Spencer v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-04992

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 3:25 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lawrence Spencer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lowell Hubert +1 718 522 4646 +1 718 522 0487 hubertlaw@mac.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira Rachel Siskind +1 212 356 2414 +1 212 788 9776 ssiskind@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Police Officer Christopher Alvarado, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira Rachel Siskind +1 212 356 2414 +1 212 788 9776 ssiskind@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officer Jay Rivera, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira Rachel Siskind +1 212 356 2414 +1 212 788 9776 ssiskind@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Police Officers John Does, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira Rachel Siskind +1 212 356 2414 +1 212 788 9776 ssiskind@law.nyc.gov
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?