Corporation for Character v. Federal Trade Commission
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-00419

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2018 at 4:57 PM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Corporation for Character, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison F. Sheedy +1 202 204 3500 +1 202 204 3501 asheedy@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Matthew G. Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. Cooper +1 801 569 2700

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Russell D. Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell D. Harris +1 801 284 7286

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F. McInnis +1 202 331 8800 +1 202 331 8330 Dan.McInnis@ThompsonHine.com
v.
Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by mjfellman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drake Cutini +1 202 307 0044

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arturo Anton DeCastro +1 202 353 3940
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T. Descano, Jr. +1 202 307 0138
No Logo American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo American Institute for Cancer Research, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Association Of Fundraising Professionals, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Christian Appalachian Project, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Creative Direct Response, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Food for the Poor, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo National Cancer Coalition, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo National Catholic Development Conference, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo National Federation Of The Blind, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Russ Reid Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo SCA Direct, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Wounded Warrior Project, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Copilevitz & Canter, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Donnelly +1 816 472 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by FABIAN VANCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joan M. Andrews +1 801 531 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishra, Anjali

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Errol Copilevitz +1 816 472 9000
No Logo Family Films Of Utah, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison F. Sheedy +1 202 204 3500 +1 202 204 3501 asheedy@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F. McInnis +1 202 331 8800 +1 202 331 8330 Dan.McInnis@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo Feature Films For Families, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison F. Sheedy +1 202 204 3500 +1 202 204 3501 asheedy@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F. McInnis +1 202 331 8800 +1 202 331 8330 Dan.McInnis@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Allison F. Sheedy +1 202 204 3500 +1 202 204 3501 asheedy@constantinecannon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F. McInnis +1 202 331 8800 +1 202 331 8330 Dan.McInnis@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo Judge Clark Waddoups, Mediator
United States of America United States of America, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Daniel Michael Baeza, Jr. +1 202 616 4400 dan.baeza@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arturo Anton DeCastro +1 202 353 3940
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen T. Descano, Jr. +1 202 307 0138
  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Sealed Document - SEALED
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Intervene
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Entry of Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Expedite
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for New Trial
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Trial Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Telephone Conference held on 11/4/2015. Counsel for the parties all appear by telephone. Discussion regarding the current status of the case and exchange of documents. There is also a discussion of confidentiality language to be used. Decided that the parties will complete a final exchange of documents and agree on confidentiality provision. The parties will report to the court by 11/16/2015 to confirm the exchange of documents and submit a draft confidentiality provision. After the court reviews the requested information, it may set a further mediation conference on either 12/10 or 12/16/2015. Attorney for Plaintiff: Russell Harris, Daniel McInnis, Attorney for Defendant: Arturo DeCastro, Stephen Descano. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(aw) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by aw) Telephone Conference reset for 11/4/2015 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (aw) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by aw) Telephone Conference set for 11/3/2015 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (aw) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Telephone Conference held on 10/8/2015. Counsel appear by phone. Discussion regarding ongoing negotiations. Counsel report they had a productive 1 1/2 hour conference, although they did not reach a resolution. Discussion regarding exchange of information. Plaintiff is willing to produce additional information to the government. Parties do not feel like an additional mediation conference will be helpful but will continue negotiations. A telephonic status conference is set for 11/4/2015 at 3:00 PM to discuss progress. Additional mediation conference tentatively set for 11/17/2015. Attorney for Plaintiff: Dan McInnis, Russ Harris, Attorney for Defendant: Steve Descano, Arturo DeCastro. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami.(aw) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Status Conference held on 9/30/2015. Counsel for the parties appear either in person or via telephone. Discussion as to the current status of the case and exchange of financial information. Plaintiff represents it has not received requested information from FTC. It is agreed that plaintiff produce all non-consolidated financial statements per company. Written list of documents requested should be exchanged by the parties by the end of the week, 10/2/2015. The court requests that the parties have further discussion amongst themselves in an attempt to resolve matters still at issue and settle case. A further status conference is set for 10/8/2015 at 3:30 to check on status of discussions between the parties. Attorney for Plaintiff: Russell Harris, Daniel McInnis (via telephone), Allison Sheedy (via telephone), Attorney for Defendant: Arturo DeCastro (via telephone), Stephen Descano (via telephone). Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(aw) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by aw) Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2015 at 03:30 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. The call-in instructions are as follows:(1.) Dial 1-888-684-8852. (2.) Enter Access Code 8977494. (3.) To enter as a participant, press # key. If the call has not been activated by the Court, you will be placed on hold. (4.) Once the call is activated you will be prompted to enter the Participant Security Code 2629 followed by the # key. You will then be entered into the conference. (aw) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by aw) Status Conference set for 9/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (aw) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Clark Waddoups appointed as Mediator. Pursuant to ADR Plan Section 6(c), the pre-conference memoranda must be provided to the mediator NOT LESS THAN TEN (10) DAYS before the scheduled date of the mediation. The memoranda is confidential and will not be filed with the court or served on opposing counsel. Mediation Conference set for 9/16 and 9/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Rm 9.320 (ADR Suite). (aw) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Status Conference held on 8/10/2015. Attorneys present in person or by phone. Discussion of procedures and scheduling. Parties are to submit their mediation statements by 9/4/2015. A 2-day mediation is set for 9/16/2015 at 8:30 AM. Attorney for Plaintiff: Russell Harris, Daniel McInnis, Attorney for Defendant: Arturo DeCastro, Stephen Descano. Court Reporter: Laura Robinson.(aw) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by aw) Status Conference set for 8/10/2015 at 03:30 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (aw) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arturo DeCastro (no registration fee required) filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission, Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Settlement/Mediation. This matter is referred to Judge Clark Waddoups for a settlement conference. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Waddoups's chambers with each attorney's name and contact information within seven days. The court orders the parties to submit a status report to Judge Shelby within fourteen days of the conclusion of the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/10/2015. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP, 2:12-cv-00811-CW(mjm) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Shelby: Status Conference held on 7/9/2015. Cnsl give the court an update on the case and request a settlement conference. The court will discuss other judges and an order will be entered with the settlement conference details. The court also sets a jury trial. A final pretrial conference is set for 4/18/2016 at 2:30 PM. A 2 week jury trial is set for 5/16/2016 at 1:00 PM. Attorney for Plaintiff: Russell Harris, Daniel McInnis, Attorney for Defendant: Stepehn Descano. Court Reporter: Ray Fenlon. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP, 2:12-cv-00811-CW(mjm) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to file Interlocutory Appeal & Supporting Memorandum of Law by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. (McInnis, Daniel) Modified on 6/26/2015 changed event type to Motion for Leave to Appeal(las). (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference RESET for 7/9/2015 at 2:30 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference RESET for 5/13/2015 at 2:00 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. CNSL ARE TO NOTIFY REPLACING CNSL WITH HEARING DATE AND TIME (mjm) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Status Conference set for 4/20/2015 at 1:00 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING docket entry (37) Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART counts 1 and 2 docket entry (38) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENYING counts 3 and 4 docket entry (39) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENYING count 5 docket entry (41) Motion for Summary Judgment ; DENYING docket entry (80) Motion to Strike ; DENYING count 1 and 2 docket entry (89) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART docket entry (98) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/31/2015. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP, 2:12-cv-00811-CW(mjm) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Letter to Judge Robert J. Shelby by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by United States of America re 131 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns, 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 107 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Dish Decision) (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of of Filing Documents for In Camera Review by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. (Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Documents for In Camera Review by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. (Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Allison F. Sheedy (Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Oral arguments were held on August 20, 2014, on Defendants Motion For ProtectiveOrder (doc. 134) and Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Production of Documents (doc. 137).Telephonic appearances were made by attorney Daniel Baeza on behalf of the Government, andby attorneys Daniel McInnis, Allison Sheedy and Russell Harris on behalf of the Defendants. Please see Docket Entry 141 for details regarding rulings on this matter. Attorney for Plaintiff: Daniel McInnis, Allison Sheedy and Russell Harris, Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Baeza. Court Reporter: electronic.(Time Start: 1:06:17 pm, Time End: 3:18:48 pm, Room 7,100.) Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP, 2:12-cv-00811-CW(ksm) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Order - written order following oral order on motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        RULING and ORDER Follows oral order of 8/20/2014. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/20/2014. (las) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF AMENDED TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING: (Notice generated by DBP Chambers) Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Motion Hearing previously set for July 29, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. The matter addressing motions 135 and 137 is hereby RE-SCHEDULED for 8/20/2014 at 1:00 PM Mountain Time before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Amended instructions on appearing telephonically will be sent to the parties via email. Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (amn) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 137 Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to March 11 and December 3, 2013 Orders and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 137 Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to March 11 and December 3, 2013 Orders and Memorandum in Support , 134 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by DBP Chambers)Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2014 09:30 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Instructions on appearing by telephone shall arrive via email.Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (amn) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Cross MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to March 11 and December 3, 2013 Orders and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1. Defendants' Supplemental Discovery Responses) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 134 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 134 MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Defendants' July 24, 2009 Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2. April 29, 2014 Email from Baeza to McInnis, # 3 Exhibit 3. USA January 2014 Supplemental Discovery Requests, # 4 Exhibit 4. Defendants' May 2013 Supplemental Discovery Responses)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Supplemental Interrogatories and Requests for Production, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Response to Supplemental Interrogatories and Requests for Production., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter from Allison F. Sheedy to Dan Baeza March 10, 2014, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Summary Chart of Empirical Test Results, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Interrogatory Response, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Allison F. Sheedy to Dan Baeza January 28, 2014., # 7 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Dan Baeza to Allison F. Sheedy January 31, 2014., # 8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Allison F. Sheedy to Dan Baeza, March 20, 2014., # 9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Dan Baeza to Daniel F. McInnis, March 27, 2014., # 10 Exhibit 10 - Letter from Daniel F. McInnis to Dan Baeza, April 11, 2014., # 11 Exhibit 11 - Letter from Dan Baeza, to Daniel F. McInnis, April 21, 2014., # 12 Exhibit 12 Declaration of Daniel Ferrel McInnis, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt for the 30(B)(6) Deposition of Feature Films for Families (Matthew G. Cooper), June 14, 2012, # 14 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Ferrel McInnis (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Supplement Ex. 1 - Declaration of Amy Zhang, # 3 Supplement Ex. 2 - Declaration of Mary Rushen, # 4 Supplement Ex. 3 - Declaration of Michael Tankersley, # 5 Supplement Ex. 4 - Declaration of Deanna Brewer, # 6 Supplement Ex. 5 - Declaration of Wendy Chandler, # 7 Supplement Ex. 6 - Declaration of Gary Christofferson, # 8 Supplement Ex. 7 - Declaration of Suzanne Crawford, # 9 Supplement Ex. 8 - Declaration of Suzanne Cridland, # 10 Supplement Ex. 9 - Declaration of Barbara Jenks, # 11 Supplement Ex. 10 - Declaration of Harold Lunt, # 12 Supplement Ex. 11 - Declaration of Debbie Miller, # 13 Supplement Ex. 12 - Declaration of Henry Mize, # 14 Supplement Ex. 13 - Declaration of Wayne Oja, # 15 Supplement Ex. 14 - Declaration of Ryan Ringleman, # 16 Supplement Ex. 15 - Declaration of Janet Saab, # 17 Supplement Ex. 16 - Declaration of Deborah Saas, # 18 Supplement Ex. 17 - Declaration of Gesine Sass-Scheele, # 19 Supplement Ex. 18 - Declaration of Linda Stevens, # 20 Supplement Ex. 19 - Declaration of Mark Wheatley, # 21 Supplement Ex. 20 - Declaration of Ken Horstmann, # 22 Supplement Ex. 21 - Declaration of Kristy Curtis, # 23 Supplement Ex. 22 - Declaration of Lawrence Cassesa, # 24 Supplement Ex. 23 - Declaration of Dorothy Williams, # 25 Supplement Ex. 24 - Declaration of David Zirkle, # 26 Supplement Ex. 25 - Declaration of Jennifer Flowers, # 27 Supplement Ex. 26 - Declaration of Debbie Brooks, # 28 Supplement Ex. 27 - Oct. 21, 2008 Email from Mark Sly, # 29 Supplement Ex. 28 - Declaration of Anna Morris)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions held on January 16, 2014 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Raymond P. Fenlon, Telephone number (801)809-4634. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2014. (jmr) Modified on 5/5/2014 by removing restricted text(las). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 71 Motion to Strike ; denying 71 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/10/2014. (mjm) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 71 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite Review , 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 37 MOTION in Limine, 89 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns, 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2014 AT 10:00 AM in Room 220 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Please Note: Additional motion added, docket entry 89 , to hearing set for 1/16/2014 at 10:00 a.m. (mjm) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/10/2014. (rks) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/3/13. See 124 Minute Entry on 12/3/2013 No attached document. (rks) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2013 re 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order filed by United States of America. After oral argument by the parties, the Court grants Plaintiffs Motion For Sanctions 102 on the limited issues of certification and the missing recordings, and requests that Plaintiff file a Motion For Costs related thereto. The Court denies the Motion For Sanctions 102 as to the privilege log, abandoned calls and data set issues. The Government is, however, granted leave within which to provide Defendant with specific and explicit requests which the Government believes it is entitled to under the Courts prior Order 91 , regarding the privilege log, abandoned calls and data set issues. Such specific requests shall be provided to Defendants by January 10, 2014. Defendants will have until February 10, 2014, to respond to the Governments requests, and until March 10, 2014, to provide the requested information. Thereafter, if the Government believes it has still not received information, to which it is entitled to under the Courts prior Order 91 , it may file a second Motion To Compel and request for Sanctions related thereto. Attorney for Plaintiff: Dan Baeza, Attorney for Defendant: Allison Sheedy and Russ Harris. Court Reporter: Electronic. (mas) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns, 71 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite Review , 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 37 MOTION in Limine : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2014 at 10:00 AM in Room 220 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions No Longer Referred: 71 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite Review , 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (mjm) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER LIFTING STAY. Docket text Order. No image attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/30/2013. (tls) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RE-SCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION re: 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order : (Notice generated by DBP Chambers). Motion Hearing is hereby RE-SCHEDULED and set for 12/3/2013 at 9:30 AM in Room 248 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. The motion hearing regarding the same matter that was previously scheduled for November 13, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. (amn) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order : (Notice generated by DBP Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013 09:30 AM in Room 248 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. (amn) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations by United States of America re 117 Order on Motion to Stay (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 116 Motion to Stay due to Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/01/2013. (tls) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order : (Notice generated by DBP Chambers) Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2013 10:00 AM in Room 248 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. (amn) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 111 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/06/2013. (asp) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 106 Motion to Supplement Factual Record in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/05/2013. (tls) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Exhibit 1. Oregon Assurance of Voluntary Compliance, # 2 Supplement Exhibit 2. Defendants' Estimated Abandoned Rates for Kids First, # 3 Supplement Exhibit 3. Defendants' Estimated Abandoned Rates for Velveteen Rabbit, # 4 Supplement Exhibit 4. June 4, 2012 Letter from Defendants, # 5 Supplement Exhibit 5. June 5, 2012 Reply Letter to Defendants, # 6 Supplement Exhibit 6. FTC-InterImage Contract, # 7 Supplement Exhibit 7. McLain Complaint and Response)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Memorandum in Support re MOTION for Sanctions filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of March 4, 2013 Hearing (excerpt)) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on March 4, 2013 before Judge Dustin B. Pead. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Murakami, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2013. (jmr) Modified by removing restricted text on 10/23/2013 (rks). (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer & Counterclaims, # 2 Exhibit Baker FTC Hearing, # 3 Exhibit CID Interrogatory Response, # 4 Exhibit Baker Tr., # 5 Exhibit Cooper Tr., # 6 Exhibit Baker Decl., # 7 Exhibit FTC Advisory Opinion, # 8 Exhibit Harris Decl., # 9 Exhibit Def. First Interrog. Resp., # 10 Exhibit Def. Suppl. Interrog. Resp., # 11 Exhibit March 20, 2012 Letter, # 12 Exhibit Church Tr., # 13 Exhibit Audio Files Transcribed, # 14 Exhibit June 18, 2010 Letter, # 15 Exhibit Gov. Resp. Def. RFAs, # 16 Exhibit www.kidsfirst.org, # 17 Exhibit Trade Mark Registry, # 18 Exhibit Sheedy Decl., # 19 Exhibit Gov. Initial Disclosures, # 20 Exhibit Consumer Sentinel, # 21 Exhibit Motion in Limine, # 22 Exhibit Joint Motion for Extension of Time, # 23 Exhibit FFF-4879, # 24 Exhibit FFF_4877, # 25 Exhibit FFF-954, # 26 Exhibit FFF-693, # 27 Exhibit FFF-22710, # 28 Exhibit Torok Tr., # 29 Exhibit Sirstins Tr., # 30 Exhibit Gov. Resp. Def. Interrogs, # 31 Exhibit Complying with the TSR, # 32 Exhibit Notice of Manual Attachment)(Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Supplement Factual Record re 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Supplement Record, # 2 Exhibit 2. Notice of Manual Attachment, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re 104 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Document is a Memorandum in Opposition and Motion to Strike filed as a combination. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the motion as a separate document. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (tls) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order and Motion to Strike filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Sheedy, Allison) Modified on 7/11/2013 by striking text regarding Motion to Strike. (tls). (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Allison F. Sheedy (Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendants' Failure to Comply With March 11, 2013 Order filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1. Answer of Forrest S. Baker, # 3 Exhibit 2. Answer and Counterclaims of Corporate Defendants, # 4 Exhibit 3. Defendants' Supplemental Discovery Responses, # 5 Exhibit 4. Letter to Defendants' Counsel Regarding Supplemental Discovery Responses) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns Responses due by 7/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/10/2013. (tls) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 98 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Supplemental Response to Defendants' Notice of Unavailability by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Letter from Dan McInnis to Honorable Denise L. Cote) (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support On Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1. Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 2. Answer and Counterclaims, # 5 Exhibit 3. Interrogatory Responses to Federal Trade Commission ("FTC"), # 6 Exhibit 4. DVD Supply Agreement for Kids First Campaign, # 7 Exhibit 5. Baker FTC Transcript, # 8 Exhibit 6. Baker Deposition, # 9 Exhibit 7. Gerson Deposition, # 10 Exhibit 8. Volunteer Services Agreement for Kids First Campaign, # 11 Exhibit 9. July 2, 2010 Letter from Greg Granitto to FTC, # 12 Exhibit 10. April 2, 2009 Letter from Defendants to Oregon Attorney General, # 13 Exhibit 11. STA Free Films Call Script, # 14 Exhibit 12. Kids First Sales Script, # 15 Exhibit 13. Kids First Sales Script 2, # 16 Exhibit 14. Kids First Sales Script 3, # 17 Exhibit 15. Kids First Sales Script 4, # 18 Exhibit Kids First Sales Script 5, # 19 Exhibit 17. December 13, 2009 Letter from Dan McInnis to FTC, # 20 Exhibit 18. Kids First Campaign Sales Figures, # 21 Exhibit 19. Kids First Campaign Sales Figures 2, # 22 Exhibit 20. August 24, 2009 Letter from Granitto to FTC, with attachments, # 23 Exhibit 21. Declaration of Mary Rushen, # 24 Exhibit 22. Declaration of Elizabeth Korsmo, State of New Mexico, # 25 Exhibit 23. Oregon Department of Justice Notice of Unlawful Practices, # 26 Exhibit 24. Coalition for Quality Children's Media Form 990, # 27 Exhibit 25. Declaration of Jennifer Rodden, # 28 Exhibit 26. Corporate Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 29 Exhibit 27. July 24, 2009 Letter from McInnis to FTC, # 30 Exhibit 28. Declaration of Amy Zhang, # 31 Exhibit 29a. Abandoned Call Reports 1, # 32 Exhibit 29b. Abandoned Call Reports 2, # 33 Exhibit 29c. Abandoned Call Reports 3, # 34 Exhibit 29d. Abandoned Call Reports 4, # 35 Exhibit 29e. Abandoned Call Reports 5, # 36 Exhibit 29f. Abandoned Call Reports 6, # 37 Exhibit 29g. Abandoned Call Reports 7, # 38 Exhibit 29h. Abandoned Call Reports 8, # 39 Exhibit 29i. Abandoned Call Reports 9, # 40 Exhibit 29j. Abandoned Call Reports 10, # 41 Exhibit 29k. Abandoned Call Reports 11, # 42 Exhibit 29l. Abandoned Call Reports 12, # 43 Exhibit 29m. Abandoned Call Reports 13, # 44 Exhibit 29n. Abandoned Call Reports 14, # 45 Exhibit 29o. Abandoned Call Reports 15, # 46 Exhibit 29p. Abandoned Call Reports 16, # 47 Exhibit 30. January 25, 2010 Letter from McInnis to FTC, # 48 Exhibit 31. Description of Dialer Methodology for Reporting Abandoned Calls, # 49 Exhibit 32. McLain Declaration, # 50 Exhibit 33. Supplemental Interrogatory Responses to FTC)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Response to Defendants' Notice of Unavailability by United States of America re 96 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Notice of Attorney Absence) (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Unavailability by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Corporation for Character, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc. re 91 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Memorandum Decision,,,, (Harris, Russell) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/18/2013. (asp) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability Regarding Defendants' Kids First and Velveteen Rabbit Calling Campaigns filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Production to Court's March 11, 2013 Order by Daniel M. Baeza for Consol Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Certification of Production of Documents from US v. DISH Network, LLC) (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 40 Motion to Compel ; denying Defendants request for fees and costs ; granting 42 Motion to Compel ; granting 65 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 03/08/2013. (asp) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2013 re 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Corporation for Character, Feature Films for Families, Inc., 42 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, Requests for Admission and Testimony of Corporate Designee(s) MOTION to Preclude Use of Undisclosed Information filed by United States of America, 65 MOTION for Protective Order filed by United States of America. Counsel from both parties present. As an initial matter, the Court requests that the parties work together in order to consolidate docket. Regarding the pending motions, the Court grants Plaintiffs Motion To Compel 40 , grants in part and denies in part Defendants Motion To Compel 42 and grants Defendants Motion For Protective Order 65 . A brief, written Order of the Court shall follow the Courts oral ruling. Attorney for Plaintiff: Daniel McInnis, Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Baeza. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 9:31:46 AM, Time End: 11:33:30 AM, Room 248.) (mas) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix A. Telemarketing Sales Rule)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Surreply filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 86 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/14/2013. (asp) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Memorandum in Support filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Strike, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Manchester Services Certification, # 2 Exhibit 2. Initial Disclosures Transmittal Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3. United States' Initial Disclosures, # 4 Exhibit 4. June 22, 2012 Email to Defendants' Counsel)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 42 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, Requests for Admission and Testimony of Corporate Designee(s) MOTION to Preclude Use of Undisclosed Information, 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, 65 MOTION for Protective Order : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2013 09:30 AM in Room 248 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. (amn) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motions No Longer Referred: 80 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This motion is related to the motion for summary judgment and shall be handled by the District Court. (amn) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike PLAINTIFFS INADMISSIBLE EXHIBITS USED TO BOLSTER ITS OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Russell D. Harris) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 68 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. To be three pages or less and to be filed within three days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/4/2013. No attached document. (amn) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment Replies due by 1/11/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/21/2012. (tls) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 74 Motion for Leave to Consolidate Responses to Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/17/2012. (tls) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1. Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2. Answer and Counterclaims, # 4 Exhibit 3. Forrest Baker FTC Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 4. Defendants' Interrogatory Responses to FTC, # 6 Exhibit 5. Defendant Corporations for Character ("C4C") Incorporation Documents, # 7 Exhibit 6. Carl Bowers Deposition, # 8 Exhibit 7. Defendants' Interrogatory Responses to United States, # 9 Exhibit 8a. Declaration of Kelly Horne (1 of 4), # 10 Exhibit 8b. Declaration of Kelly Horne (2 of 4), # 11 Exhibit 8c. Declaration of Kelly Horne (3 of 4), # 12 Exhibit 8d. Declaration of Kelly Horne (4 of 4), # 13 Exhibit 9. Compendium of Defendant C4C Script Excerpts, # 14 Exhibit 10. James Preston Deposition, # 15 Exhibit 11. Fundraising Contract - C4C and Florida Fraternal Order of Police State Lodge, # 16 Exhibit 12. Fundraising Contract - C4C and Florida Fraternal Order of Police Memorial Foundation ("FLFOP-MF"), # 17 Exhibit 13. Preston Email to C4C, # 18 Exhibit 14. FLFOP-MF 2009 Tax Return, # 19 Exhibit 15. Fundraising Contract - C4C and Connecticut Fraternal Order of Police ("CTFOP"), # 20 Exhibit 16. CTFOP 2008 Tax Return, # 21 Exhibit 17. CTFOP 2009 Tax Return, # 22 Exhibit 18. CTFOP 2010 Tax Return, # 23 Exhibit 19. Talberg Letter to FTC, # 24 Exhibit 20. John Flynn Deposition, # 25 Exhibit 21. Flynn Email to Jesse Gerson, # 26 Exhibit 22. Fundraising Contract - C4C and Firefighters Charitable Foundation ("FFCF"), # 27 Exhibit 23. Frank Tepedino Deposition, # 28 Exhibit 24. FFCF 2009 Tax Return, # 29 Exhibit 25. Fundraising Contract - C4C and South Carolina Fraternal Order of Police ("SCFOP"), # 30 Exhibit 26. James Mixson Deposition, # 31 Exhibit 27. Larry McCoy Deposition, # 32 Exhibit 28. Tennessee Fraternal Order of Police Charitable Foundation ("TNFOP-CF") 2008 Tax Return, # 33 Exhibit 29. Fundraising Contract - C4C and TNFOP-CF, # 34 Exhibit 30. TNFOP-CF 2009 Tax Return, # 35 Exhibit 31. TNFOP-CF 2010 Tax Return, # 36 Exhibit 32. Defendant Feature Films for Families ("FFF") Telemarketing Sales Rule Policy, # 37 Exhibit 33. Complaint Regarding Do Not Call ("DNC") Requests, # 38 Exhibit 34. Letter Regarding DNC Requests, # 39 Exhibit 35. Letter Regarding DNC Requests, # 40 Exhibit 36. Letter Regarding DNC Requests, # 41 Exhibit 37. Letter Regarding DNC Requests, # 42 Exhibit 38. Report Regarding DNC Requests, # 43 Exhibit 39. Journal Entry of Consent Judgment (Kansas), # 44 Exhibit 40. Assurance of Voluntary Compliance (Missouri), # 45 Exhibit 41. Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction (Florida), # 46 Exhibit 42. Assurance of Voluntary Compliance (Oregon), # 47 Exhibit 43. Settlement Agreement (Utah), # 48 Exhibit 44. Letter of Understanding (South Carolina), # 49 Exhibit 45. Settlement and Mutual Release (South Carolina), # 50 Exhibit 46. Settlement Agreement (Tennessee), # 51 Exhibit 47. Corporate Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition, # 52 Exhibit 48. December 13, 2009 Letter from Dan McInnis to FTC, # 53 Exhibit 49. Defendants' Caller Identification Service Name and Number Purchases, # 54 Exhibit 50. July 10, 2009 Letter from McInnis to FTC, # 55 Exhibit 51. Declaration of Jennifer Rodden, # 56 Exhibit 52. Jesse Gerson Deposition)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite Review filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions No Longer Referred: 71 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Expedite Review . This motion is directly related to the underlying motion for summary judgment and therefore shall be handled by the District Court. (amn) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , MOTION to Expedite Review filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Sept. 18, 2012 Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character re 60 MOTION to Compel Government to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I & II filed by Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Corporation for Character, Feature Films for Families, Inc. . (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/14/2012. There are several pending motions that are fully briefed. The court orders the government to file memos in opposition to three partial motions for summary judgment by 12/14/12. No further scheduling will take place at this time. The Plaintiff is directed to file a request for further scheduling conference within 15 days of the resolution of m/psj. Attorney for Plaintiff: Daniel Baeza, Esq., Attorney for Defendant: Daniel McInnis, Esq.. Court Reporter: liberty court recorder.(Time Start: 11:55, Time End: 12:30, Room 477.) (tab) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re 36 Motion for Protective Order Precluding the Depositions of Michael Tankersley and Allen Hile filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(asp) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 65 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (asp) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 65 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (asp) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Depositions of Michael Tankersley and Allen Hile filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(asp) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 60 MOTION to Compel Government to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I & II filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 62 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/8/2012. No attached document. (mas) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing re Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING of Joint Submission Regarding Scheduling Disputes filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Government to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I & II filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Movants American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project. (Donnelly, Karen) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Donnelly on behalf of American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project (Donnelly, Karen) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 52 Motion of the American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation and Other Amici Curiae for Leave to File an Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/02/2012. (tls) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Donnelly for American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation,Karen Donnelly for American Institute for Cancer Research,Karen Donnelly for Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel,Karen Donnelly for Association of Fundraising Professionals,Karen Donnelly for Christian Appalachian Project,Karen Donnelly for Creative Direct Response,Karen Donnelly for Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation,Karen Donnelly for Food for the Poor,Karen Donnelly for National Cancer Coalition,Karen Donnelly for National Catholic Development Conference,Karen Donnelly for National Federation of the Blind,Karen Donnelly for Russ Reid Company,Karen Donnelly for SCA Direct,Karen Donnelly for Wounded Warrior Project. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/02/2012. (tls) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Errol Copilevitz for American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation,Errol Copilevitz for American Institute for Cancer Research,Errol Copilevitz for Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel,Errol Copilevitz for Association of Fundraising Professionals,Errol Copilevitz for Christian Appalachian Project,Errol Copilevitz for Creative Direct Response,Errol Copilevitz for Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation,Errol Copilevitz for Food for the Poor,Errol Copilevitz for National Cancer Coalition,Errol Copilevitz for National Catholic Development Conference,Errol Copilevitz for National Federation of the Blind,Errol Copilevitz for Russ Reid Company,Errol Copilevitz for SCA Direct,Errol Copilevitz for Wounded Warrior Project. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 11/02/2012. (tls) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Donnelly , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1708850, filed by Movants American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Joan) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Errol Copilevitz , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1708827, filed by Movants American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Joan) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Movants American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Andrews, Joan) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joan M. Andrews on behalf of American Charities for Reasonable Fundraising Regulation, American Institute for Cancer Research, Association of Direct Response Fundraising Counsel, Association of Fundraising Professionals, Christian Appalachian Project, Creative Direct Response, Direct Marketing Association Nonprofit Federation, Food for the Poor, National Cancer Coalition, National Catholic Development Conference, National Federation of the Blind, Russ Reid Company, SCA Direct, Wounded Warrior Project (Andrews, Joan) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed District Judge. Case Reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Shelby. Judge Robert J. Shelby no longer assigned to the case. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A) re 46 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case number will now read 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (cas) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed District Judge. Case Reassigned to District Judge Robert J. Shelby. Judge Clark Waddoups no longer assigned to the case. Orders of the prior judge are affirmed including the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A) re 46 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case number will now read 2:11-cv-00419-RJS-DBP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (cas) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Theresa Brown)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov30 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2012 11:30 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (tab) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing re Scheduling Conference filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Baeza, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/7/2012. No image attached.(saw) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, Requests for Admission and Testimony of Corporate Designee(s) MOTION to Preclude Use of Undisclosed Information-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida)filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION in Limine-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Requests for Production, Requests for Admission and Testimony of Corporate Designee(s) or in the alternative, MOTION to Preclude Use of Undisclosed Information-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Plaintiff United States of America. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count V and Supporting Memorandum of Law-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida)filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III & IV and Supporting Memorandum of Law-originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (jmr) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I & II and Supporting Memorandum of Law originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Part Two-Beginning at Exhibit 8A, # 2 Part Three-Beginning at Exhibit 9A)(jmr) Modified on 9/7/2012 to add more description of the motion (jmr). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine(Motion to Exclude Undisclosed or Uncompleted Analysis of Telephone Call Data)originally filed in 2:12cv811TS(transferred from case 4:11cv00197-RH-CS-Northern District of Florida) filed by Consol Defendants Forrest Sandusky Baker, III, Family Films of Utah Inc, Feature Films for Families, Inc., Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (jmr) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases.Case 2:12cv00811 TS is consolidated with this case. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/6/12. (jmr) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case Closed. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/19/12. (jmr) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss held on March 8, 2012 before Judge CLARK WADDOUPS. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Murakami, Telephone number 801-328-4800. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2012. (las) Modified by removing restricted text on 6/20/2012 (rks). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 3/8/2012 re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Trade Commission. The court hears argument and grants the motion for the reasons stated on the record. The court indicates that if the Florida case is transferred here it will be treated as the lower number case. Attorney for Plaintiff: Daniel McInnis, Matthew Cooper, Russell Harris, Attorney for Defendant: Drake Cutini. Court Reporter: Karen Murakami. (jwt) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2012 03:30 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (jwt) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER- granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 9/16/2011. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/26/11. (jmr) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(McInnis, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Sheedy, Allison) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. (alp) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (alp) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (alp) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Corporation for Character, Defendant Federal Trade Commission. Form due by 8/2/2011. (alp) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Corporation for Character, Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (alp) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Drake Cutini on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Cutini, Drake) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Drake Cutini for Federal Trade Commission. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 7/13/11. (alp) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Drake Cutini (no registration fee required) filed by Defendant Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jared) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corporation for Character. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Svc by Mail - V Maxwell - Civil & Process Clerk - US Atty - District of Utah)(Cooper, Matthew) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corporation for Character. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Svc by Mail - Eric Holder US Atty Gen)(Cooper, Matthew) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corporation for Character. Federal Trade Commission served on 5/23/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Svc by Mail - J Leibowitz - Chrmn, FTC)(Cooper, Matthew) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Trade Commission. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(jlw) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison Sheedy for Corporation for Character. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/10/11. (jmr) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Ferrel McInnis for Corporation for Character. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/10/11. (jmr) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Allison Sheedy, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1348568, filed by Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Electronic Case Filing Registration, # 3 Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Harris, Russell) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Ferrel McInnis, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1348541, filed by Plaintiff Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Electronic Case Filing Registration, # 3 Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Harris, Russell) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Daniel Ferrel McInnis, Allison Sheedy, for Plaintiff Corporation for Character (rks) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1347752), filed by Corporation for Character. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Harris, Russell) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Corporation for Character is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?