United States v. $23,940.00 in United States Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01226

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 2:41 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Decree of Forfeiture
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. See attached memorandum. The parties are directed to proceed with preparation for a hearing on the merits and to inform the Court of the date by which they will be prepared for a hearing to resolve their competing claims. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/18/15. (Shechter, N.)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Claim
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Strike
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Claim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Claim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Warrant Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Electronic Service Documents
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order Re: Chambers Practices
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?