Mpala v. Sires
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01226

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2017 at 12:38 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zewee Mpala, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Lengyel +1 203 414 3457 +1 203 367 9678 tomgunlengyel@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zewee Mpala

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zewee Mpala
v.
No Logo Paul Sires, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clendenen & Shea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Clendenen, Jr. +1 203 787 1183 +1 203 787 2847 office@clenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clendenen & Shea, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maura Mastrony +1 203 787 1183 +1 203 787 2847 mam@clenlaw.com
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER finding as moot 83 motion for protective order; finding as moot 85 motion to quash. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/13/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 67 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Rose Longo-McLean terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/13/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER denying 66 motion to strike. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/13/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting 61 and 62 motions to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Thomas J. Lengyel terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/13/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 60 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney John R. Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/13/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying 77 motion to consolidate cases. The court has denied the plaintiff's motion to reopen this case. Therefore, there is nothing to consolidate with the Mpala v. Funaro, 3:13cv252 case. The clerk shall consider this case closed. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/12/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying 63 , 75 and 76 motions for sanctions; the plaintiff having failed to allege facts justifying the relief sought. Further, the court has entered judgment in favor of the defendants and the second circuit has dismissed the plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/12/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying 58 motion to reopen case. The plaintiff bases his motion on trial counsel's alleged errors and misconduct. The second circuit has recognized that "motions for relief from an order or judgment based on an attorney's error or misconduct are generally made pursuant to Rule 60(b)." Gomez v. City of New York, 805 F.3d 419, 423 (2d Cir. 2015). With respect to federal rule 60(b)(1), the plaintiff has failed to file the motion within a year from the date the court entered judgment. Further, his arguments and evidence were, or could have been, previously litigated and the plaintiff has failed to provide sufficient evidence of fraud warranting relief under rule 60(b)(3) or 60(b)(6). With respect to the plaintiff's claim of gross negligence, rule 60(b) does not provide a basis for such a claim. Nemaizer v. Baker, 793 F.2d 58, 63 (2d Cir. 1986). The 58 motion to Amend/Correct and 74 motion to amend/correct are denied; the court having previously concluded that plaintiff's claims are procedurally barred or lack merit and the plaintiff having unduly delayed the filing of the proposed amended complaint. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/12/17. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Quash
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY to Objection to 74 MOTION to Amend/Correct 58 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Zewee Mpala. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions by Zewee Mpala.Responses due by 5/16/2017 (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED MOTION for Sanctions by Zewee Mpala.Responses due by 5/16/2017 (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 58 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Zewee Mpala.Responses due by 5/16/2017 (Pipech, L.) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MANDATE of USCA dated 4/12/2017 Dismissing 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Zewee Mpala (Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY to 68 Objection to 63 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Zewee Mpala. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY to 64 Objection to 58 MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Zewee Mpala. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Appearance Pro Se
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance by Zewee Mpala (Owens, T.) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint () by Zewee Mpala.Responses due by 3/15/2017 (Owens, T.) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for ruling on the plaintiff's motion 54 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/21/16.Motions referred to Robert A. Richardson(Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER denying 51 motion for reconsideration. The plaintiff may refile his motion to proceed in forma pauperis on or before August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/28/16. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            OBJECTION to Motion for Reconsideration filed by Paul Sires. (Attachments: # 1 Unreported Cases)(Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by Zewee Mpala.Responses due by 5/13/2016 (Lengyel, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 48 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Although the plaintiff has filed the requisite affidavit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), the plaintiff has failed to state a basis for appeal sufficient for the court to conclude that the appeal is "taken in good faith" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §(a)(3). Therefore, the plaintiff may not proceed in forma pauperis on his appeal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 04/07/16. (Covello, Alfred) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Index to Record on Appeal by Zewee Mpala re 47 Notice of Appeal, 36 Order Returning Submission, 31 MOTION to Quash , 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 48 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until an additional ninety (90) days of the 26(f) Report deadlines, 27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 33 Notice of Appearance, 44 Exhibit, 28 Affidavit, 37 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 25 Scheduling Order, 22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, 40 MOTION for Reconsideration , 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 1 Complaint, 24 Remark, 39 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 8 Notice of Appearance, 12 Answer to Complaint, 45 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 46 Order on Motion to Quash, 20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, 34 Reply to Response to Motion, 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days from Court's decision on Motion to Compel and-or Judgment on Pleadings in companion case Mpala v. Funaro, et al. 3-13-cv-252, 41 Objection, 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 7 Summons Returned Executed, 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint, 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days of the 26(f) Report deadlines, 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4-23-15;5-22-15;6-22-15; and 7-2-15 regarding the 26(f) deadlines, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 15 Scheduling Order, 35 Notice of Appearance, 2 Notice of Appearance, 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 29 Statement of Material Facts, 43 Response, 13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 9 Notice of Appearance, 42 MOTION for Reconsideration REPLY BRIEF, 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 17, 2015to FILE Motion for ReConsideration, 23 Scheduling Order, 5 Electronic Service Documents, 6 Electronic Summons Issued. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Zewee Mpala. (Lengyel, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER finding as moot 31 motion to quash. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on December 10, 2015. (Ricciardi, S.) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 40 motion for reconsideration, but denying the relief requested; finding as moot 42 motion for reconsideration. The court's ruling shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on December 9, 2015. (Covello, A.) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration of 37 RULING granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment by Zewee Mpala. Responses due by 10/8/2015 (Lengyel, Thomas) Modified on 10/16/2015 to link to ruling (Grady, B.). Modified on 10/16/2015 to create assocciation (Grady, B.). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 motion for extension of time. The court grants the plaintiff's motion for extension of time with respect to the motion for reconsideration and denies the plaintiff's motion with respect to any other deadlines. Any future requests for extensions of time must specifically identify the relevant procedural deadlines. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 8, 2015.(Ricciardi, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order Returning Submission
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Motion to Dismiss Counsel returned to ZeeWee D. Mpala as to Zewee Mpala. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/23/15.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/23/2015 Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2015 Trial Brief due by 6/22/2015 Trial Ready Date 7/2/2015 Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/19/2015.(Alexander, R.) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Please note docket entry #23 was entered in error. (Alexander, R.) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Please note correction to deadline. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2015 Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/19/2015.(Alexander, R.) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 21 motion for extension of time. The scheduling order shall be modified as follows: all discovery, including depositions of all witnesses, shall be completed on or before April 23, 2015; any and all dispositive motions, if necessary, shall be filed on or before May 22, 2015; the parties shall file a joint trial memorandum in accordance with the standing order regarding trial memoranda on or before June 22, 2015; and the case shall be ready for trial on July 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 13, 2015. (Smith, C) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 19 motion for extension of time. The scheduling order shall be modified as follows: all discovery, including depositions of all witnesses, shall be completed by March 30, 2015; any and all dispositive motions, if necessary, shall be filed on or before April 29, 2015; the parties shall file a joint trial memorandum in accordance with the standing order regarding trial memoranda on or before May 29, 2015; and the case shall be ready for trial on June 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on January 16, 2015. (Smith, C) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 17 motion for extension of time. The scheduling order shall be modified as follows: all discovery, including depositions of all witnesses, shall be completed by January 29, 2015; any and all dispositive motions, if necessary, shall be filed on or before February 28, 2015; the parties shall file a joint trial memorandum in accordance with the standing order regarding trial memoranda on or before March 30, 2015; and the case shall be ready for trial on April 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on October 31, 2014. (Smith, C) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 14 motion for extension of time. The outstanding deadlines shall be extended by sixty (60) days. The court will issue a scheduling order which will reflect the new deadlines. If the issue in the companion case, Mpala v. Funaro, remains unresolved as the new deadlines approach, the parties may then seek a further extension of time. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 5, 2014. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Paul Sires.(Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 10 motion for extension of time. The deadline for the defendant's response to the complaint shall be extended to October 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on September 11, 2013. (Meskill, J) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint by Paul Sires. (Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Mastrony on behalf of Paul Sires (Mastrony, Maura) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Shea on behalf of Paul Sires (Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zewee Mpala. Paul Sires served on 8/29/2013, answer due 9/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Paul Sires* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Zewee Mpala, 1 Complaint filed by Zewee Mpala. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/26/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/26/13. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2013 Discovery due by 2/25/2014. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Zewee Mpala (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Paul Sires ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2981929.), filed by Zewee Mpala.(Williams, John) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?