Tyson v. John R Service Center Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-13490-JEL-MKM
District Judge Judith E. Levy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated January 21, 2020 at 12:25 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Setara Tyson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Schwartz +1 248 353 2882 carl@micreditlawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyngklip Assoc Consumer Law Center, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Marie Longendyke +1 248 208 8864 amanda@michiganconsumerlaw.com
Space Ian B. Lyngklip +1 248 208 8864 +1 248 208 9073 ian@michiganconsumerlaw.com
Space Emily E. Reagan +1 248 208 8864 emily@michiganconsumerlaw.com
Space Carl Schwartz +1 248 208 8864 carl@michiganconsumerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Al Chami, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kased, Ziyad P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ziyad P. Kased +1 248 680 7300 +1 248 680 7301 ziyadkased@gmail.com
Credit Acceptance Corporation Credit Acceptance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Murray, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W. King +1 248 792 2398 +1 248 646 8277 sking@kingandmurray.com
No Logo John R Service Center Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beckwith & Wolf, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ziyad P. Kased +1 248 680 7300 +1 248 680 7301 ziyadkased@gmail.com
No Logo Rami Kamil, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kased, Ziyad P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ziyad P. Kased +1 248 680 7300 +1 248 680 7301 ziyadkased@gmail.com
No Logo Sterling Rental, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kased, Ziyad P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ziyad P. Kased +1 248 680 7300 +1 248 680 7301 ziyadkased@gmail.com
Office Ann Arbor
Filed 8/14/2013
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Wayne
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 4/10/2017
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 15-1465/15-1468[U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit], 15-2127/15-2075[U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,REOPENED,reassigned
  Entries (187) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
ORDER granting [159] Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
    Notice of Determination of Motions Without Oral Argument re [157] MOTION for Judgment, and [159] MOTION to Compel Requests for Production and Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment; Responses due by 1/13/2020 (WBar)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020, Terminated: 1/16/2020 Motion to compel
      MOTION to Compel Requests for Production and Interrogatories in Aid of Judgment by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Requests for Production to Car Source, # (3) Exhibit Requests for Production to Al Chami, # (4) Exhibit Requests for Production to Rami Kamil, # (5) Document Continuation Interrogatories to Car Source, # (6) Exhibit Interrogatories to Al Chami, # (7) Exhibit Interrogatories to Rami Kamil) (Lyngklip, Ian)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: 12/26/2019 ~Motion for Judgment
        MOTION for Judgment by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Judgment) (Lyngklip, Ian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [153] Motion for Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
            ORDER granting in part [151] Emergency Motion for Restraining Order against Sterling Rental, Inc., Transfer of Assets, and Debtor-Creditor Examination. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Order Requiring Responsive PleadingCourt Filing
              BRIEFING SCHEDULING ORDER re [153] Motion for Order. Response due by 12/11/2019 Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019, Terminated: 12/17/2019 Motion for order
                MOTION for Order Allowing Access and Use of Consumer Reports Relating to Defendants Al Chami and Rami Kamil by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Order Requiring Responsive PleadingCourt Filing
                  BRIEFING SCHEDULING ORDER re [151] Motion for Restraining Order; Response due by 12/6/2019, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019, Terminated: 12/9/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Take Deposition from Sterling Rental, Inc., Al Chami, and Rami Kamil by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Proposed Notice of Debtor Creditor Examination, # (3) Exhibit Proposed Order, # (4) Exhibit Proposed Subpoena, # (5) Exhibit Declaration of Counsel) (Lyngklip, Ian)[DOCKET ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED - DOCUMENT IS TITLED MOTION FOR RESTRAINING ORDER] Modified on 12/2/2019 (NAhm).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                      OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendants' [149] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019, Terminated: 10/15/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                        MOTION for Reconsideration re [148] Order Adopting Report and Recommendation by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Kased, Ziyad)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                          ORDER Adopting [141] Report and Recommendation and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's [124] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Response to Petition/Request/Application
                            RESPONSE to Defendant's Objections to Report and Recommendation Concerning Fees filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Reply to Response to Petition/Request/Application
                              REPLY to Response to Objections of Plaintiff to Report and Recommendation Concerning Fees filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                STIPULATED ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Objections to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Response - Free
                                  RESPONSE to [143] Objection to Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                    OBJECTION to [141] Report and Recommendation by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                      OBJECTION to [141] Report and Recommendation by All Defendants. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: 4/17/2019, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Setara Tyson, [137] MOTION Status Conference re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Setara Tyson - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LHos)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                          Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [137] MOTION Status Conference (LHos)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: [137] MOTION Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: 2/20/2019 Response to motion
                                                RESPONSE to [137] MOTION Status Conference re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Motion
                                                  MOTION Status Conference re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Supplemental Brief
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [135] Supplemental Brief filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Supplemental Brief
                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ruling on Fees) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/7/2018, Entered: 10/7/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Granting [133] Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018, Terminated: 10/7/2018 Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                          MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Wedad Ibrahim by Setara Tyson. (Ibrahim, Wedad)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                            Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees (LHos)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                              REPLY to Response re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email from Mr. Kased 10/16/15) (Ibrahim, Wedad)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                AMENDED ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Response to motion
                                                                    RESPONSE to [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/16/2018 Application
                                                                      APPLICATION to extend page limit by All Defendants. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [127] Application to Extend Page Limitations. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants' to File Response to Plaintiff's [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Response due by 2/23/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                            Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [124] MOTION for Attorney Fees. (SBur)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Appellate Billings for Deepak Gupta, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Deepak Gupta, # (4) Exhibit Appellate Billings for Lyngklip & Associates, # (5) Exhibit Appellate Billings for Bardo Law, # (6) Exhibit Declaration of Stacy Bardo, # (7) Exhibit Updated Declaration of Ian Lyngklip, # (8) Exhibit Supplemental Lyngklip & Associates District Court Billings, # (9) Exhibit Billing Table of Requested Rates, # (10) Exhibit Table of Historical Rates for Lyngklip & Associates, # (11) Exhibit Table of Non-Taxable Costs, # (12) Exhibit Lex Group Invoice Opening Brief, # (13) Exhibit Lex Group Invoice Reply Brief) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Costs Taxed
                                                                                COSTS TAXED in the amount of $0.00 against defendant (DPer)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Bill of Costs
                                                                                  BILL OF COSTS by Setara Tyson (Ibrahim, Wedad)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 attorney appearance
                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wedad Ibrahim appearing on behalf of Setara Tyson (Ibrahim, Wedad)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulated Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting [119] MOTION TO EXTEND Joint Final Pretrial Order Date. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017, Terminated: 11/22/2017 Motion to Extend
                                                                                          MOTION TO EXTEND Joint Final Pretrial Order by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Denying Defendants' [117] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017, Terminated: 9/6/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2019 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed [113], [114] and [115] Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER Resetting Scheduling Order Dates. (Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Joint Jury Instructions due by 12/4/2017 and Jury Trial set for 12/11/2017 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER Resetting Scheduling Order Dates. (Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Joint Jury Instructions due by 12/4/2017 and Jury Trial set for 12/11/2017 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT, OR OPINION RELATING TO OFFERS TO RETURN VEHICLE by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT, OR OPINION RELATING TO FRAUD BY PLAINTIFF by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT ABOUT ATTORNEY'S FEES WHICH MAY BE AWARDED by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER Denying Plaintiff's [105] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Remaining Scheduling Order Dates: ( Motions in Limine due by 8/7/2017, Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2017 at 10:00 AM, Jury Instructions due by 10/10/2017 and Jury Trial set for 10/17/2017 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) - Issued by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2017 re [105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim filed by Setara Tyson. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (FMos)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [110] Order filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: 2/22/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response re [105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Response to motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim filed by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                          Reset Deadlines as to [105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim. Motion Hearing Reset for 3/21/2017 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (FMos)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING on [105] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2017 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (FMos)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: 12/15/2016, Terminated: 7/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER for Release of Bond. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Conversion Claim by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's [103] MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016, Terminated: 12/2/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims of Conversion by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims for Conversion) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016, Terminated: 12/15/2016 Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Securing Judgment and Fees by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Appeal Mandate
                                                                                                                                        MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to [60] Notice of Appeal filed by Al Chami, Rami Kamil, John R Service Center Inc., Credit Acceptance Corporation, Sterling Rental, Inc., [98] Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment, [84] Notice of Appeal filed by Al Chami, Rami Kamil, John R Service Center Inc., Sterling Rental, Inc., [99] Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment [Appeal Case Number 15-1465/15-1468] (Ahmed, N)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Appeal Mandate
                                                                                                                                          MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to [88] Notice of Appeal filed by Setara Tyson, [98] Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment, [62] Notice of Appeal, filed by Setara Tyson, [99] Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment [Appeal Case Number 15-2127/15-2075] (Ahmed, N)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                            OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re [88] Notice of Appeal filed by Setara Tyson, [62] Notice of Appeal, filed by Setara Tyson [Appeal Case Number 15-2075/15-2127] (Ahmed, N)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                                                                                                                              OPINION from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re [88] Notice of Appeal filed by Setara Tyson, [62] Notice of Appeal, filed by Setara Tyson [Appeal Case Number 15-1465/15-1468] (Ahmed, N)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER for Funds in Lieu of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting [92] Motion to Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment Pending Approval of Supersedeas Bond. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2015 - Disposition: The Court will enter an order granting defendant's motion to stay pending approval of a full supersedeas bond, subject to the conditions discussed at the conference. Defendant may still file a reply to plaintiff's response to the motion to stay (92).(Court Reporter Andrea Wabeke) (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Joint Telephonic Status Conference re [85], [92] set for 10/7/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy - THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO CALL IN JOINTLY INTO 734.887.4700 (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/4/2015, Entered: 10/4/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response re [83] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Transfer of Assets MOTION to Compel Debtor Creditor Examination filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [92] MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015, Terminated: 10/9/2015 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [85] Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Setara Tyson re [80] Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service re [88] Notice of Appeal. (LGra)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Setara Tyson re [80] Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Receipt No: 0645-5339580 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's re [85] Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service re [84] Notice of Appeal. (DAll)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015, Terminated: 11/5/2015 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER Requiring Responsive Briefing from Defendants on or before September 16, 2015 re [85] Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Setara Tyson. Entered by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Al Chami, Sterling Rental, Inc.. Receipt No: 0645-5326520 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015, Terminated: 9/9/2015 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Transfer of Assets, MOTION to Compel Debtor Creditor Examination by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Proposed Notice and Schedule of Documents to Bring, # (3) Exhibit Proposed Order, # (4) Exhibit Proposed Subpoena, # (5) Index of Exhibits Declaration of Non-Payment) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for attorney feesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's [70] Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re [76] Exhibit, [70] MOTION for Attorney Fees Response to Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Motion filed by All Defendants. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [77] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015, Terminated: 7/6/2015 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration by All Defendants. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting Defendant Until July 7, 2015 to File a Response to [76] Exhibit and Limiting the Response to Five Pages - Issued by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re [70] MOTION for Attorney Fees , [75] Order by Setara Tyson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Revised Exhibit 70-4) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Requiring Resubmission of Exhibit. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response re [70] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [70] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re [69] Order on Motion - Free Submission of Cancelled Check for Witness Fee by Setara Tyson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - cancelled check) (Schwartz, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY ORDER Awarding $40.00 in Costs for the Deposition of Jon Lun Pursuant to the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Taxation of Costs re [72] Memorandum filed by Setara Tyson. Issued by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [70] MOTION for Attorney Fees - Response due by 6/9/2015 (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/25/2015, Entered: 5/25/2015, Terminated: 8/18/2015 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Counsel, # (3) Exhibit Timesheets August 2013 -- May 2014, # (4) Exhibit Timesheets May 2014 - May 2015, # (5) Exhibit Email Table, # (6) Exhibit Email to Mr. Kased dated December 13, 2014, # (7) Exhibit Email to Mr. Kased dated December 15, 2014, # (8) Exhibit Fee Survey) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Plaintiff's [66] Motion for Taxation of Costs. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [66] MOTION Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs or Amend Bill of Costs filed by Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [66] MOTION Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs or Amend Bill of Costs (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015, Terminated: 5/21/2015 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs or Amend Bill of Costs by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Costs Taxed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COSTS TAXED in the amount of $412.62 against defendant. (DPer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BILL OF COSTS by Setara Tyson (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Itemization of Costs, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Ian B. Lyngklip, # (4) Exhibit Invoice for Rami Kamil deposition, # (5) Exhibit Invoice for Credit Acceptance Corp. deposition (Jon Lun), # (6) Exhibit Deposition fees forr FIA, # (7) Exhibit Invoice for DIFS deposition, # (8) Exhibit Invoice for Al Chami deposition, # (9) Exhibit Invoice for service of subpoena upon DIFS, # (10) Exhibit Certified mail receipt for service of Credit Acceptance Corp, # (11) Exhibit Certified mail receipt for service of Sterling Rental, Inc.) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service re [62] Notice of Appeal. (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Setara Tyson re [55] Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [59] Stipulation and Order, [43] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Receipt No: 0645-5130270 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lyngklip, Ian) Modified on 4/23/2015 (DTyl) [NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015 Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service re [60] Notice of Appeal. (ATee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: 4/17/2015, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Defendants. Receipt No: 0645-5120667 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation Civil Appeal Statement) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER - All scheduled dates in this matter are terminated Issued by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED ORDER FOR DAMAGES AND SETTING TIME FOR FEE PETITION Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Bankston, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's [57] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/31/2015 with Ian B. Lyngklip for Plaintiff's and Ziyad P. Kased for defendant's. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015, Terminated: 3/31/2015 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/31/2015 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy - THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO CALL IN JOINTLY (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [44]. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Bankston, T)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response re [44] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [STRICKEN] RESPONSE to [44] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6) (Kased, Ziyad) Modified on 3/16/2015 (FMos).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [44] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [50] Motion for Extension of Time to File a Late Response. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on [44] set for March 26, 2015 is Cancelled re [45] Notice of Hearing on Motion (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015, Terminated: 3/3/2015 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING AS UNTIMELY RE [49] Response to Motion (Disposition: Filed with no good cause shown to file in a timely fashion) - Entered by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [STRICKEN] RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss , [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [15] MOTION Motion to Withdraw its Pending Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative a Motion for Summary Judgment Purusant to U.S. Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson's Order Dated December 5, 2013 , [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d), [44] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , [16] MOTION To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and without granting further extensions to amend its Complaint , [36] MOTION for Protective Order , [46] MOTION for Reconsideration re [43] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) 3, # (4) 4, # (5) 5, # (6) 6) (Kased, Ziyad) Modified on 2/26/2015 (FMos).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's [46] Motion for Reconsideration - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [46] MOTION for Reconsideration re [43] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015, Terminated: 2/11/2015 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re [43] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING on [44] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015, Terminated: 3/18/2015 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Deposition Rami Kamil, # (3) Exhibit Credit Application, # (4) Exhibit Declaration of Setara Tyson, # (5) Exhibit License Search Results, # (6) Exhibit License Screen, # (7) Exhibit Affidavit #1 Weingold, # (8) Exhibit Affidavit #2 Weingold, # (9) Exhibit Installment Contract, # (10) Exhibit Invoice, # (11) Exhibit Letter from Car Source, # (12) Exhibit Deposition of John Lun, # (13) Exhibit Declaration of Setara Tyson Dated 01-22-2015) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's [33] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [41] Response to Motion,,,, by Setara Tyson (Schwartz, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits 1 - Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of SeTara Tyson, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Leslie Tyson, # (4) Exhibit 4- Pay stubs of SeTara Tyson, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Bank statement for SeTara Tyson, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Video of CAPS system, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Deposition Transcript of SeTara Tyson, # (8) Exhibit 8- RD-108, # (9) Exhibit 9- Retail Installment Contract, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Deposition Transcript of Jon Lun, # (11) Exhibit 11 - CAC Customer Contact Notes, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Car Source Forfeiture Policy, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Murray Brown Letter, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Dealer Manual Excerpts, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Consumer Information Bulletin 4-11-00, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Bulletin 2010-20-CF, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Bulletin 2013 -08-CF, # (18) Exhibit 18 - MADA Spot Delivery Dealer Advisory, # (19) Exhibit 19 - FTC Agenda 4-12-11) (Schwartz, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Schwartz on behalf of Setara Tyson. (Schwartz, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WITNESS LIST by Setara Tyson (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER DENYING [36] MOTION for Protective Order filed by Al Chami, Rami Kamil, John R Service Center Inc., Sterling Rental, Inc.. Entered by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/17/2014 - Disposition: Plaintiff's response to the motion for summary judgment [33] is due by December 22, 2014. Defendant's motion for protective order [36] is DENIED. Plaintiff will provide dates to defendants for inspection fo defendants' credit application processes. Such inspection will take approximately one hour. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/14/2014 at 12:15 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL) (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITNESS LIST by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014, Terminated: 11/18/2014 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to by Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil, Sterling Rental, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING on [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Addition of Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Sterling Rental, Inc.. Reason: The party was incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing [32] Amended Complaint (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: 10/31/2014, Terminated: 1/20/2015 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Error directed to: Ian B. Lyngklip re [32] Amended Complaint (Sterling Rental, Inc.). Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Setara Tyson against Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/8/2014 Order of Substitution/Withdrawal of AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (KKra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Marie Longendyke on behalf of Setara Tyson. (Longendyke, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Lay Witness List to be exchanged by 11/21/2014, Discovery due by 12/22/2014, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/22/2015, Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2015 at 2:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 5/19/2015 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2014 with Attorneys Kain Lyngklip and Ziyad Kased (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Document Continuation Certificate of Service) (Kased, Ziyad) Modified on 7/10/2014 (DWor). [ANSWER IS AS TO JOHN R. SERVICE CENTER, INC., RAMI KAMIL, AL CHAMI, ONLY]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Reagan on behalf of Setara Tyson. (Reagan, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion - FreeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendants' [16] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (KKra) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re [16] MOTION To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and without granting further extensions to amend its Complaint (FMos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub pursuant to Administrative Order 14-AO-012. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Notice of Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of reassignment from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor pursuant to Administrative Order 14-AO-030. (SSch)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Credit Acceptance Corporation. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 4/7/2014. Disposition: Hearing to be set on Motion to Dismiss. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling/Settlement Conference TIME CHANGE TO 4/7/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow AT REQUEST OF DEFENDANT. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Telephonic Scheduling/Settlement Conference held on 1/27/2014: Conference (in person) continued 4/7/2014 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [16] MOTION To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and without granting further extensions to amend its Complaint filed by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Safe Harbor Letter, # (3) Exhibit Retail Installment Sales Contract) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Notice to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2014 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Text-Only Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [15] MOTION Motion to Withdraw its Pending Motion to Dismiss and Withdrawing [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Al Chami, Rami Kamil, John R Service Center Inc.. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Credit Acceptance Corporation (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013, Terminated: 6/16/2014 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and without granting further extensions to amend its Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: 12/19/2013, Terminated: 1/13/2014 MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Motion to Withdraw its Pending Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative a Motion for Summary Judgment Purusant to U.S. Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson's Order Dated December 5, 2013 by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: 12/5/2013, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7] Motion to Permit Discovery Under rule 56(d) & Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Error directed to: Ian B. Lyngklip re [1] Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2013 re [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d) filed by Setara Tyson Disposition: Granted (Tape #LJM 12/4/2013) (JJoh) Modified on 12/5/2013 (JJoh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d) filed by Setara Tyson. (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING on [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d). Reply due by 11/25/2013 and Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2013 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson (JJoh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013, Terminated: 7/11/2019 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Laurie J. Michelson: [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d) filed by Setara Tyson. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [7] MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Setara Tyson, # (3) Exhibit Declaration of Leslie Tyson, # (4) Exhibit Murray Brown Letter, # (5) Exhibit Consumer Alert, # (6) Exhibit Dealer Advisory, # (7) Exhibit MADA Advisory) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013, Terminated: 12/5/2013 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Permitting Discovery under Rule 56(d) by Setara Tyson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Counsel) (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013, Terminated: 1/13/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ziyad P. Kased on behalf of All Defendants. (Kased, Ziyad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued for *Al Chami* (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued for *John R Service Center Inc.* (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued for *Rami Kamil* (DTyl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Setara Tyson against Al Chami, John R Service Center Inc., Rami Kamil with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4241824 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): ED MI, 13-cv-11231-AJT-RSW., Judge Tarnow] (Lyngklip, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?