Mendes et al v. FEDEX Ground Package System, Inc.,
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-03826

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 6:34 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Costaniera Transport, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by The Jaffe Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bailey Bifoss +1 415 618 0100 +1 415 618 0080 bailey.k.bifoss@jaffetriallaw.com
No Logo Hiram Mendes, Plaintiff

Represented by The Jaffe Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bailey Bifoss +1 415 618 0100 +1 415 618 0080 bailey.k.bifoss@jaffetriallaw.com
Space Stephen R. Jaffe +1 415 618 0100 +1 415 618 0080 stephenrjaffe@gmail.com
No Logo Kim Raney, Plaintiff
No Logo Kim Raney , Plaintiff

Represented by The Jaffe Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bailey Bifoss +1 415 618 0100 +1 415 618 0080 bailey.k.bifoss@jaffetriallaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Jaffe +1 415 618 0100 +1 415 618 0080 stephen.r.jaffe@jaffetriallaw.com
No Logo KR Express, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsey N Berg +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 907 8701 lberg@schiffhardin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William John Carroll +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 WCarroll@schiffhardin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?