Ashish Anand v. Lihua International Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-05037
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2019 at 10:01 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ashish Anand, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Daphne Yan Huang, Defendant
No Logo Lihua International Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Ben-Shahar +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 sbs@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristin Beneski +1 206 223 7000 beneskik@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Loebs Davis +1 206 223 7060 +1 206 223 7107 davisc@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DOUGLAS W. GREENE +1 206 223 6103 +1 206 223 7107 greened@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter D. Hawkes +1 503 778 2100 +1 503 778 2200 hawkesp@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Shapiro +1 212 940 8566 +1 212 894 5766 jay.shapiro@kattenlaw.com
No Logo James Holtz, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PHILLIP C. KIM +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Stern +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 jstern@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Jeffrey Grodko, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Marc Goldberg +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mmgoldberg@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert V. Prongay +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 rprongay@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 pdahlstrom@pomlaw.com
No Logo Philip Cafaro, Bankruptcy Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Betsy Carol Manifold +1 619 239 4599 manifold@whafh.com
No Logo Robert B. Dreisin, Movant
No Logo Shawn Hart, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Oliver O'Mara +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 bomara@rgrdlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE granting 154 Motion for Settlement: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, this 21st day of July, 2017, that: Capitalized terms used herein have the meanings defined in the Stipulation unless otherwise defined herein. Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and for the purposes of the Settlement only, the Action is hereby preliminarily certified as a class action on behalf of all persons who purchased or otherwise acquired common stock of Lihua during the period from August 9, 2012 through and including April 30, 2014. Excluded from the Settlement Class are: a. Defendants, and all current and former officers, directors, and control persons of Lihua, and such excluded persons' immediate families and Defendants' legal representatives, heirs, successors and assigns, any entity in which any excluded person has or has had a controlling interest, and Lihua predecessors, and as further set forth in this order. A hearing (the "Settlement Hearing") pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e) is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on November 21, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for the following purposes: a. to finally determine whether the Action satisfies the applicable prerequisites for class action treatment under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 23(a) and (b), and as further set forth in this order. Lead Plaintiff's Counsel are authorized to establish a Notice and Administration Account (as defined in the Stipulation) of not more than $100,000 (One Hundred Thousand Dollars), to be used for reasonable out-of-pocket costs in connection with providing notice of the Settlement to the Settlement Class and for other reasonable out-of-pocket administrative expenses. All papers in support of the Settlement, the Plan of Allocation and any application for Attorneys' Fees or Expenses or an Award to Lead Plaintiff shall be filed and served twenty-one (21) calendar days before the Settlement Hearing. Any submissions filed in response to any objections or in further support of the Settlement, the Plan of Allocation and any application for Attorneys' Fees or Expenses or an Award to Lead Plaintiff shall be filed no later than seven (7) calendar days prior to the Settlement Hearing. Pending final determination of whether the Settlement should be approved, all Settlement Class Members, and each of them, and anyone acting or purporting to act for any of them, shall be enjoined from prosecuting, attempting to prosecute, or assisting others in the prosecution of, any Settled Claims. In addition, the Action is stayed, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/21/2017) (jwh) Modified on 7/21/2017 (jwh). (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of ERRATA re: 154 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)., 155 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 Notice of Pendency and Settlement of Class Action, # 2 Exhibit A-2 Summary Notice of Class Action Settlement, # 3 Exhibit A-3 Proof of Claim and Release)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Errata re: 154 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)., 155 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, 159 Letter. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, # 2 Exhibit A of Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, # 3 Exhibit A-3 of Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement, # 4 Exhibit B of Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alessandra Phillips dated July 7, 2017 re: Corrected Documents regarding the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Document filed by James Holtz.(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER in case 1:14-cv-05034-RA; granting (157) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:14-cv-05037-RA-RLE. A telephone conference in this action and the Shareholder Derivative Action is scheduled for June 29, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties shall jointly call the Court at 212-805-0162 at that time. (Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/26/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05037-RA-RLE, 1:14-cv-05034-RA (cf) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated June 22, 2017. Document filed by James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of non-opposition re: 154 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement).. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/29/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 155 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 154 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)., 152 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement). . Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 to the Memorandum of Law in Support of, # 2 Stipulation and Agreement, # 3 Exhibit A to Stipulation and Agreement, # 4 Exhibit A1 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 5 Exhibit A2 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 6 Exhibit A3 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 7 Exhibit B to Stipulation and Agreement)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement). Document filed by James Holtz.(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of of ERRATA re: 152 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement).. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 CORRECTED Version of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement). Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Appendix 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support, # 3 Stipulation and Agreement, # 4 Exhibit A to Stipulation and Agreement, # 5 Exhibit A-1 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 6 Exhibit A-2 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 7 Exhibit A-3 to Stipulation and Agreement, # 8 Exhibit B to Stipulation and Agreement)(Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 4/27/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting 150 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/15/2017) (mro) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file settlement papers addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Bret Finkelstein dated 3/13/2017. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 148 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/24/2017) (cf) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene dated 02/24/2017. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty days. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/1/2017) (cf) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 145 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference in light of the parties reaching a settlement agreement in principle addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Douglas W. Greene dated 01/31/2017. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report to Judge Ellis Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 142 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. Status Letter to be e-filed by 1/17/2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Bret A. Finkelstein dated 12/8/2016. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report to Judge Ellis Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/29/2016) (cla) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #106638 re: 124 MOTION to Serve for alternative service filed by Peter Hoang, James Holtz, Beverly Burks. The cases permitting alternative service such as that proposed by Plaintiffs have found that it is "impossible to imagine" that the individual defendants would not be made aware of the pending action against them by the corporate entities. In re GLG Life Tech Corp. Sec. Litig., 287 F.R.D. at 267. The facts set forth by Greene leave considerable room for doubt that such service would be reasonably calculated to apprise Zhu and Wang of the claims against them. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/12/2016) (kko) Modified on 8/17/2016 (ca). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTER ROGATORY) PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS: This Court, in the spirit of comity and reciprocity, hereby requests international judicial assistance in the form of this Letter of Request seeking information, documents, and things described herein from the Ministry of Justice of China, for the attention of the International Legal Cooperation Center. This Court extends to all judicial and other authorities of the PRC the assurances of its highest consideration. This Court expresses its sincere willingness to provide similar assistance to the courts of the PRC if future circumstances require. (As further set forth.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/10/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF A REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTER OF REQUEST) UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' Application for Letter of Request is GRANTED; 2. The Letters of Request under the Hague Convention will be issued in duplicate herewith, signed by the Court; and 3. The Clerk of the Court shall affix its official seal the Letter of Request, file a copy of the sealed Letter of Request in the docket of this action, and return to Plaintiffs' counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/10/2016) (kko) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    BRIEF re: 127 Application for Letters Rogatory . Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION to Serve for alternative service. . Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene in Opposition re: 124 MOTION to Serve for alternative service.. Document filed by Lihua International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 124 MOTION to Serve for alternative service. . Document filed by Lihua International Inc.. (Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 131 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference set for 9/13/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Douglas W. Greene dated 07/19/2016. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Order entered at Docket No. 126 is WITHDRAWN. Defendants may file their opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for alternative service (Doc. No. 124.) by July 25, 2016. Plaintiffs may file a reply by August 1, 2016. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 7/11/2016) (kko) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Douglas W. Greene dated 07/08/2016 re: Order Granting Motion for Alternative Service of Defendants Zhu Jianhua and Yaying Wang (Dckt. 126). Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    BRIEF re: 127 Application for Letters Rogatory, 1 Complaint, . Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      APPLICATION FOR LETTERS ROGATORY by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 7/11/2016, Doc. #130 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ZHU JIANHUA AND YAYING WANG granting 124 Motion to Serve. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall effect service on Defendants Zhu Jianhua and Yaying Wang by mailing a copy of the Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 77) and summons to: 1. Lihua International, Inc.'s registered agent; and 2. Lihua International, Inc.'s counsel of record in this litigation; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service shall be deemed effective 7 (seven) days after Plaintiffs have completed the actions this Order requires them to complete. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 7/8/2016) (kko) Modified on 7/11/2016 (kko). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION to Serve for alternative service. . Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Serve for alternative service. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report to Judge Ellis in advance of June 20 Conference. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: You are ORDERED to appear for a STATUS CONFERENCE, to be held on Monday, June 20, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C, in front of the Honorable Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242. (Status Conference set for 6/20/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 5/16/2016) (kko) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: These related actions were referred to the undersigned for general pretrial. Following a status conference with the Parties today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for fact discovery in both actions is November 16, 2017. (Fact Discovery due by 11/16/2017.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 5/16/2016) (kko) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ANSWER to 77 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bret A. Finkelstein on behalf of Lihua International Inc.. New Address: Lane Powell PC, 1420 Fifth Ave., Suite 4200, PO Box 91302, Seattle, WA, USA 98111-9402, 206-223-7033. (Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bret A. Finkelstein on behalf of Lihua International Inc.. (Finkelstein, Bret) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 116 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference set for 5/16/2016 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least THREE BUSINESS DAYS before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquiries to Rupa Shah, 212-805-0242 (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis)(Text Only Order) (Ellis, Ronald) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis from Douglas W. Greene dated 04/28/2016. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/22/2016) (tro) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER denying 111 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated on the record at today's conference, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate item number 111 on the docket. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/22/2016) (cf) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 111 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 107 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Add and Terminate Parties,,,, Set Hearings,,, 1 Complaint, . . Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re; 107 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Add and Terminate Parties,,,, Set Hearings,,, 1 Complaint, . Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Lihua International, Inc. ("Lihua") respectfully moves for an adjournment of its time to answer the Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint from Thursday, April 14, 2016, until May 13, 2016. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Lihua International Inc. answer due 5/13/2016. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/13/2016) (ama) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene dated April 13, 2016. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 107 Memorandum & Opinion, Add and Terminate Parties, Set Hearings. (vf) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              OPINION & ORDER #106368: The Represented Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted with respect to Daphne Yan Huang, Robert C. Bruce, Jonathan P. Serbin, and Kelvin Lau and denied with respect to Lihua International, Inc. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate item number 80 on the docket and dismiss Defendants Huang, Bruce, Serbin, and Lau from this action. Counsel for the remaining parties shall appear for a conference on April 22, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. No later than one week before the conference, the parties shall jointly submit a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Abrams. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Opinion) Kelvin Lau, Jonathan P. Serbin, Robert C. Bruce and Daphne Yan Huang terminated., ( Status Conference set for 4/22/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/31/2016) (kl) Modified on 4/8/2016 (ca). (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Laurence M. Rosen dated March 28, 2016 re: Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037 (RA) PetroChina Appeal. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/8/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/8/2016 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Laurence M. Rosen dated 3/14/2016 re: Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037 (RA) PetroChina Appeal and Service on Defendants. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene dated March 3, 2016 re: In re Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037-RA. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin.(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated March 3, 2016 re: Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037 (RA) Effect of Ninth Circuit ChinaCast Decision. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: In preparing for oral argument, the Court has become aware of In re ChinaCast Education Corporation Securities Litigation, 809 F.3d 471 (9th Cir. 2015), in which the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals reversed a district court opinion on which Defendants rely in their motion to dismiss. No later than March 3, 2016, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each file a letter to the Court not to exceed three pages describing how, if at all, the Ninth Circuit's opinion affects the merits of Defendants' motion. The parties should also be prepared to discuss the Ninth Circuit's opinion at oral argument. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/26/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Oral argument on the represented Defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby scheduled on March 8, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. So ordered. (Oral Argument set for 3/8/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/28/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Opposition to Judicial Notice. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Yan Hing Wong in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Max Staffa in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Bret Newman in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 40, # 2 Exhibit 41, # 3 Exhibit 42, # 4 Exhibit 43)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Errata re: 87 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Memorandum of Law In Opposition)(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Corrected Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jing Chen in Opposition re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene, Claire Loebs Davis, Kristin Beneski, Jay Shapiro, Brian Oubre dated 03/16/15 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin.(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Qian Wang in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jianjian Wang in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14, # 2 Exhibit 15-18, # 3 Exhibit 19-30, # 4 Exhibit 31(a), # 5 Exhibit 31(b), # 6 Exhibit 32(a) Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 32(a) Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 32(b), # 9 Exhibit 33-39)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. Responses due by 4/30/2015(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants Lihua International, Inc., Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Siu Ki Lau, and Jonathan P. Serbin (the "Represented Defendants") shall move to dismiss the Corrected Second Amended Class Action Complaint no later than March 16, 2015. 2. Lead Plaintiff shall file his opposition brief to the motion to dismiss no later than April 30, 2015; and 3. The Represented Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of the motion to dismiss no later than June 1, 2015. Motions due by 3/16/2015. Responses due by 4/30/2015. Replies due by 6/1/2015. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/17/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 77 Amended Complaint, 74 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 64 Amended Complaint, against Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin, Yaying Wang, Jianhua Zhu with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Holtz, Peter Hoang, Beverly Burks. Related document: 64 Amended Complaint, filed by Peter Hoang, James Holtz, Beverly Burks.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 75 Letter, filed by Peter Hoang, James Holtz, Beverly Burks. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/5/2015) (tn) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated February 5, 2015 re: Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037 (RA) Leave to File Corrected Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Corrected Second Amended Complaint)(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 64 Amended Complaint, against Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin, Yaying Wang, Jianhua Zhu with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Holtz, Peter Hoang, Beverly Burks. Related document: 64 Amended Complaint, filed by Peter Hoang, James Holtz, Beverly Burks.(Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 2/2/2015 (cde). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Consistent with today's proceedings, Plaintiffs' motion to lift the automatic discovery stay imposed by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act ("PSLRA"), 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(b)(3)(B), is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby: ORDERED that the Court will hold a status conference in this matter on Tuesday, January 13, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 1/13/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/6/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated December 30, 2014 re: Re: Lihua International Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 14-CV-5037 (RA) Filing of Amended Complaint. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05037-RA, 1:14-cv-05034-RA(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 6-10, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 11-15, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 16-18, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 19-20, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 21-25, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 26-31)(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 67 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin. Responses due by 2/16/2015(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert C. Bruce, Kelvin Lau, Jonathan P. Serbin, Yaying Wang. (jom) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yaying Wang, Jonathan Serbin, Kelvin Lau, Robert C. Bruce, re: 64 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Beverly Burks, Peter Hoang, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Robert C. Bruce, Daphne Yan Huang, Kelvin Lau, Lihua International Inc., Jonathan P. Serbin, Yaying Wang, Jianhua Zhu with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Holtz, Peter Hoang, Beverly Burks. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Ashish Anand.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 62 Letter, filed by James Holtz. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/22/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated October 21, 2014 re: Leave to File Corrected First Amended Complaint. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Corrected First Amended Complaint)(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Holtz, Peter Hoang, Beverly Burks. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Ashish Anand.(Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 10/20/2014 (cde). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 10/16/2014 re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. . Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene in Opposition re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014.. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jonathan Stern in Support re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014.. Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. . Document filed by James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Xinxing Zhang in Opposition re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014.. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Douglas W. Greene in Opposition re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014.. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. . Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 52 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall meet in person on September 29, 2014, and attempt - in good faith -- to reach an agreement regarding this dispute. In the event that this meet-and-confer is unsuccessful, Defendants may file an opposition of up to fifteen pages by October 2, 2014. Plaintiffs may then file a reply of up to fifteen pages in response by October 10, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/24/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene, Claire Loebs Davis, Kristin Beneski, Peter Hawkes, Jay Shapiro, Brian Oubre dated 09/24/2014 re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. . Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/24/2014 re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. requesting schedule. Document filed by Ashish Anand, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. ENDORSEMENT: A telephone conference is scheduled for 3 p.m. on September 23, 2014. At that time, the parties shall jointly call Courtroom Deputy Allison Cavale at 212-805-0284. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/22/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Douglas W. Greene, Claire Loebs Davis, Kristin Beneski, Peter Hawkes, Jay Shapiro, Brian Oubre dated 09/22/2014 re: 48 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. . Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to Partially Lift PSLRA Stay addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Stern dated 9/19/2014. Document filed by Ashish Anand, James Holtz.(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Lead Plaintiff shall file a consolidated amended complaint no later than October 17, 2014; 2. The Represented Defendants shall answer or move to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint no later than December 16, 2014; 3. Lead Plaintiff shall file his opposition briefs to any motion to dismiss no later than February 16, 2015; 4. The Represented Defendants shall file their reply briefs in support of any motion to dismiss no later than March 18, 2015; and 6. Nothing herein shall constitute a waiver of any rights or defenses that the Represented Defendants would otherwise have. 7. This Stipulation applies only to the undersigned parties, who concur in the filing's content and have authorized its filing. Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2014. Motions due by 12/16/2014. Responses due by 2/16/2015. Replies due by 3/18/2015. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/9/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 45 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/9/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference September 12, 2014 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Laurence M. Rosen, Jonathan Stern, Douglas W. Greene, Claire Loebs Davis, Jay Shapiro dated September 9, 2014. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc..(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and proposed order)(Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Douglas Hawkes on behalf of Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc., Lihua International Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05037-RA, 1:14-cv-05034-RA(Hawkes, Peter) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that: 1. The above-captioned actions 14-cv-5034 (Grodko v. Lihua International Inc., et al.) and 14-cv-5037 (Anand v. Lihua International Inc., et al.) are consolidated for all purposes (the "Consolidated Action"). This Order shall apply to the Consolidated Action and to each case that relates to the same subject matter that is subsequently filed in this Court or is transferred to this Court, and is consolidated with the Consolidated Action. 2. A Master File is established for this proceeding. The Master File shall be Case No. 14-cv- 5037. The Clerk shall file all pleadings in the Master File and note such findings on the Master Docket. 3. Every filing in the Consolidated Action should be captioned as set forth in this order. 7. James Holtz is appointed lead plaintiff and his motion for approval of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., as class counsel is granted. 8. An initial conference is scheduled for 3 p.m. on September 12, 2014, to be held in Courtroom 1506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. 9. By September 5, 2014, the parties shall submit on ECF a joint letter containing all information required by Section 1.A and Exhibit A of the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York ("Pilot Project"). As the docket indicates, the Pilot Project's rules shall govern this case; they are available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ Complex_ Civil_Rules_pilot.pdf. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/11/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-05034-RA, 1:14-cv-05037-RA(lmb) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 36 Motion for Kristin Beneski to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 35 Motion for Claire Loebs Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 31 Motion for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Stern on behalf of Ashish Anand, James Holtz. (Stern, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Lead Plaintiff Motion of James Holtz re: 13 . Document filed by James Holtz. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Kristin Beneski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9923082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc..(Beneski, Kristin) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Claire Loebs Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9903977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc..(Davis, Claire) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 11 , 19 , 13 . Document filed by Shawn Hart. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re: 16 , 11 , 13 Notice of Non-Opposition of Robert B. Dreisin to Competing Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Robert B. Dreisin. (Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: 11 . Document filed by Philip Cafaro. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Douglas W. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9897565. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc..(Greene, Douglas) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 16 , 11 , 19 . Document filed by James Holtz. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lihua International Inc..(Shapiro, Jay) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Shapiro on behalf of Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Shapiro, Jay) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Moylan Guiney on behalf of Philip Cafaro. (Guiney, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phillip C. Kim on behalf of Ashish Anand, James Holtz. (Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:14-cv-03381. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1404 by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Case electronically transferred. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: # 1 CV-22 Transmittal Letter) (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Robert B. Dreisin, (Glancy, Lionel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lionel Z. Glancy in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff 19 filed by Movant Robert B. Dreisin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B: Certification, # 3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D: Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit E: Firm Resume)(Glancy, Lionel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff 19 filed by Movant Robert B. Dreisin. (Glancy, Lionel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Robert B. Dreisin. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Lionel Zevi Glancy added to party Robert B. Dreisin(pty:mov))(Glancy, Lionel) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Brian O. O'Mara in support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel SHAWN HARTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL 16 filed by Movant Shawn Hart. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(O'Mara, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel SHAWN HARTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL 16 filed by Movant Shawn Hart. (O'Mara, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel SHAWN HARTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by Movant Shawn Hart. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Brian Oliver O'Mara added to party Shawn Hart(pty:mov))(O'Mara, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Laurence Rosen in support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13 filed by Movant James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Appointment of Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13 filed by Movant James Holtz. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. as Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff ( Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.), MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Movant James Holtz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party James Holtz(pty:mov))(Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of Movant Philip Cafaro's MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff 11 filed by Movant Philip Cafaro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D)(Manifold, Betsy) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff filed by movant Philip Cafaro. Motion set for hearing on 8/4/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Betsy C Manifold added to party Philip Cafaro(pty:bkmov))(Manifold, Betsy) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc., identifying Lihua International, Inc.; Daphne Huang; Ashish Anand; Jianhua Zhu; Starr Companies. (Ben-Shahar, Sharon) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by defendants Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sharon Ben-Shahar added to party Daphne Yan Huang(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon Ben-Shahar added to party Lihua International Inc.(pty:dft))(Ben-Shahar, Sharon) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Ashish Anand. upon Daphne Yan Huang waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/12/2014, answer due 7/11/2014. Waiver of Service signed by Counsel for defendant Daphne Yan Huang. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ashish Anand, upon Defendant Lihua International Inc. served on 5/2/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Matthews, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Rosen, Laurence) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (pso) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ashish Anand. (et) (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc., Jianhua Zhu. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Daphne Yan Huang, Lihua International Inc., Jianhua Zhu. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Ashish Anand. (et) (jp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2014: # 1 Summons) (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 7/3/2014.] (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 390 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?