Baynard et al v. Commonwealth Investments, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-01367

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2018 at 4:38 PM DT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Henry S. Baynard, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Karen Rose, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Nancy Wilkinson Newell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Richard Baynard, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Robert Baynard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Robert W. Schuetz, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo William A. Wilkinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo William Landis, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo Commonwealth Investments Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Murphy Moul + Basil LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Murray +1 614 488 0400 +1 614 488 0401 murray@mmmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Huff Miller LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Huff Miller +1 614 384 5794 +1 614 441 9280 rob@roberthuffmiller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly H. Little +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 holly.armstrong@thompsonhine.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Williger +1 216 566 5655 +1 216 566 5800 stephen.williger@thompsonhine.com
No Logo Duquesne Properties, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Murphy Moul + Basil LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Murray +1 614 488 0400 +1 614 488 0401 murray@mmmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by roberthuffmiller.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Huff Miller +1 614 384 5794 +1 614 441 9280 rob@roberthuffmiller.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly H. Little +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 holly.armstrong@thompsonhine.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Williger +1 216 566 5655 +1 216 566 5800 stephen.williger@thompsonhine.com
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Vacate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Status Report Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Status Report Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Status Report Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Status Report Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Vacate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Answer to Third Party Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Third Party Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 2/11/2016. (agm) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Supplemental - Opposing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?