Martin v. Bailey
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01384

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 2:41 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward P. Martin , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Jaye Bailey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy A. Brouillet +1 860 808 5340 nancy.brouillet@ct.gov
Space Tammy D. Geathers +1 860 808 5340 tammy.geathers@po.state.ct.us
No Logo Shyam S Lodha, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Release of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, and judgment shall enter in favor of defendants on all claims. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/4/2015. (Ramesh, S)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 42 Motion to Seal Permission to File Under Seal June 16, 2014 Deposition Transcript of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/26/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time Until August 29, 2014 extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. No further extensions to file dispositive motions will be granted.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/25/2014. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Until August 29, 2014 extend Dispositive Motions Deadline by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/2/2014. (Steinfeld, Sarah) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/2/2014. (Steinfeld, Sarah) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 2, 2014 and July 18, 2014, respectively to receive Plaintiff's medical records and take Plaintiff's deposition, and to file dispositive motions by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tammy D. Geathers terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/14. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting, absent objection, 29 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery shall be completed by 5/3/14 and dispositive motions shall by filed by 6/18/14.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/14. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 3/24/14.(Walker, J.) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Tammy D. Geathers to Withdraw as Attorney by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Written Consent of Plaintiff's Counsel by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy A. Brouillet on behalf of Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha in their individual capacities. My appearance is in lieu of Tammy D. Geathers, Assistant Attorney General, already on file. (Brouillet, Nancy) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 3, 2014 for the discovery deadline; and to June 18, 2014 for the dispositive motion deadline by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/27/2013. (Martin, M.) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until January 18, 2014 To Respond to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Edward P. Martin. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 25 Motion to amend scheduling order. The requested schedule is adopted. Discovery shall be completed by 3/3/14 and dispositive motions shall be filed by 4/18/14. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/16/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 3, 2014 for the discovery deadline; and to April 18, 2014 for the dispositive motion deadline by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 22 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Reopen Case by Edward P. Martin.Responses due by 9/21/2013 (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/31/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Security for Costs posted by Edward P. Martin. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/29/2013.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 18 Motion to dismiss for failure to comply with court order to post security for costs.. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/29/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Default for Failure to Post Security for Costs bond re 12 Order on Motion for Security for Costs,, by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha.Responses due by 4/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments A and B)(Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint contained in 1 Notice of Removal with Affirmative Defenses by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha.(Geathers, Tammy) Modified on 1/25/2013 TO LINK TO DOC #1 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint contained in 1 Notice of Removal,. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/4/13. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 24, 2013 to file Responsive Pleading to the Complaint contained in 1 Notice of Removal by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) Modified on 12/10/2012 TO LINK TO DOC #1 (Oliver, T.). (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER re 9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Report approved. Discovery due by 10/1/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2013. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/23/12. (Sbalbi, B.) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time until November 15, 2012 to file Responsive Pleading 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2012. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER granting 10 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2012. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2012 to file Responsive Pleading 1 Notice of Removal, by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Security for Costs by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Tammy D. Geathers on behalf of Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha, 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha, 5 Docket Entry Correction re 1 Notice of Removal; Updated Caption Page, 4 Statement Regarding Removal filed by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/27/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 12/27/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2012. Discovery due by 3/29/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2013. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2012. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Docket Entry Correction re 1 Notice of Removal; Updated Caption page. (Torres, K.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha (Statement Regarding Removal) (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha (Notice of Pending Motions) (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy D. Geathers on behalf of Jaye Bailey, Shyam S Lodha in their individual capacities (Geathers, Tammy) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shyam S Lodha, Jaye Bailey from Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV-12-6032751-S. Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0205-2639359, filed by Shyam S Lodha, Jaye Bailey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Geathers, Tammy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2012: # 3 Replacement Caption Page) (Torres, K.). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?