USA v. Browne et al
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-mj-01528

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 12:01 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Marina Browne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: CJA Appointment Harry H. Rimm +1 212 660 3000 +1 212 660 3001 hrimm@sandw.com
No Logo Jonathan Williams, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelley J. Sharkey +1 718 858 8843 +1 718 875 0053 kelleysharkeyesq@verizon.net
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jonathan Williams addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Harry Rimm, Esq dated 1/8/2015 re: USA v Marina Browne, 14 Mag 1528. Mr. Rimm respectfully request that the Court approve reimbursement for his colleague' time in excess of ten hours, subject to review of our bills and related worksheets by the CJA Office. Reimbursement is Approved for up to 10 hours of the associate's time. The request for reimbursement for any time exceeding 10 hours is DENIED, asit was not pre-approved as is required under the CJA plan. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/12/2015)(dif) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER as to Marina Browne addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from CJA atty Harry H. Rimm dated 12/11/2014 re: requesting that the Court authorize reimbursement for his colleague's time subject to a review of their bills and related worksheets by the CJA Office....ENDORSEMENT: Under the Second Circuit Court of Appeals' CJA policies, which governs the CJA plans adopted by the circuit's district courts, compensation for work performed by associates assisting a CJA panel member is permitted only if prior approval for the associates work is obtained from the Court, when it is anticipated that billing for the associates will exceed ten hours. It is unclear from the instant letter whether the associate has performed in excess of ten hours work on this case. If so, compensation cannot be authorized, since it appears that prior approval for compensating the associate was not obtained. In such a circumstance, the Court is constrained to deny the request. If fewer than ten hours of work have been performed by the associate, prior court approval for compensation would not be necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 12/15/2014)(gq) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AFFIRMATION of Max Nicholas in Support by USA as to Jonathan Williams, the government is requesting a continuance until 10/14/14. (jbo) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER DISMISSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE COMPLAINT as to Marina Browne, Keith Frazier. U.S. Marshals withdraw warrants. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 9/10/14)(jbo) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jonathan Williams. Time excluded from 8/13/14 until 9/12/14. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 8/13/14)(jbo) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIRMATION of Max Nicholas in Support by USA as to Jonathan Williams, the government is requesting a continuance until 9/12/14. (jbo) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Harry H. Rimm appearing for Marina Browne. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. (Rimm, Harry) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Marina Browne. Time excluded from 8/11/14 until 9/10/14. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 8/11/14)(jbo) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIRMATION of Max Nicholas in Support by USA as to Marina Browne, the government is requesting a continuance until 9/10/14. (jbo) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MEMO-ENDORSED ORDER denying 19 LETTER MOTION that the bail condition directing that Ms. Browne not have access to social security numbers be removed, as to Marina Browne (1). DENIED. EVEN IF THERE ARE VERIFICATION CONCERNS, THE RESTRICTION IS A GOOD ONE. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 8/14/2014) (gq). (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Max Nicholas dated August 14, 2014 re: Bail Modification as to Marina Browne. Document filed by USA as to Marina Browne. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        CJA 20 as to Jonathan Williams: Appointment of Attorney Kelley Sharkey for Jonathan Williams. (Appointed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/14/14)(ade) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          CJA 20 as to Marina Browne: Appointment of Attorney Harry Rimm for Marina Browne. (Appointed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/14/14)(ade) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Keith Frazier addressed to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox from Christopher Flood, Esq dated 7/21/2014 re: USA v Keith Frazier, 14 Mag 1528. Mr. Flood Respectfully Request that The Court Modify Mr. Frazier's Bail Conditions to Extend his Travel Limited to Include The District of New Jersey, Application Granted, So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 7/22/2014)(dif) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Marina Browne addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Harry Rimm, Esq dated 7/18/2014 re: USA v Marina Browne, 14 Mag 1528.. Mr. Rimm Respectfully Request that The Court Modify Ms. Browne's Bail Conditions to Attend her Sister's Fanny J. Browne's Wedding in Houston, Texas on Saturday, August 9, 2014. Ms. Browne will Depart on Friday, August 8, 2014 and Returning on Sunday, August 10, 2014, Application Granted, So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/18/2014)(dif) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Jonathan Williams in amount of $50,000. Co-signed by 2 financially responsible persons. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Strict pretrial supervision. Other conditions: No employment with personal information of others; no ID documents. Deft to be detained until all conditions are met. (gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Marina Browne in amount of $10,000. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Regular pretrial supervision. Other conditions: Deft not to have access to social security numbers. Deft to be released on own signature. (gq). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck:Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Williams held on 7/14/2014. Deft appears with CJA atty Kelley Sharkey. AUSA Max Nicholas present for the gov't. Agreed conditions of release: $50,000 PRB. 2 FRP. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Strict pretrial supervision. Other conditions: No employment with personal information of others; no ID documents. Deft to be detained until all conditions are met. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck:Initial Appearance as to Marina Browne held on 7/14/2014. Deft appears with CJA atty Harry Rimm. AUSA Max Nicholas present for the gov't. Agreed conditions of release: $10,000 PRB. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Regular pretrial supervision. Other conditions: Deft not to have access to social security numbers. Deft to be released on own signature. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jonathan Williams. Approved. Appointed CJA atty Kelley Sharkey. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Marina Browne. Approved. Appointed CJA atty Harry Rimm. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Keith Frazier in amount of $10,000. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Regular pretrial supervision. Other conditions: Deft to submit to urine analysis performed by Pretrial Services Office. If the analysis is positive for a controlled substance, the deft will be subject to drug testing and treatment as deemed appropriate by Pretrial Services Office and his supervision status will be deemed strict. Deft to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 7/24/14.(gq) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox:Initial Appearance as to Keith Frazier held on 7/12/2014. Deft appears with Assistant Federal Defender atty Christopher Flood by Sabrina Shroff. AUSA Max Nicholas present for the gov't. $10,000 PRB. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY. Regular pretrial supervision. Other conditions: Deft to submit to urine analysis performed by Pretrial Services Office. If the analysis is positive for a controlled substance, the deft will be subject to drug testing and treatment as deemed appropriate by Pretrial Services Office and his supervision status will be deemed strict. Deft to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 7/24/14.( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/11/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (gq) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Keith Frazier. Christopher Aaron Flood for Keith Frazier appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 7/12/2014)(gq) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Keith Frazier. Approved. Appointed Assistant Federal Defender atty Christopher Flood by Sabrina Shroff. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox) (gq) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    COMPLAINT as to Marina Browne (1), Jonathan Williams (2), Keith Frazier (3) in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1028A, 1029(b)(2). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox) (gq) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 393 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?