Heitland et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:13-cv-00168
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 7:35 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jan Heitland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meshbesher & Spence Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L Davick , +1 507 280 8090 +1 507 280 0807 adavick@meshbesher.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J Nemo , +1 612 339 9121 +1 612 339 9188 tnemo@meshbesher.com
No Logo Michael Heitland, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Howmedica Osteonics Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy P Griffin +1 612 335 1500 +1 612 335 1657 timothy.griffin@stinsonleonard.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3 (Agenda for September 9, 2013, Status Conference). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/5/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. 1. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE All parties shall appear for an initial status conference on Monday, September 9, 2013, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 7C, 7th Floor, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Minnesota. An order setting forth an agenda and the related procedure for the initial status conference will be forthcoming. 2. EXTENSION AND STAY As was done for the Defendants' in Pretrial Order No. 1, each Plaintiff is granted an indefinite extension of time for filing any motion or responding to any pending motion until this Court, by subsequent order, sets a date by which Plaintiffs shall submit or respond to any motions. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/22/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (Establishing Preliminary Procedures and Appointing Interim Counsel). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/05/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(rlb) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaints are hereby extended until such time that the Court establishes a time line for such responses. By separate order, the Court will set a status conference for a date and time to be determined in August for all cases in the MDL. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 07/01/2013. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(rlb) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding MDL No. 2441, In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank for all further proceedings. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to case. (TSS) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Staying Case pending further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Order Attachment)(kll) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER STAYING CASE pending further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 03/14/13. Associated Cases: 0:13-cv-00156-RHK-FLN et al.(kll) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Response to Requested Stays. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                    LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Jan Heitland, Michael Heitland Joint Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Objecting to Reassignment Request. (Zimmerman, Genevieve) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 13cv168 RHK/FLN. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle and Judge David S. Doty on 2/20/2013. (JME) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. regarding Request for Reassignment of Related Cases. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P Griffin on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Griffin, Timothy) Modified on 2/19/2013 (MMP). (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Howmedica Osteonics Corp (HOC) (incorrectly identified as Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics) states that it is a private, non-governmental party and that HOC is not a publicly traded corporation. HOC is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation, which is a publicly traded company. (Griffin, Timothy) Modified text on 2/20/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P Griffin on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Griffin, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (lmb) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 13-cv-00168 (DSD/TNL). (lmb) Modified on 1/24/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0864-3421012.) Filed by Jan Heitland, Michael Heitland. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nemo, Anthony) Modified text on 1/22/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 01/21/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?