Tran et al v. Abdon Callais Offshore LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00999

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 1:43 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ha, Nguyen, Plaintiff
No Logo Hue Nguyen, Plaintiff
No Logo Lanh Tran, Plaintiff
No Logo Phuc Vo, Plaintiff
No Logo Thuan Vo Tran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ryan E. Beasley, Sr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Ellis Beasley, Sr. +1 504 220 3944 +1 504 684 1231 ryan@rbeasleylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loyola Law School Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anh Quang Cao +1 504 368 0491 acao@loyno.edu
No Logo Tran & Peter LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Trinh Van Tran, Plaintiff
No Logo Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Charles M Callais, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Corey Callais, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Jack Preston Sears, Jr., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cherrell R. Simms +1 504 658 9910 +1 504 621 4975 crsimms@nola.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Emerson Galloway +1 504 525 6802 +1 504 525 2456 jgalloway@gjtbs.com
Space Jennifer Lynne Sinder +1 504 525 6802 jsinder@gjtbs.com
No Logo Charles M Callais, Defendant
No Logo Corey Callais, Defendant
No Logo Jack Preston Sears, Jr., Defendant
No Logo St. Joseph the Worker, Defendant
No Logo Thuan Vo Tran, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Tran & Peter LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Tom's Marine and Salvage, LLC, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy, Rogers, Sloss & Gambel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy David DePaula +1 504 523 0400 +1 504 523 5574 tdepaula@mrsnola.com
Space Peter B. Tompkins +1 504 523 0400 ptompkins@mrsnola.com
  Entries (168) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None Return of Exhibit
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order of Distribution of Funds
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Request
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Request/Statement of Oral Argument
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Deposit Funds
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Deposit Funds
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Interrogatories Propounded
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Writ Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Writ of Garnishment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Writ Issued
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Trial Exhibit List
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Completed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Held
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/22/2015, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Answer to Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: Status Conference held on 9/24/2014; Dismissing as moot 65 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to MSJ, Denying 61 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Surveillance, Dismissing as moot 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memo to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion in Limine. Status Conference set for 10/23/2014 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 59 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Nancy Favaloro and Dr. Rice - Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/24/2014 before Judge Jay C. Zainey. No further action is necessary. (bwn) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Settlement Conference held on 8/21/2014. Negotiations were unsuccessful and a settlement was not reached. (NEF:ZAINEY) (cml) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 50 Motion to Enroll Jennifer Lynne Sinder as additional counsel for Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais and Jack Preston Sears, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais, Jack Preston Sears, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Galloway, John) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: Status Conference held on 1/7/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2014 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form) (jrc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Cherrell R. Simms for Abdon Callais Offshore, LLC. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/7/14. (jrc, ) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cml, ) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Cherrell R. Simms as Attorney by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais, Jack Preston Sears, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Galloway, John) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Status Conference held on 11/21/2013. Follow-up Status Conference set for 1/7/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc, ) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Status Conference reset for 11/21/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Status Conference held on 9/19/2013, GRANTING 39 MOTION to Continue Trial; Status Conference set for 11/14/2013 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey to select new dates. (jrc, ) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re 39 MOTION to Continue Trial . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Galloway, John) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The 35 Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM is CANCELED because the matter is not ripe for settlement negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (NEF:ZAINEY)(clm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: 39 MOTION to Continue Trial; Status Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/11/13.(jrc, ) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Trial by Ha Nguyen, Hue Nguyen, Lanh Tran, Thuan Vo Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Tran & Peter LLC, Phuc Vo. Motion set for 9/25/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cao, Anh) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Witness List by All Defendants. (Galloway, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais, Ha Nguyen, Hue Nguyen, Jack Preston Sears, Jr, Lanh Tran, Thuan Vo Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Tran & Peter LLC, Phuc Vo re 36 Order on 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (Simms, Cherrell) Modified on 5/30/2013 (gbw, ). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: Status Conference held on 5/22/2013, Granting in part and Denying in part 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2013 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2013 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/22/2013. (NEF: Sect A)(caa, ) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMO filed by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC in support of 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (jrc, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memo. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/4/13. (jrc, ) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Galloway, John) Modified on 4/4/2013 (gbw, ). (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Beasley, Ryan) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Beasley, Ryan) Modified on 4/3/2013 (gbw, ). (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey: Status Conference held on 3/26/2013. Follow-up Status Conference set for 5/22/2013 10:45 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc, ) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Exhibit C to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/14/13. (jrc, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend pages 24-25 of Exhibit C to 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit C)(Simms, Cherrell) Modified on 3/13/2013 (gbw, ). (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC. Motion set for 4/10/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Notice of Submission, # 4 Exhibit A-C)(Simms, Cherrell) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/15/2013 per order #28)(jrc, ). (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Status Conference held on 2/6/2013, GRANTING 20 MOTION to Continue Trial. Status Conference set for 3/26/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc, ) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 20 MOTION to Continue Trial; Status Conference set for 2/6/2013 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc, ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 22 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Trial. Filing attorney did not select Trinh Van Tran, Hue Nguyen, Phuc Vo, Lanh Tran, Ha Nguyen, Tran & Peter LLC as a filers. Clerk added filers. (gbw, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Trial by Thuan Vo Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Hue Nguyen, Phuc Vo, Lanh Tran, Ha Nguyen, Tran & Peter LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Ryan) Modified on 2/4/2013 (gbw, ). (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re 20 MOTION to Continue Trial . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Galloway, John) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Trial by Ha Nguyen, Hue Nguyen, Lanh Tran, Thuan Vo Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Tran & Peter LLC, Phuc Vo. Motion set for 2/13/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Cao, Anh) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Settlement Conference held on 1/24/2013. Negotiations were unsuccessful and a settlement was not reached. (NEF:ZAINEY) (clm, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 17 Motion to Enroll as Co-Counsel of Record Attorney Cherrell R. Simms for Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais and Jack Preston Sears, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/24/13. (jrc, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Charles M Callais, Corey Callais, Jack Preston Sears, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Galloway, John) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List by All Plaintiffs. (Beasley, Ryan) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Beasley, Ryan) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List by All Defendants. (Galloway, John) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Galloway, John) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/13/12. (jrc, ) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 10 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines Filing attorney did not select Jack Preston Sears, Jr., Corey Callais, Charles M. Callais, Abdon Callais Offshore LLC as a filer(s). Clerk added filer(s). When filing jointly, select all parties involved. (gbw, ) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Ha Nguyen, Hue Nguyen, Lanh Tran, Thuan Vo Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Tran & Peter LLC, Phuc Vo, Jack Preston Sears, Jr., Corey Callais, Charles M. Callais, Abdon Callais Offshore LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Beasley, Ryan) Modified on 11/14/2012 (gbw, ). (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Settlement Conference presently set for 1/17/2013 10:00 AM is RESET to 1/24/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/8/2012.(clm, ) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/14/2012.(rll, ) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2013 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/7/12. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 4 Counterclaim by Thuan Vo Tran, Tran & Peter LLC.(Beasley, Ryan) Modified text on 6/8/2012 (gbw, ). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2012 9:45 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone, by Clerk. (jrc, ) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Thuan Vo Tran, Tran & Peter LLC by Jack Preston Sears, Jr, Charles M Callais, Abdon Callais Offshore LLC, Corey Callais.(Galloway, John) Modified texton 5/2/2012 (gbw, ). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv, ) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Fee previously paid) filed by Lanh Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Ha Nguyen, Hue Nguyen, Thuan Vo Tran, Phuc Vo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beasley, Ryan) Modified on 4/20/2012 (gbw, ). (Waiver of Service Requested) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERROR: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT, REFILED AS DOC. #2** COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-3477925) filed by Lanh Tran, Trinh Van Tran, Ha Nguyen, Tran & Peter LLC, Hue Nguyen, Thuan Vo Tran, Phuc Vo.(Beasley, Ryan) Modified on 4/20/2012 (gbw, ). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?