Miranda-Olivares v. Clackamas County et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-02317
Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 2, 2017 at 12:03 PM EDT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Maria Miranda-Olivares, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maria Miranda-Olivares

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria Miranda-Olivares +1 971 388 3351

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/09/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Henretty +1 503 473 8684 +1 503 295 0676 dhenretty@oregonlawcenter.org
v.
No Logo Clackamas County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clackamas County Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott C. Ciecko +1 503 655 8362 +1 503 742 5397 sciecko@co.clackamas.or.us
No Logo Craig Roberts, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (164) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 15-35439 and 15-35501, re Notice of Appeal 132 and Notice of Appeal 129 . The court is informed that this matter has been resolved. Unless objection is filed within seven calendar days of the date of this order, these appeals will be deemed dismissed voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (dsg) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 163 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of and to Place Under Seal Defendants Filings that Breach Settlement Conference Privilege 158 is DENIED and Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is GRANTED 133 in the reduced sum of $97,373.14. Signed on 8/28/15 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST) Modified on 8/31/2015 to correct typo. NEF regenerated(jlr). (Entered: 08/28/2015)
      LREF
      Blank 162 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Declaration of Maria Miranda-Olivares . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 161 .) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Reply to Motion to Strike Portions of and to Place Under Seal Defendant's Filings that Breach Settlement Conference Privilege 158 . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Response to Motion to Strike Portions of and to Place Under Seal Defendant's Filings that Breach Settlement Conference Privilege 158 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Declaration of Benjamin Haile . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous 158 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Conferral by Email) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Motion to Strike Portions of and to Place Under Seal Defendant's Filings that Breach Settlement Conference Privilege. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Reply 153 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of Francie Nevill . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 154 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney Communication) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Declaration of Benjamin Haile . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion 154 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Billing Records of Scott Ciecko) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Reply to Motion for Attorney Fees 133 . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Reply. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Nevill, Francie) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Amended Declaration of Scott Ciecko . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 150 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 101, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 102, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 103) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Amended Declaration of Darian Stanford . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response to Motion 150 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Amended Response to Motion for Attorney Fees 133 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Granting Joint Motion to File Excess Pages 142 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Order STRIKING Declaration 146 as it has been refiled as document 147 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Declaration of Scott Ciecko with Exhibits attached. Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 143 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Declaration of Scott Ciecko . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 143 .) (Ciecko, Scott) Modified on 7/21/2015. STRICKEN per Order 148 (jlr). (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Declaration of Darian Stanford . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 143 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration of Kevin Layng . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 143 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Response in Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees 133 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint Motion to File Excess Pages . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Attorney Fees 133 filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. Response is due by 7/20/2014. Motion will be taken under advisement on 8/6/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Attorney Fees 133 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart regarding Motion for Attorney Fees 133 . Motion will be taken under advisement on 7/27/2015. (jlr) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Declaration of Beth Creighton . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 133 .) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Declaration of Arthur Schmidt . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 133 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schmidt Billing Records) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Declaration of David Henretty . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 133 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Henretty Billing Records and Costs) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Declaration of Francie Nevill . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 133 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nevill Billing Records) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Declaration of Benjamin Haile . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 133 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Libby & Knudtsen Billing Records, # 2 Exhibit Haile Billing Records, # 3 Exhibit PLC Costs) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Motion for Attorney Fees . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Judgment 124 Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID 0979-4164799: . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 130 . Attorney Fees Motion deadline extended to 6/23/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (st1) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID 0979-4147415: . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 127 to 6/16/15 to file Motion For Attorney Fees and Cost Bill. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 125 To File Motion for Attorney Fees and Cost Bill. Motion is due by 6/2/15. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff, Maria Miranda-Olivares, and against defendant, Clackamas County. Signed on 5/5/15 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Order STRIKING the jury trial currently scheduled for 5/5/15 through 5/7/15 as a Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment 122 has been filed. (jlr) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Offer of Judgment) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: Amending Record of Continuation of Pretrial Conference 120 . Deferring defendant's Exhibit No. 104 without redaction or highlighting, instead of with redaction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (st3) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTES of Proceedings: Record of Continuation of Pretrial Conference before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. ORDER: Granting in Part Denying in Part Defendant's Supplemental Pretrial Motions 93 ; Granting Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 98 . See attachment for full text of minutes. Benjamin Wright Haile and Francie Nevill present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. (Court Reporter Jill Erwin.) (st3) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Supplemental Trial Memorandum . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Amended Exhibit List . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Objection(s) to 103 Witness List, 66 Witness List . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Objection(s) to 69 Proposed Voir Dire . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Objection(s) to 68 Jury Verdict Form - Proposed . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Objection(s) to 95 Jury instructions - Proposed, 67 Jury instructions - Proposed . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Declaration of Francie Nevill . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Witness List 103 , Witness List 66 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Objection(s) to 93 Motion in Limine, 62 Motion - Miscellaneous . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Objection to Trial Exhibit 66 Witness List . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Objection(s) to 97 Proposed Voir Dire . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Objection(s) to 96 Witness List, 101 Exhibit List . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Objection(s) to 100 Jury Verdict Form - Proposed . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Objection(s) to 99 Jury instructions - Proposed . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Response to Motion in limine 98 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTES of Proceedings: TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. ORDER: The 3/31/2015 Pretrial Conference at 09:30AM is rescheduled for 4/17/2015 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. The 5/5/2015 Jury Trial at 09:30AM is rescheduled for 5/5/2015 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart, as previously listed in the Trial Management Order 87 . Benjamin Wright Haile and Francie Nevill present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Tape No: N/A.(st3) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Supplemental Witness List . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Trial Memorandum . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Exhibit List . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Verdict Form. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Motion in limine . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Voir Dire . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Witness List . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Scott Ciecko . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Motion in Limine 93 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Motion in limine . Filed by Clackamas County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Trial Memorandum . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Joint Proposed Pretrial Order Lodged (Joint Statement of Triable Issues filed in lieu). Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELEPHONE Conference regarding the Pretrial Conference date for Wednesday, 3/25/2015 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Francie J. Nevill appearing on behalf of Maria Miranda-Olivares Filed by on behalf of Maria Miranda-Olivares (Nevill, Francie) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Joint Statement of Trial Issues in lieu of a Pretrial Order is due by 3/20/2015. (jlr) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Trial Management Order. As defendant has already filed pretrial documents, defendant need only submit supplemental documents by the deadlines indicated in the attached order. Signed on 11/17/14 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Pretrial Conference held on October 8, 2014, before Judge Janice M. Stewart, Court Reporter Jill L. Erwin, telephone number (503)326-8191. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/1/2014. Redaction Request due 12/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015. (Erwin, Jill) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES of Proceedings: TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference regarding Motion for Extension of Time 81 . Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 81 and striking the 11/24/2014 trial. A 2-3 day Jury Trial is set for 5/5/2015 at 09:30AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Pretrial Documents are due by 3/20/2015; objections are due by 3/27/2015. Pretrial Conference is set for 3/31/2015 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. An amended Jury Trial Management Order to follow. Benjamin Wright Haile present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. (Tape #N/A.) (st3) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Motion for Extension of Time 81 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart regarding Motion for Extension of Time 81 . A TELEPHONE Conference is set for Monday, 11/17/2014 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Benjamin Haile . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 81 .) (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of Benjamin Wright Haile appearing on behalf of Maria Miranda-Olivares Filed by on behalf of Maria Miranda-Olivares (Haile, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Order on Motion - Miscellaneous, 78 . (jlr) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting in Part Denying in Part United States ICE's Motion to Modify Trial Subpoena 77 . The ICE witness must appear and testify at trial, but the scope of testimony is limited (on both direct and cross-examination) to the acts upon which Defendant has agreed to limit testimony. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Modify Subpoena. Filed by U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (Cox, James) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Telephone Status Conference 75 . (jlr) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES of Proceedings: TELEPHONE Status Conference. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. ORDER: A 2-day Jury Trial is reset for 11/24/2014 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Maria Miranda-Olivares (pro se) present. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Tape No: N/A. (st3) Modified on 10/14/2014 to reflect this was a TELEPHONE conference. (jlr). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Scheduling Order 73 . (jlr) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELEPHONE Conference for Tuesday, 10/14/2014 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart to discuss plaintiff's email request for postponement of the 10/15/14 jury trial. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Order on Motion 71 , Pretrial Conference. (jlr) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. Pretrial Conference held. ORDER: Granting Pretrial Motions 62 . See attachment for full text of minutes. Maria Miranda-Olivares (pro se) present. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Jill Erwin. (st3) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Notice of Mailing Minutes of Settlement Conference 65 to Maria Miranda-Olivares. (pvh) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Verdict Form. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List and Exhibit List. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES of Proceedings: Settlement Conference held. Maria Miranda-Olivares, pro se, present as plaintiff(s). Scott Ciecko present as counsel for defendant(s). Magistrate Judge John Jelderks presiding. (sm) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Scheduling Order 63 . (jlr) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING Defendant's Motion Pretrial Motions 62 to be taken under advisement on 10/3/2014. (jlr) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion Pretrial Motions. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Scheduling Order, 60 . (jlr) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. A Settlement Conference is set for Wednesday, 10/1/2014 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. Further instructions and requirements of Judge Jelderks regarding the conducting of this settlement conference will be sent by separate letter. (jlr) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Status Conference, Set/Reset Schedules 58 . (jlr) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES of Proceedings: TELEPHONE Status Conference. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. ORDER: Jury Trial Management Order 45 is WITHDRAWN and the following new case deadlines are set. Proposed voir dire, jury instructions, verdict form, and other pretrial submissions are due by 10/3/2014. The dates for the Pretrial Conference (10/8/14) and Jury Trial (10/15/14) remain unchanged. Maria Miranda-Olivares (pro se) present. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendants. Tape No: N/A. (st3) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares of Notice 54 . (jlr) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Scheduling Order, 56 . (jlr) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice To Self-Represented Litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE for Wednesday, 9/10/2014 at 2:00PM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart regarding the 10/8/14 Pretrial Conference and the Trial which is currently set 10/15/14. Court staff will initiate the call to the parties. (jlr) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares of Order on Motion to Withdraw 52 . (jlr) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw a Counsel for Plaintiff 47 . Signed on 6/9/14 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST) Modified on 6/10/2014 to indicate this is a paperless order. (jlr). (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Maria Miranda-Olivares regarding Scheduling Order 50 . (jlr) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING Motion to Withdraw As Counsel for Plaintiff 47 to be taken under advisement on 6/9/2014. (jlr) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Maria Miranda-Olivares of Motion to Withdraw As Counsel for Plaintiff 47 Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Motion to Withdraw As Counsel for Plaintiff. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion to Withdraw 47 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Withdraw As Counsel for Plaintiff. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares (Henretty, David) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Management Order. Signed on 5/8/14 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES of Proceedings: TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. ORDER: Striking all case deadlines and setting the following new case schedule. Pretrial Order waived. Pretrial Documents are due by 9/24/2014; objections are due by 10/1/2014. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/8/2014 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. A 2-day Jury Trial is set for 10/15/2014 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Jury Trial Management Order to follow. David R. Henretty present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Tape No: N/A. (st3) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference for Thursday, 5/8/2014 at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 17 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 ). Signed on 4/11/2014 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 of Additional Supplemental Authority Filed by All Plaintiffs (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Galarza v. Szalczyk, 2012 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 47023, No. 12-3991, slip op. (3d Cir. March 4, 2014)) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Defendant's Supplemental Reply 37 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave 38 .) (Henretty, David) Modified text and added link on 3/5/2014 (sss). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Reply 38 . Response is due by 3/10/14. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Reply. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Response) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Reply on Summary Judgment 17 , 23 . Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) Modified text and link on 2/28/2014 (sss). (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Defendant's supplemental reply is due by 2/27/2014. Regarding Motions for Summary Judgment 17 , 23 . (jlr) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Allow Filing of Supplemental Reply 33 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support . Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Motion to Supplement 33 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Supplement Reply on Summary Judgment. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D.R.I. Memo and Order (2/12/2014)) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Motion Hearing held regarding Motion for Summary Judgment 17 and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 . Motions are taken under advisement as of 2/11/2014. David Henretty present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott Ciecko present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. (jlr) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 23 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 53 Fed. Register 9281, # 2 Exhibit Maryland Opinion, # 3 Exhibit California Opinion) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 23 oral argument requested. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 23 for Oral Argument along with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 17 for 2/11/2014 at 9:30AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ICE FAQ from website, # 2 Exhibit Form I-247, # 3 Exhibit Jail criminal alien report, # 4 Exhibit Responses to First RFA, # 5 Exhibit Responses to First Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit Lt. Eby deposition testimony, # 7 Exhibit Sheriff deposition testimony, # 8 Exhibit Responses to Second RFA, # 9 Exhibit Arraignment transcript, # 10 Exhibit County health records, # 11 Exhibit Respnoses to Second Interrogatories, # 12 Exhibit Jail policy and procedures, # 13 Exhibit 8 CFR 287.7, # 14 Exhibit ICE policy, # 15 Exhibit ICE Answer, # 16 Exhibit ICE Motion) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Laura Miranda in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Maria Miranda-Olivares in Support of her Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of her Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: Pursuant to defendant's email request without objection by plaintiff, ORDER RESETTING Oral Argument on Motion for Summary Judgment 17 from 1/16/14 to Tuesday, 2/11/2014 at 09:30AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference. Plaintiff's cross-motion and response to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 17 are due by 11/8/2013. Defendant's reply to its Motion for Summary Judgment 17 and response to plaintiff's cross-motion are due by 12/2/2013. Plaintiff's reply to the cross-motion is due by 12/19/2013. The PTO is waived. Oral Argument is set for 1/16/2014 at 09:30AM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. If plaintiff files the last reply before 12/12/2013, the court will reset oral argument to 12/19/2013 at 9:30 AM. The court defers scheduling any jury trial on damages until after resolution of the dispositive motions. David R. Henretty present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. Modified number (21) to docket entry on 10/16/2013 (eo). (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Scott Ciecko in support of motion for summary judgment. Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 104, # 2 Exhibit 105) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Lt. Lee Eby in support of motion for summary judgment. Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 101, # 2 Exhibit 102, # 3 Exhibit 103) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of motion for summary judgment. Filed by Clackamas County. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 17 .) (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Summary Judgment . oral argument requested. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Due to a court conflict, Order RESETTING the TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference from 10/1/13 to Tuesday, 10/15/2013 at 10:30AM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart to set a trial date. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference for Tuesday, 10/1/2013 at 01:30PM to set a trial date before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court staff will initiate the call to counsel. (jlr) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines 12 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/13/2013. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/15/2013. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion is due with its Response to Defendant's Dispositive Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David Henretty in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 12 .) (Henretty, David) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint ADR Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Henretty, David) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sss) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference and Notice Regarding Civil Case Procedures. ORDER Setting the Following Case Schedule: Joint ADR Report is due by 6/20/2013. Discovery is to be completed and written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, if any, are to be filed by 7/15/2013. Defendant's Dispositive Motion is due by 8/14/2013. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion is due with its Response to Defendant's Dispositive Motion. Exchange of Expert Disclosure Statements is to be completed and the Pretrial Order is due 30 days after a final ruling on dispositive motions. Please see the attached Notice regarding additional procedures in cases before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. David R. Henretty present as counsel for plaintiff. Scott C. Ciecko present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: None. Tape No: None. Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart presiding. (ssm) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart: SETTING a TELPEHONE Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday 4/10/2013 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Plaintiff shall advise the court at the conference whether or not there will be full consent from all parties to proceed before the magistrate judge in the case. Until full consents are filed, no trial date will be set. (jlr) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to 6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Clackamas County. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended Complaint . Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares against Clackamas County. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on All Defendants Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares. (Henretty, David) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Clackamas County, Craig Roberts. (Ciecko, Scott) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sm) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/22/2013. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2013. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (sm) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $350 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3135139 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Maria Miranda-Olivares against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44, # 2 Proposed Summons for county, # 3 Proposed Summons for sheriff). (Henretty, David) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 245 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?