Lopez v. Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-06324

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2018 at 11:02 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Armando Morales Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Blas Alvarado, Plaintiff
No Logo Denis Omar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Denis Omar Rodriguez, Plaintiff
No Logo Denis Osvaldo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Enis Reyes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Enis Reyes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Enis Reyes
No Logo German Anulfo Maldonado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by German Anulfo Maldonado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space German Anulfo Maldonado
No Logo Jaime Reyes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaime Reyes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jaime Reyes
No Logo Nelson Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Noe Aguilar, Plaintiff
No Logo Noe Aguilar Canas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Santos Dagoberto Zepeda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea E. Batres +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547
No Logo Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Plaintiff
No Logo Sergio Ortega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Walter Diaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
v.
No Logo Karp Enterprises Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mark Chait, Defendant
No Logo Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Zabell & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Saul David Zabell, Off +1 631 589 7242 +1 631 563 7475 szabell@laborlawsny.com
No Logo Steven Saviano, Defendant
No Logo TLCW, Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (196) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Order of Sustenance/Lodging/Transportation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Jury Verdict
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Jury Notes
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Begun
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Voir Dire
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 177 TRIAL BRIEF by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, 176 TRIAL BRIEF by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiffs' motion under Rule 50(b) for judgment as a matter of law is denied. Defendants' motion that this Court decline its supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims that remain in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367(c) is also denied. Defendants' motion to decertify the class under Rule 23 is granted. All counsel are directed to appear before this Court for a conference on June 21, 2016 at 11 am. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 6/14/2016.) (Fagan, Linda)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order of Sustenance/Lodging/Transportation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Jury Notes
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Held
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Jury Trial - Begun
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 128 Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action. For the reasons stated herein, plaintiffs' motion for Rule 23 class certification on Plaintiffs claims under New York law is granted. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 1/5/2016.) (Fagan, Linda)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Voir Dire
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 131 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. Counsel are reminded that jury selection is scheduled for January 4, 2016.Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 9/17/2015.) (Fagan, Linda)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Reply in Opposition
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Certify FLSA Collective Action
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 124 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Frank, Neil)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Quash subpoena ad testificundum by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs Rodriguez, Osvaldo, Diaz and E. Reyes by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 118 Proposed Pretrial Order; That the accounting firm known as Berger, Macdonald and Rand ("BMR") shall produce accounting records with respect to corporate Defendant TLCW, Inc. within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order; that Citibank shall produce documents evidencing cash deposits made to accounts controlled by TLCW, Inc., the Setauket Car Wash, or Steven Saviano within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order; and that Capital One shall produce documents evidencing cash deposits made to accountscontrolled by TLCW, Inc., the Setauket Car Wash, or Steven Saviano within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 5/21/2015.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Letter by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Letter regarding Proposed Order by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard D. Wexler: In camera Pre Motion Conference held on 5/20/2015. Plaintiff(s) represented by Peter Arcadio Romero, Esq. Defendant(s) represented by Saul D. Zabell, Esq. Plaintiffs' request to file a Motion for Rule 23 Class Certification is hereby GRANTED. Defendants' request to file a Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. Motions shall be briefed simultaneously according to the following schedule: initial motion papers shall be served by June 10, 2015; opposition papers shall be served by July 1, 2015; and reply papers served by July 10, 2015. In accordance with the Courts rules, all papers shall be filed, via ECF, on the return date of July 10, 2015, with courtesy copies provided to Chambers by the Movant. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to submit a proposed order directing that third-party banks produce the documents requested in the previously served subpoenas within 15 days. In light of the on-going and protracted discovery disputes in this litigation, counsel for both parties are ordered to bring any future discovery disputes directly to this Court, rather than the Magistrate Judge. Parties are advised that Jury selection is adjourned to September 28, 2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 940. Proceedings concluded. (Russo, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Letter in response to Plaintiffs' status report by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Quash for the reasons set forth in the attached opinion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/19/2015. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Quash for the reasons set forth in the attached opinion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 5/19/2015. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Frank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Frank, Neil)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 MOTION to Quash filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 MOTION to Quash filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Relevant pages of the transcript of the Deposition of Steven Saviano taken March 18, 2015) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER application for pre motion conference by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) Modified on 5/1/2015 (Fagan, Linda).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash, # 2 Declaration of SDZ, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER APPLICATION for pre motion conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) Modified on 4/20/2015 (Shatinsky, Michael).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Status Conference held on 4/16/2015. Defendant has agreed to provide time cards as discussed on the record. Plaintiff has, or will, provide all names by which plaintiffs are known so that Defendant may provide the appropriate time cards. Defendant has agreed to produce the yearly and quarterly tax returns as discussed at the conference. Defendant shall move to quash the subpoena discussed at this conference within one week of the date of this order. Plaintiff shall have one week in which to respond and there shall be no reply. The parties motion papers shall focus on the issues of: (1) standing to object and (2) the adequacy of the tax records produced and the necessity, if any, for additional financial records. Enforcement of the subpoena is stayed pending the courts decision on the motion to quash. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs request for documents, which requested a copy of Defendants lease and contract of sale, by Friday April 17, 2015. Plaintiff has agreed to consider whether, in the interests of compromise, he will not seek to compel production of the contract of sale. The parties are directed to confer today, to arrange for a schedule to complete the outstanding depositions. Weekend depositions are permissible if agreed upon by counsel and the witnesses. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Tape #11:01-11:31.) (Torres, Jasmine)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: 4/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding June 2015 trial date by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER IN RE CASES RE-ASSIGNED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/232015. (Attachments: # 1 AYS RULES) (Torres, Jasmine)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter seeking permission to correct misrepresentations and inaccuracies contained in ECF Doc. 95, which was filed by Plaintiffs by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 MOTION to Quash subpoena duces tecum filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash subpoena duces tecum by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Second 84 Amended Complaint, by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER application for pre motion conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Romero, Peter) Modified on 3/12/2015 (Fagan, Linda).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 85 : See attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/24/2015. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 84 Amended Complaint, by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Compel filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 02/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc, filed by Jaime Reyes, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda, Noe Aguilar Canas, Nelson Garcia, Denis Osvaldo, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Blas Alvarado, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Enis Reyes, Denis Omar, Walter Diaz, Sergio Ortega, Armando Morales Rodriguez. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard D. Wexler: In camera Status Conference held on 1/26/2015. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to file a Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this conference. Parties are directed to appear before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay to resolve any outstanding discovery disputes. Parties are hereby advised that Jury Selection will be set for a date in June 2015 in Courtroom 940. A date certain will be set as we approach June 2015. Have witnesses ready for trial. No adjournments will be granted once a date is set. Proceedings concluded. (Russo, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay: Status Conference held on 1/26/2015. The parties are directed to submit a proposed amended scheduling order based on District Judge Wexlers rulings. (Imrie, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 Letter MOTION for Discovery filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter regarding 1/21/15 court conference by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION for Discovery by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc, filed by Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Blas Alvarado, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda, Denis Omar, Noe Aguilar Canas, Denis Osvaldo. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; Having reviewed the parties' submissions in connection with the motion to amend and Plaintiffs' objections, the R&R of Magistrate Judge Lindsay of October 2, 2014 is hereby adopted in part, and modified in part. The Court adopts the R&R to the extent it grants Plaintiffs' motionto amend the complaint to join Alvarado, Garcia, Zepeda and Canas as named Plaintiffs. The Court modifies the R&R to grant Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint to join Plaintiffs Denis Omar and Dennis Osvaldo; and further modifies the R&R to grant Plaintiffs' motion that the NYLL claims for the new Plaintiffs relate back to the original filing. All counsel are directed to appear for a conference in Courtroom 940 on January 21,2015 at 10:30a.m. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 1/7/2015.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to 71 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc, Steven Saviano, Karp Enterprises Inc. For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' objections to the Order ofMagistrate Judge Lindsay of October 7, 2014 are hereby overruled. Therefore, the Order of Magistrate Judge Lindsay appearing at docket entry number 69 is affirmed. Accordingly, the case is returned to Magistrate Judge Lindsay for discovery to be completed as directed here. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 12/9/2014.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay:Status Conference held on 12/3/2014: The parties failed to appear for the scheduled conference. As the deadline to complete discovery was September 30, 2014, all discovery is deemed complete. Accordingly, the case is returned to the district court for final disposition. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc re 69 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of SDZ) (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to 68 Report and Recommendations filed by Noe Aguilar, Blas Alvarado, Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, German Anulfo Maldonado, Enis Reyes, Jaime Reyes, Denis Omar Rodriguez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 59, 65 : See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/7/2014. c/ecf (Miller, Dina) (Main Document 69 replaced on 11/24/2014 to correct a technical error. Original document uploaded was not complete) (Imrie, Robert).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 46 : See attached Report and Recommendation for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/2/2014. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION to Compel filed by Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 39 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Karp Enterprises, Inc. SO ORDERED that a determination of the amount of default judgment to be entered against Karp Enterprises, Inc. will be determined at the trial of this action, or at an inquest scheduled by the Court. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 9/23/2014. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, MOTION to Compel by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT in Opposition to Doc. 59 by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT re Notice of Pendency by Noe Aguilar, Blas Alvarado, Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, German Anulfo Maldonado, Enis Reyes, Jaime Reyes, Denis Omar Rodriguez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by German Anulfo Maldonado (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Enis Reyes (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jaime Reyes (Romero, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 51 and 53 : See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/15/2014. c/ecf (Miller, Dina) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 53 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Noe Aguilar, Blas Alvarado, Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Denis Omar Rodriguez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Disclosure filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Disclosure by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of Motion to Amend Their Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 29 : See attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/17/2014. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Memorandum in Support) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 43 : See attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/22/2014. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in opposition to Plaintiffs' pre-motion application by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Application for Pre-Motion Conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter requesting adjournment (on consent) by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Karp Enterprises, Inc. by Noe Aguilar, Blas Alvarado, Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Denis Omar Rodriguez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Default, # 2 Affirmation of Service) (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Karp Enterprises Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Karp Enterprises Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by: Laura Rios, Deputy Clerk, on February 10, 2014.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Certificate of Default by Noe Aguilar, Blas Alvarado, Nelson Garcia, Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Denis Omar Rodriguez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano, Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, # 2 Certificate of Default) (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 32 : See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/14/2014. c/ecf (Miller, Dina) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support re 29 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Noe Aguilar, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Denis Omar Rodriguez, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Denis Osvaldo Pineda Canas, # 5 Exhibit Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Opposition re 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery In Opposition filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Certify Class Memoradum in Opposition filed by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition Memorandum in Opposition, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Certify Class by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support Declaration of Peter A. Romero, Esq., # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Ancelmo Lopez, # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Santos Zambrano, # 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Blas Alvarado, # 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Nelson Garcia, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Santos Dagoberto, # 7 Exhibit Declaration of Noe Aguilar, # 8 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join Form, # 9 Memorandum in Support) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Scheduling Order for Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Collective Action by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order by Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Scheduling Order by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Denis Omar Rodriguez (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Noe Aguilar (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Arcadio Romero on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Reply to Response in Opposition by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION for pre motion conference Letter to the Court from Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference in Connection with Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motion for Court Facilitated Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 2 in opposition to request for pre-motion conference filed by Mark Chait, Karp Enterprises Inc., Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER application for pre motion conference Letter to the Court from Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference in Connection with Plaintiffs' Anticipated Motion for Court Facilitated Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. (Romero, Peter) Modified on 10/11/2013 (Fagan, Linda). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Santos Dagoberto Zepeda Rivas (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2014 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/1/2013. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/14/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Application for Initial Conference by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Nelson Garcia (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Blas Alvarado (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by TLCW, Inc (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Steven Saviano, Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center, TLCW, Inc. (Zabell, Saul) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. Karp Enterprises Inc. served on 1/7/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. TLCW, Inc served on 1/7/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez. Setauket Car Wash & Detail Center served on 1/5/2013, answer due 1/28/2013. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Mark Chait. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Ancelmo Simeon Mendez Lopez, Santos Natividad Cali Zambrano. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?