Count(s) 1s, 10s, 21s, 26s, and 30s, Defendant is committed on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment to the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months and one day, to be served concurrently. Supervised release for three years on each of Counts 1, 10, 21, 26, and 30 of the First Superseding Indictment, all such terms to run concurrently under the terms and conditions of the U. S. Probation Office and General Order 05-02. Special assessment of $500. All fines are waived. Count(s) 2s-9s, 11s-20s, 22s-25s, 27s-29s, and 31s-33s, The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant's Motion to Vacate Multiplicatus Counts 108 filed on 1/28/2016. Counts 2-9, 11-20, 22-25, 27-29, and 31-33, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The underlying indictment is hereby dismissed. Defendant to surrender not later than 7/7/2016. Defendant advised of right of appeal. The Court hereby orders $500.00 belonging to and deposited by or on behalf of the defendant with the Court for the purposes of a criminal appearance bail bond to be applied to the payment of the special assessment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2044. The remaining bond shall be exonerated upon surrender. The Court further orders that defendant be permitted to travel to San Antonio, TX on 6/13/2016. Defendant shall return within 48 hours and check in with his Pretrial Officer within 24 hours of his return. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. The Sentencing previously set for 06/06/2016 is hereby advanced as to the TIME ONLY from 2:00 PM to 1:00 PM. Defendant is ORDERED to appear on 06/06/2016 at 1:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing RE: Sentencing Memorandum 113 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weinberger, Melissa) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(White, Ryan) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. Supplemental Brief, not to exceed ten pages in length, shall be filed on or before 6/1/2016, as stated in Court and on the record. Upon receipt of the Supplemental Brief, defendant's Motion to Vacate Multiplicitous Counts 108 shall be taken under submission. Defendant's Sentencing is continued to 6/6/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendant is ORDERED to be present on 6/6/2016 at 2:00 PM, unless otherwise advised by his counsel of record. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (White, Ryan) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Multiplicitous Counts 108 , previously scheduled for 3/21/2016 at 2:00 PM has been rescheduled, pursuant to counsels' request. Motion hearing is continued to 4/25/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Sentencing is also continued to 4/25/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendant is ordered to be present on 4/25/2016 at 1:30 PM, unless advised otherwise by his attorney of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Show Cause Hearing
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Order to Show Cause Re Bond Revocation Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. The Court refers the defendant to the Probation Office for an investigation and Presentence Report, and sets a Sentencing date of 3/21/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendant is ORDERED to appear on 3/21/2016, unless otherwise advised by his counsel of record. Defendant shall remain on bond with electronic monitoring, and shall be restricted to his residence, except medical appointments or when pre-approved by his Pretrial Services Officer, until sentencing or further order from the Court. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL FUNDS FOR COURT APPOINTED EXPERT. (gk) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - NUNC PRO TUNC REQUEST for Additional Funds for Court Appointed Expert; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; [Proposed] Order. (gk) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (gk) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to File Nunc Pro Tunc Request for Additional Funds for Court Appointed Expert Under Seal; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; [Proposed] Order. (gk) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Application and Proposed Order filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Pursuant to the Order 99 , the Court hereby sets a hearing for Order to Show Cause Re: Bond Revocation on 01/04/2016 at 12:00 PM. Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing is ORDERED to appear on 01/04/2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release (PS 8)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON PETITION FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (gk) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Brief (non-motion, non-appeal) 96 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging, Local Rule 5-4.4.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 95 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to a Notice of Lodging, Local Rule 5-4.4.1.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Brief (non-motion) (non-appeal)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial as to Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (es) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL - 4th Day held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Government rests Rebuttal, Defendant rests. Closing arguments made. Filed Witness & Exhibit lists. Matter is hereby submitted and taken under submission. Counsel shall Lodge Proposed Findings on or before October 9, 2015. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (es) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL - 3rd Day held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Government rests. Motion for judgment of acquittal (FRCrP 29) submitted. Case continued to 9/29/2015, 9:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court reserves judgment on defendants Rule 29 Motion.Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (es) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL - 2nd Day held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 9/25/2015, 9:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (es) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S TRIAL MEMORANDUM of Facts and Law. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Sealing the Government's Trial Memorandum of Facts and Law; Declaration of AUSA Ryan White. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF COURT TRIAL - 1st Day, held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Bench Trial continued to 9/24/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing of Government's Ex Parte Application for Order Sealing Document; Declaration of Ryan White [Under Seal]; [Proposed] Order Sealing Document [Under Seal]; and Government's Document [Under Seal] filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing of Trial Memorandum filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR TRIAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, re Stipulation for Order 77 . (pj) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendant Derek Sing's Waiver of Jury Trial filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing RE: Motion to Dismiss Indictment 69 ; and Motion in Limine to Permit Certain Victim-Witnesses to be Present in the Courtroom During the Defense Expert's Testimony 67 . The Court DENIES defendant's motion to dismiss the indictment without prejudice. The Court GRANTS the government's motion in limine. (gk) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF GOVT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT VICTIM WITNESSES TO BE PRESENT IN COURTROOM DURING DEFENSE EXPERT'S TEST 67 DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DUPLICITY AND MULTIPLICITY 69 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel. The defendant waives his right to a jury trial. The Court orders defendant to file a written and signed jury waiver by September 4, 2015. The Court DENIES defendant's motion to dismiss the indictment without prejudice. The Court GRANTS the government's motion in limine. The Court trial is set for September 22, 2105 at 9:30 a.m. The estimated length of trial is 4 to 5 days. Each party is to file a Memorandum of Law by September 18, 2015. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (es) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Order Protective Order for Trial filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(White, Ryan) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel as stated in Court and on the record. The Court grants counsels request to continue the trial from September 15, 2015 to September 22, 2015 at 9:30 A.M., with the understanding that the Court may advance the start of trial to September 17, 2015 or September 18, 2015. The Court will notify counsel within the week. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (es) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER of Defendants Presence filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, previously scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 12:00 PM has been rescheduled. Status Conference is advanced to 8/20/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendant is ordered to be present on 8/20/2015 at 11:30 AM, unless advised otherwise by his attorney of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. re: MOTION in Limine to Permit Certain Victim-Witnesses to be Present in the Courtroom During the Defense Expert's Testimony 67 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1-33 69 , previously scheduled for 9/14/2015 at 1:00 PM has been rescheduled. Motions hearing is advanced to 8/31/2015 at 1:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Oppositions to the motions shall be filed on or before 8/24/2015 and reply to MOTION to Dismiss 69 shall be filed on or before 8/26/2015. No reply is to be filed on the MOTION in Limine 67 . Defendant is ordered to be present on 8/31/2015 at 1:30 PM, unless advised otherwise by his attorney of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss Counts (less than all counts)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of attorney Melissa A. Weinberger, (Retained), appearing on behalf of Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (Weinberger, Melissa) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None In Limine - Permit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, previously scheduled for 08/24/2015 1:30 PM has been rescheduled. Status Conference/Motions Hearing is continued to 8/27/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendant is ordered to be present on 8/27/2015 at 12:00 PM, unless advised otherwise by his attorney of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR A COURT APPOINTED EXPERT. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for Additional Funds for Court Appointed Expert; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; Proposed Order. (gk) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing of (1) Ex Parte Application for Order to File Under Seal [Under Seal]; (2) [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal [Under Seal]; (3) Ex Parte Application for Additional Funds for Court Appointed Expert; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; [Proposed] Order [Under Seal]; and (4) [Proposed] Order Granting Permission for a Court Appointed Expert [Under Seal] filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINDINGS OF EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS PURSUANT TO SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. NOTE: Changes Have Been Made to This Document. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN: The Trial in the matter is continued to September 15, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. The Status Conference/Motions hearing is continued to August 24, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. *See Order for details.* (es) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Continue Trial from July 14, 2015 to September 15, 2015 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR A COURT APPOINTED EXPERT (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT-SECOND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A COURT APPOINTED EXPERT; DECLARATION OF MELISSA A. WEINBERGER; DECLARATION OF NOE MARTINEZ EXHIBIT; PROPOSED ORDER (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT-EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DECLARATION OF MARK J WERKSMAN; PROPOSED ORDER (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-EX PARTE NOTICE OF EXECUTION OF MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING; EXHIBITS A,B, C, D,& E. (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT-ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT-EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL; DECLARATION OF MARK J. WERKSMAN; [PROPOSED] ORDER (pj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of Notice of Execution of Memorandum of Understanding filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Application filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO CONTINUE Trial by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Trial set for 7/14/2015 before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference set for 7/6/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (pj) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Arraignment - Superseding Indictment/Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF ARRAIGNMENT ON FIRST SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED 12/17/14 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel. Defendant is arraigned on the First Superseding Indictment filed December 17, 2014. Defendant acknowledges receipt of a copy of the First Superseding Indictment and waives reading thereof; Defendant pleads not guilty to all counts in the First Superseding Indictment. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (es) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Continue Trial from March 5, 2015 to July 14, 2015 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, re: First Superseding Indictment 42 . Arraignment on First Superseding Indictment Hearing is set on 1/28/2015 at 1:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Memorandum by U S Attorney re Investigative Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing regarding the following Magistrate Judge(s): Jacqueline Chooljian, Patrick J. Walsh, Sheri Pym, Michael Wilner, Jean Rosenbluth, Alka Sagar, and Douglas McCormick. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. This criminal action, being filed on 12/17/2014, was pending in the U. S. Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving criminal matters; and was not pending in the U. S. Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving criminal matters. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Case Summary (CR-72)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Tracy Wilkison as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing; defendants Year of Birth: 1971. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT Filed as to Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1) count(s) 1s-28s, 29s-33s. (gk) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR A COURT APPOINTED EXPERT (REVISED). (gk) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Revised Order for Court Appointed Expert; [Proposed] Order. (gk) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (gk) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; [Proposed] Order. (gk) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Application/Proposed Order filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR A COURT APPOINTED EXPERT. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for a Court Appointed Expert; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; Proposed Order. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal; Declaration of Mark J. Werksman; Proposed Order. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Application/Proposed Order filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Continue Trial from October 21, 2014 to March 3, 2015 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- EXPARTE NOTICE of Execution of Memorandum of Understanding; Exhibit A. (mat) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER granting Exparte Application to File Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- EXPARTE APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Notice of Execution of Memorandum of Understanding filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Werksman, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) 12 (mhe) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) 13 (mhe) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (No Justification) filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4) 14 (mhe) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 4/24/2014 as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. (gk) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINDINGS OF EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS PURSUANT TO SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Jury Trial is continued to 10/21/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference/Motions Hearing Date set for 9/29/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Continue Trial from June 17, 2014 to October 21, 2014 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Tracy L Wilkison on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Ryan White on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attorney Ryan White added to party USA(pty:pla))(White, Ryan) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DISCOVERY by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing, re Stipulation 15 . See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Tracy L Wilkison on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attorney Tracy L Wilkison added to party USA(pty:pla))(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Order Protective Order filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilkison, Tracy) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 5,000 by surety: Loree Tam Sing for Bond and Conditions (CR-1) 9 . Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (mhe) (Main Document 14 replaced on 7/9/2014) (mhe). (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 5,000 by surety: Everet Tam Sing for Bond and Conditions (CR-1) 9 . Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (mhe) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/9/2014) (mhe). (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 5,000 by surety: Edwin Tam Sing for Bond and Conditions (CR-1) 9 . Filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (mhe) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/9/2014) (mhe). (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1) Count 1-36,37-42. Defendant arraigned, states true name: As charged. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Mark J. Werksman, Retained present. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder. Hearing on Pending Motions set for 6/2/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference set for 6/2/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (tba) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PASSPORT RECEIPT from U. S. Pretrial Services as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. USA passport was received on 4/24/14. Re: Bond and Conditions (CR-1) 9 . (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing conditions of release: $20,000 Appearance Bond, see attached bond for terms and conditions approved by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; filed by Mark J Werksman appearing for Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ARREST ON INDICTMENT HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. Defendant states true name as charged. Court orders bail set as: Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1) $20,000 Appearance bond, see attached bond for terms and conditions. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. PIA held, see separate minutes. Court Reporter: Sandra McNeil. (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing; defendants Year of Birth: 1971; date of arrest: 4/24/2014 (mhe) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing. This criminal action, being filed on 4/15/14, was not pending in the U. S. Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, and Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell began receiving criminal matters. (ja) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing in regards to the following Magistrate Judges: Jacqueline Chooljian, Patrick J. Walsh, Sheri Pym, Michael Wilner, Alka Sagar, Jean Rosenbluth, Douglas McCormick (ja) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Stephanie Christensen as to Defendant Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing; defendant's Year of Birth: 1971 (ja) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT Filed as to Derek Wai Hung Tam Sing (1) count(s) 1-36, 37-42. Offense occurred in LA. (ja) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 372 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?