Dish Network L.L.C. v. Nam Nguyen
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:14-cv-01348

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 4:50 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, in favor plaintiff's against defendant's. See minute order for more information. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 15 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?