Smart Options, LLC v. WhyTeeZee, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01824

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 12:13 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smart Options, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist Denenberg Ament & Rubenstein, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J O'Hara +1 312 521 2000 +1 312 521 2100 mohara@muchshelist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smart Options, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Andrew Baker +1 708 707 8778 geoffb@optionit.com
v.
No Logo BitBend, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Heidi Brown, Defendant
No Logo Options Away, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachlis Duff Adler & Peel, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rachlis +1 312 733 3950 mrachlis@rdaplaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachlis Duff Adler Peel & Kaplan, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marion B. Adler +1 312 733 3957 madler@rdaplaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew George Peel +1 312 733 3950 dpeel@rdaplaw.net
No Logo ROBERT BROWN, Defendant
No Logo WhyTeeZee, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachlis Duff Adler & Peel, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rachlis +1 312 733 3950 mrachlis@rdaplaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachlis Duff Adler Peel & Kaplan, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marion B. Adler +1 312 733 3957 madler@rdaplaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Drew George Peel +1 312 733 3950 dpeel@rdaplaw.net
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: # 1 Patent Closing Order) (ph, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses its complaint with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Smart Options, LLC Smart Options, LLC's Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice (O'Hara, Martin) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC by Martin John O'Hara (O'Hara, Martin) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Martin John O'Hara for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 27 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/12/2014 at 09:15 AM. (O'Hara, Martin) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Motion by Drew George Peel for presentment of motion to stay 24 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Peel, Drew) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint Motion for extension of time 21 for the stay of all proceedings and continue all deadlines in this action until and including September 2, 2014, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 6/18/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Motion by Drew George Peel for presentment of extension of time 21 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/18/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Peel, Drew) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Defendants Heidi Brown, Robert Brown, Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC for extension of time (Peel, Drew) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants BitBend, LLC, Heidi Brown, Robert Brown, Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC to stay (Joint) Pending Mediation 18 is granted. Notice of Motion date of 4/22/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Motion by Marion B. Adler for presentment of motion to stay 18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/22/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                MOTION by Defendants BitBend, LLC, Heidi Brown, Robert Brown, Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC to stay (Joint) Pending Mediation (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC for extension of time 11 to file answer regarding complaint, to and including 4/21/2014, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 4/8/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE by Smart Options, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, 1 11 NOTING NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC by Michael Rachlis (Rachlis, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC by Drew George Peel (Peel, Drew) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Motion by Marion B. Adler for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 11 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/8/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, 1 (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Options Away, LLC, WhyTeeZee, LLC by Marion B. Adler (Adler, Marion) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC as to WhyTeeZee, LLC on 03/18/2014 answer due on 4/8/2014. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC as to Options Away, LLC on 03/18/2014 answer due on 4/8/2014. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ea, ). (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Correction regarding 6 (ea, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ea, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Smart Options, LLC LR 3.4 Notice of Patent Claim (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Smart Options, LLC (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC by Geoffrey Andrew Baker (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Smart Options, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9292855. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, USPN 7313539, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, USPN 8301550, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, 10.08.12 emails, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, 10.12.12 emails, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, 10.24.12 emails, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F, Side Letter, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G, Promissory Note, # 8 Exhibit Ex. H, 03.04.13 emails, # 9 Exhibit Ex. I, Notices Terminating License and Exercising Audit Right, # 10 Exhibit Ex. J, 10.23.13 emails)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?