Toro v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-04093
District Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 11:53 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edwin Toro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwin Toro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin Toro +1 917 484 2806
v.
No Logo Adminstration For Children's Services, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Friel Fleming +1 212 356 2471 +1 212 788 3770 mfleming@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Commissioner John Mattingly, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Ronald E. Richter, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo President Gregory Floyd, Defendant
No Logo Teamsters Local 237, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Weiss & Simon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N. Ciantra +1 212 356 0238 +1 646 473 8228 tciantra@cwsny.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/8/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT in favor of Adminstration for Children's Services, City of New York, Employee's John Doe #1-50, John Doe #1-50, Teamsters Local 237, Gregory Floyd, John Mattingly, Michael Bloomberg, Ronald E. Richter against Edwin Toro. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/8/2015. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 03/08/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motions for summary judgment, (Doc. Nos. 57, 66), are hereby granted and the complaint is dismissed.The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and the accompanying Judgment to pro se plaintiff Edwin Toro, and to close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/6/2015. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 03/08/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
          Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. Responses due by 5/20/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Thomas N. Ciantra, # 4 Declaration of Todd M. Rubinstein, # 5 Declaration of Service, # 6 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum) (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U) (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice to Pro Se Litigant Who Opposes A Motion For Summary Judgment Pursuant To Local Rule 56.2 (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment; Notice to Pro Se Litigant; Memorandum in Support; Declarations of Ciantra, Rubinstein served on Edwin Toro; Omar Siddiqqi on 04-07-2014, filed by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 served on Edwin Toro, Pro Se Plaintiff on April 7, 2014, filed by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Siddiqi, Omar) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237 (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Javed Siddiqi on behalf of Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter (aty to be noticed) (Siddiqi, Omar) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for pre motion conference by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER All parties have now responded to the Court's settlement proposal. Unfortunately, there is no settlement. Parties should comply with all deadlines previously set by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/11/2013. (Bauermeister, Mischa) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2013. The parties are directed to respond to the Court's settlement proposal by 12/10/2013 (see attached Minute Entry). Copy sent via e-mail to Edwin Toro, pro se. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED ORDER re 46 MOTION to Compel. Pro se plaintiff Toro is directed to respond to this motion by November 19, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/14/2013. (Williams, Jennifer) [C/M to Plaintiff] (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Compel by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The October 29th settlement conference is adjourned to December 6, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., at which point the Court will address the scheduling of dispositive motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/21/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Compel. As explained in the attached order, plaintiff is directed to provide defendants with a release for records relating to his employment with the City Marshals no later than September 9, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/3/2013. (Williams, Jennifer) C/M to plaintiff's home address and email, etorony1@yahoo.com. (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ENHDORSED ORDER deferring ruling on 41 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to respond by Monday, August 19, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/16/2013. (Powers, Emily) c/email to etorony1@yahoo.com (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Compel by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Order for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/6/2013, granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff does not object to the City's request to extend fact discovery until October 15, 2013, which is hereby granted. The September 10th settlement conference is adjourned to October 29, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, and as detailed in the attached Minute Order, the Court grants in part and denies in part the City's motion to compel. (Williams, Jennifer) Modified to correct scheduled time on next conference on 8/12/2013 (Maynard, Pat). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Second MOTION to Compel discovery responses by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/18/2013. The Court grants the Union defendants' Motion to Compel (DE 37 ). Pro se plaintiff Edwin Toro is directed to respond to the Union defendants' document demands by August 1, 2013. The City defendants complain that plaintiff's responses to their discovery demands are deficient. The Court will not consider a motion to compel unless counsel for the City has first conferred with plaintiff to resolve the alleged deficiencies. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/18/2013.(Powers, Emily) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter MOTION to Compel by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER re 35 MOTION to Compel filed by Ronald E. Richter, John Mattingly, Michael Bloomberg, Adminstration for Children's Services, City of New York. For the reasons stated in this Court's attached Order, and in order to avoid the imposition of sanctions, plaintiff must deliver to defense counsel's office, for receipt no later than July 9, 2013, his responses to defendants discovery demands. The Court will tolerate no further delays in this case. C/mailed and sent via e-mail to Edwin Toro, pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/3/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Compel by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER re 33 Letter. The Court is in receipt of a letter dated May 3, 2013, from pro se plaintiff Edwin Toro, containing his various interrogatories and document demands, as well as requests for depositions. The parties are advised that discovery requests and responses should not be filed with the Court unless relevant to a discovery dispute that has been presented for judicial resolution. In his May 3rd letter, plaintiff notes that he is not available on Fridays. The settlement conference before the Court is scheduled for September 10, 2013, a Tuesday. C/M to pro se plaintiff, Edwin Toro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/10/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter dated 5/3/13 from Edwin Toro to Mag. Mann, advising that pltf. is available for any date except Fridays as long as the date is provided at least 2 weeks in advance. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in substantial part 31 Motion for Discovery. The Court adopts in substantial part defendants proposed schedule. Therefore, the parties are required to serve initial disclosures by May 17, 2013. Document requests and/or interrogatories (if any) must be served by May 31, 2013. Fact discovery must be completed by August 30, 2013. Requests for a premotion conference before Judge Brodie are due by September 18, 2013. A settlement conference will be held on September 10, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff is warned that he is expected to comply with all court orders and to cooperate with defense counsel in conducting discovery and in otherwise moving this case along. Failure to do so will result in in the imposition of sanctions, including possibly dismissal of his claims. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/6/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter MOTION for Discovery Motion to Set Discovery Schedule by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER The parties are directed to confer and, by May 3, 2013, to file a proposed schedule (preferably on behalf of all parties) for further proceedings in the case, including discovery. C/M to pro se plaintiff, Edwin Toro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/19/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Mattingly, Ronald E. Richter. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Letter dated 3/5/2013 from pro se Edwin Toro to Judge Mann, stating that the undersigned would like to "provide counsel for the municipal defendants with a release signed and notarized by plaintiff today March 5th, 2013" and requesting the Court's assistance regarding this matter. W/Enclosure. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 26 Letter, 25 Letter. Administration for Children's Services; Michael Bloomberg and City of New York answer due is extended to 4/19/2013. For the reasons stated in this Court's Memorandum and Order. It is unclear from plaintiff's letter what discovery deadline he is referencing in requesting a 20-day extension. Plaintiff and defense counsel are directed to confer in good faith regarding this issue, and defendants are encouraged to accommodate plaintiff's request.C/M to pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/25/2013. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Letter dated 2/19/13 from Edwin Toro to USMJ Mann, advising the Court that pltffs will proceed pro se, due to consequences of defts actions to affect pltff's economic structure. Pltff currently request to extend an additional 45 days, re: discovery. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter dated 2/19/13 from Edwin Toro to advising wishing to proceed pro-se; plaintiff will grant defendants 45 days with condition plaintiff will receive at least 20 days to provide discovery. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER re 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Plaintiff is directed to show cause by, February 19, 2013, why defendants' request should not be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/12/2013. (Williams, Jennifer) C/M via Fed Ex to plaintiff. (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Adminstration for Children's Services, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. Teamsters Local 237 served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. Michael Bloomberg served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. City of New York served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. Adminstration for Children's Services served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. John Mattingly served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. Ronald E. Richter served on 1/10/2013, answer due 1/31/2013. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This Court denies plaintiff's request for counsel, with leave to renew the request as the case progresses. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter this Order into the ECF system and to mail a copy to pro se plaintiff. C/M to Edwin Toro, pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/26/2012. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Letter dated 12/12/12 from Edwin Toro to USMJ Mann, providing the Court with a "brief summary of the severity of pltff's case." (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel; filed by pro se Edwin Toro, dated 12/14/2012. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Receipt of Summons and Complaint By Mail Executed as to Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of NY dated 11/19/12. Acknowledgement filed by Edwin Toro. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/13/2012. Pro se plaintiff would like additional time to attempt to retain an attorney. By January 18, 2013, he should have his attorney file a notice of appearance (and, if plaintiff's counsel wants to amend the complaint, permission to amend the pleading) or plaintiff should notify the Court and counsel, in writing, that he will be proceeding pro se. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Toro. Gregory Floyd served on 11/9/2012, answer due 11/30/2012. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael Bloomberg and City of New York answer due is extended to 2/11/2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/27/2012. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York. (Shaffer, Ryan) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2012 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. C/M to pro se plaintiff, Edwin Toro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/15/2012. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237. (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Ciantra on behalf of Gregory Floyd, Teamsters Local 237 (aty to be noticed) (Ciantra, Thomas) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable, "Return to Sender, Attempted-Not Known; Unable to Forward." Order dated 9/27/12 previously sent to Edwin Toro. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting pltff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The US Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint upon the named defts' without prepayment of fees. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/27/2012) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwin Toro. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edwin Toro. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?