Securities And Exchange Commission v. Apuzzo

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-01910
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 7:51 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria S. Shin +1 212 218 5539 +1 212 344 1222 vshin@seyfarth.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Hughes +1 203 821 3802 +1 203 773 5373 john.hughes@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley B. Atkins +1 202 551 4820 +1 202 772 9237 atkinsl@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Derrick Stodghill +1 202 551 4413 +1 202 772 9246 stodghillc@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph F. Apuzzo, Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa J. Armstrong +1 202 551 4724 +1 212 259 2586 armstrongme@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 09/04/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Jane Hart +1 212 408 2519 +1 212 259 2519 lisa.hart@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bridget Madden Moore +1 202 639 7740 bridget.moore@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 09/04/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen Patricia Reid +1 212 408 2521 +1 212 259 2521 maureen.reid@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica A. Rosenbaum +1 212 408 2586 +1 212 259 2586 Jessica.Rosenbaum@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SETH T. TAUBE +1 212 408 2500 +1 212 408 2501 seth.taube@bakerbotts.com

Represented by Etowah County Detention Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. McHugh +1 203 955 1702 +1 203 286 1741 pmchugh@patrickmchughlaw.com

Represented by goralaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Gora +1 203 424 8021 +1 203 549 0410 RICH@GORALAW.COM
Other Parties
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. McGarry +1 203 821 3751 +1 203 773 5378 Michael.McGarry@USDOJ.GOV
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Witness List
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Trial Memo
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Motion to Withdraw Maureen P. Reid and Lisa J. Hart as Attorney of Record for Defendant Joseph F. Apuzzo (Doc. No. 120 ) is hereby GRANTED. The appearances of Attorney Lisa J. Hart and Attorney Maureen P. Reid are terminated. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 09/04/2015. (Koehler, S) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Good Standing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing on post-judgment motion to be filed by the plaintiff set for 1/12/2016 at 09:30 AM in South Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. (Koehler, S) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
ORDER granting 116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2015. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Consent Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Doc. No. 114 ) is hereby GRANTED, absent objection. Further proceedings in this matter are stayed until December 16, 2014. The Clerk shall add a STAYED flag for this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/17/2014. (Koehler, S) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
ORDER granting 112 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bridget Moore. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/14. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 110 ) is hereby GRANTED. All dispositive motions or motions to strike expert testimony shall be filed by October 16, 2014. Responses to all such motions shall be filed by November 17, 2014. Replies shall be due by December 1, 2014. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 07/18/2014. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 8/7/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 104 was withdrawn. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/19/14. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order (Docket No. 104) (Doc. No. 105 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 05/19/2014. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 106 is hereby GRANTED. All dispositive motions or motions to strike expert testimony shall be filed by July 18, 2014. Responses to all such motions shall be filed by August 18, 2014. Replies shall be due by September 1, 2014. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/19/14. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 6/6/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Joint Motion for Modifcation of Scheduling Order (Docket No. 104) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Taube, Seth) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 6/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 77 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 03/31/2014. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 101 is hereby GRANTED. Dispositive motions, or motions to strike expert testimony, shall be filed by May 19, 2014. Responses shall be filed by June 18, 2014. Replies will be due by July 2, 2014. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/19/14. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 3/7/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) Modified on 2/21/2014 to correct motion relief (Ferguson, L.). Modified on 2/21/2014 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 99 is hereby GRANTED. All dispositive motions or motions to strike expert testimony shall be filed by February 17, 2014. Responses shall be due by March 19, 2014. Replies are due by April 2, 2014. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/13/14. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION Modifying Scheduling Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 1/31/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gora, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2014 Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/19/2013.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
Docket Entry Correction re 96 Order Dismissing Case. Entered in error. Docketed on incorrect case. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ENTERED IN ERROR-ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/19/2013.(Perez, J.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Perez, J.). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 94 ) is hereby GRANTED. See the attached Revised Scheduling Order for adjusted dates. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/19/2013. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/15/2014 To File Dispositive Motions 91 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion for Melissa Armstrong to Withdraw (Doc. No. 92 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/12/2013. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Melissa Armstrong to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 90 ) is hereby GRANTED. All expert discovery shall be completed by October 18, 2013. Motions to strike expert testimony and dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by November 22, 2013. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/02/2013. (Bowers, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until October 18, 2013 and November 22, 2013 Deadlines to complete expert discovery and file motions to strike expert testimony or dispositive motions by Joseph F. Apuzzo, Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lesley Atkins in Opposition to Motion, # 2 Statement of Material Facts and Disputed Issues in opposition to Motion)(Stodghill, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2013: # 3 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHALBE PDF FOR MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION, # 4 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF FOR AFFIDAVIT OF LESLEY B. ATKINS) (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 83 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard B. Harper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2923829) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Gora, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Consent Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 85 is hereby GRANTED, absent objection. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for particial summary judgment shall be filed by July 22, 2013; defendant's reply to plaintiff's opposition shall be filed by August 9, 2013. It is so ordered. Responses due by 7/22/2013. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/15/13. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 7/22/2013 by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
ORDER granting 83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard Benjamin Harper for Joseph F. Apuzzo added. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/27/2013. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/13. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard B. Harper to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2923829) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Revised Scheduling Order granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 81 ). Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/22/13. (Gallagher, Robyn) Modified on 6/24/2013 to correct signature date (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 06/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Joseph F. Apuzzo filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Apuzzo Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Apuzzo Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Apuzzo Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Apuzzo Declaration)(Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Statement of Material Facts re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum of Law)(Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 6/27/2013 (Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 64 ) is hereby GRANTED. All expert discovery shall be completed by July 12, 2013. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by August 2, 2013. All other dates requested in the motion are also approved. A joint trial memorandum order will be issued once the dispositive motions deadline has passed. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/29/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time 64 Scheduling Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2013 at 11:00 AM before James R. Hawkins II, ParaJudicial Officer, at the Office of Baker & Botts, 30 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, NY 10022. The parties must attend this settlement conference. Ex parte memoranda should be submitted to Mr. Hawkins by email no later than 5/6/2013. See attached for further instructions. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 67 MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Armstrong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Gora, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re 66 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa J. Hart to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2833429) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Gora, Richard) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa J Hart on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (Hart, Lisa) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Armstrong on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (Armstrong, Melissa) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
ORDER: Motion to Admit Melissa Armstrong as Visiting Attorney 67 is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/7/2013. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2013. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
ORDER: Motion to Admit Lisa J. Hart as a Visiting Attorney 66 is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/7/2013. Signed by Clerk on 4/8/2013. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Melissa Armstrong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2833412) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) Modified on 4/5/2013 to add in receipt number - filing fee was paid. (Ruocco, M.). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney(s) Lisa J. Hart to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2833429) by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Joseph F. Apuzzo.(McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/11/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo, Securities and Exchange Commission. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION.Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2012 at 11:00 AM, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before James R. Hawkins II, ParaJudicial Officer. Counsel should report to the South Chambers, Suite 240, for room assignment. (Sykes, J.) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA dated 11/20/12 Reversing the Judgment of the District Court and the Case is Remanded 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
Index to Record on Appeal by Securities and Exchange Commission re 59 Notice of Appeal, 1 Complaint, 45 Affidavit, 41 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 42 Affidavit, 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 49 Reply to Response to Motion, 58 Judgment, 57 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 40 MOTION to Dismiss. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 58 Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Joseph F. Apuzzo.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 12/22/10. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/20/2010. (Jean-Louis, C) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Revised Consent Order Regarding Scheduling by Joseph F. Apuzzo, Securities and Exchange Commission. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Consent Order Regarding Scheduling by Joseph F. Apuzzo, Securities And Exchange Commission. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 01/11/2010. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Securities And Exchange Commission, Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
First NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by Joseph F. Apuzzo re 51 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding Recently Released Authority filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding Recently Released Authority by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/09. (S-D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Taube, Seth) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 1/6/09. (Jaiman, R.) Modified on 1/6/2009 (Jaiman, R.). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Securities And Exchange Commission re 45 Affidavit, 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 40 MOTION to Dismiss 44 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Signed By Lesley Atkins filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. (Stodghill, Charles) Motion link Modified on 12/1/2008 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 11/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/28/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. (Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan H. Nevas: Prefiling Conference held on 9/25/2008. Motion to Dismiss will be filed, Plaintiff to respond 60 days and Defendant will have 45 days to reply (Jaiman, R.) Modified on 11/21/2008 (Jaiman, R.). (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Maureen Reid filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reid, Maureen) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Taube, Seth) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph F. Apuzzo.Responses due by 10/20/2008 (Taube, Seth) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 38 Motion for Order Setting Discovery Parameters pending entry of judgment in U.S. v. Milne, 3:08cr90(AHN). Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 09/25/08. (Brooks, L.) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
Consent Motion for Order Setting Discovery Parameters by Securities And Exchange Commission, Joseph F. Apuzzo of Consent (Taube, Seth) Modified on 9/23/2008 to correct motion event (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Prefiling Conference set for 9/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 240 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Alan H. Nevas (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 35 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 9/15/08. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time until September 29, 2008 to answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Joseph F. Apuzzo. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 09/04/08. (Brooks, L.) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until September 29, 2008 to answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time September 8, 2008 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 8/18/08. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
Docket Entry Correction...Modified to have counsel submit a motion for extension of time re 29 Proposed Order (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 8, 2008 to respond to the complaint by Securities And Exchange Commission, Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
ENTERED IN ERROR...PROPOSED ORDER Consent Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (Taube, Seth) Modified on 8/18/2008 (Jaiman, R.). (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley B. Atkins on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (Atkins, Lesley) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Attorney Lesley B. Atkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/27/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Lesley B. Atkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Securities And Exchange Commission. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER approving 22 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 12/31/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 3/12/08. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Stay for a Period of 90 Days; Granting 19 Motion to Intervene by USA. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 3/11/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Consent Order by Joseph F. Apuzzo re: 17 Motion to Stay and 19 Motion to Intervene (Taube, Seth) Modified on 3/4/2008 to create links to doc #s 17 and 19(D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Victoria S Shin terminated. Signed by Judge Alan H. Nevas on 2/26/08. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Stodghill on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (Stodghill, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Intervene by United States.Responses Due by 3/11/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Victoria S. Shin to Withdraw as Attorney by Securities And Exchange Commission. (Shin, Victoria) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay by United States.Responses due by 3/11/2008 (McGarry, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. McGarry on behalf of United States (McGarry, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Hughes on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission as local counsel (Hughes, John) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen P. Reid on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (Reid, Maureen) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth T. Taube on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (Taube, Seth) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Attorney Seth T. Taube to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Granting 11 Motion for Attorney Maureen P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Maureen P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing Fee $25.00, Receipt Number B015465, by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Seth T. Taube to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing Fee $25.00, Receipt Number B015465, by Joseph F. Apuzzo. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Attorney Charles D. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Securities And Exchange Commission. Attorney added. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Charles D. Stodghill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Securities And Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles D. Stodghill)(D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Gora on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (Gora, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. McHugh on behalf of Joseph F. Apuzzo (McHugh, Patrick) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE to Counsel on Transferred Case. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/08. (Montz, A.) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alan H. Nevas for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 1/14/08. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 12/27/2007. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/27/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2008 Discovery due by 6/27/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2008. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2007. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Joseph F. Apuzzo, filed by Securities And Exchange Commission.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 108 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?