USA v. Couch, et al
Criminal Case Alabama Middle District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00172

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2021 at 4:15 PM DT (2.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Extend Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Order Appointing Public Defender
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 304 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Amended Judgment
            AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1), Count(s) 1, LIFE (concurrent with Cts 2,5,6,7,8,9,12 and 14); 10 Yrs Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); SA:11/22/10 Rule 35 Motion granted - sentence reduced to 180 Mos Imp (cc w/cts 2, 5, 6, 7, 9, 12, and 14 and cs to ct 13 and cc to Montgomery CC Case No. 2003-539); Count(s) 12, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 13, 60 Months (consecutive to remaining counts); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 14, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 2, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 5, 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,6,7,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); SA: 11/22/10 Rule 35 Motion granted - sentence reduced to 180 Mos Imp (cc w/cts 1, 2, 6, 7, 9, 12, and 14 and cs to ct 13 and cc to Montgomery CC Case No. 2003-539); Count(s) 6, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 7, 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA: 11/222/10 Rule 35 Motion granted - sentence reduced to 180 Mos Imp (cc w/cts 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 12, and 14 and cs to ct 13 and cc to Montgomery CC Case No. 2003-539); Count(s) 8, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA; Count(s) 9, 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,7, 8,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); SA: 11/22/10 Rule 35 Motion granted - sentence reduced to 180 Mos Imp (cc w/cts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 12, and 14 and cs to ct 13 and cc to Montgomery CC Case No. 2003-539). Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/30/2010. (ag, )
              LREF
              Blank 303 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              ORDER granting [301] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (1); granting [302] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Attys Todd A. Brown and A. Clark Morris withdrawn from case as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1)). Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/30/2010. (ag, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. (Brown, Todd)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 301 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. (Morris, A.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Honorable Myron H. Thompson:Motion Hearing as to Calvin Lavalle Couch held on 11/22/2010 re [295] MOTION to Reduce Sentence filed by United States of America (PDF available for court use only) (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (ag, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 299 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William A. McGeachy appearing for Calvin Lavalle Couch (McGeachy, William)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christine Ann Freeman appearing for Calvin Lavalle Couch (Freeman, Christine)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Order Appointing Public Defender
                          ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. Federal Defender for Calvin Lavalle Couch appointed.. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/10/2010. (ag, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 296 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Order
                            ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch re [295] MOTION for Downward Departure filed by United States of America: Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2FMJ before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. The government is to arrange for the presence of defendant Calvin Lavalle Couch. The clerk of the court is to arrange for the appointment of counsel for defendant Couch. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 11/10/2010. (ag, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 295 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1
                              MOTION for Downward Departure by United States of America as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. (Redmond, Susan)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                ORDER denying [243] Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and motion for copy fees as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1). Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/30/2008. (ag, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 243 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Pro-Se MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis and motion for copy fees by Calvin Lavalle Couch. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(ag, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
                                  CJA 20 as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Authorization to Pay Debra Hollis. Amount: $ 10,239.40, Voucher # 040903000103. Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/29/04. (ws, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 USCA Entry of Dismissal
                                    Entry of Dismissal issued as the MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Calvin Lavalle Couch re 04-12227-AA, [196] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, that Pursuant to the appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice, Fed.R.App.P 42 and 11th Cir.R. 42-1(a), the above-referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed this 15th day of October, 2004. FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION (ydw, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
                                      CJA 24 as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Authorization to Pay Mitchell Reisner $99.00 for Sentencing Transcript . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 06/28/04. (ydw, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Transcript Information FormCourt Filing
                                        Received TRANSCRIPT Information Sheet by Debra Hollis counsel for Calvin Lavalle Couch re 04-12227-A, [196] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment with following notation: "I am ordering a transcript of the following proceedings" Sentence 04/23/04, Judge Thompson, Mitchell Reisner CR.; Copy to Mitchell Reisner Court Reporter (ydw, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Transcript Information Form
                                          Received TRANSCRIPT Order Information Sheet from Debra Hollis counsel for Calvin Lavalle Couch re 04-12227-A, [196] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment with following notation: "Other - Defendant Couch has filed and been awarded forma pauperis, Counsel for defendant respectfully requests that all necessary transcripts including, but not limited: voir dire, opening/closing statements, prosecution rebuttal, jury instructions"; Copy to Mitchell Reisner, Court Reporter (ydw, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
                                            CJA 24 as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Authorization to Pay Mitchell Reisner $ 2,019.60 for Transcript, Voucher # 040423000016. . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/21/04. (ws, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Notice of Correction
                                              NOTICE of Correction to attach pdf to the Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis, (ydw, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/3/04. (Doc. no. 196 Notice of Appeal construed as containing M/IFP) (ydw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2004 (ydw, ).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL (construed as containing a M/IFP) to the United States Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit by Calvin Lavalle Couch form the sentence entered by this court on 4/23/04, re [195] Judgment (ydw, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                    JUDGMENT as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1): Count 1 - LIFE (concurrent with Cts 2,5,6,7,8,9,12 and 14); 10 Yrs Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 12 - 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 13 - 60 Months (consecutive to remaining counts); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 14 - 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 2 - 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 5: 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,6,7,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 6 - 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count(s) 7, 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 8. 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 9 - 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,7, 8,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA . Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/23/2004. (snc)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 SentencingCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for SENTENCING HEARING held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/19/2004 for Calvin Lavalle Couch (1). Count 1: LIFE (concurrent with Cts 2,5,6,7,8,9,12 and 14); 10 Yrs Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 12: 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 13: 60 Months (consecutive to remaining counts); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 14: 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12); 3 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 2: 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 5: 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,6,7,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Sup Rel (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count(s) 6, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 7, 8, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count 7: 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count(s) 8, 120 Months (concurrent with Counts 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 9, 12, 14); 8 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. Count(s) 9, 360 Months (concurrent with Counts 1,2,5,6,7, 8,12,14); 6 Years Supervised Release (concurrent with remaining counts); $100 SA. (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (snc)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE IN SENTENCING HEARING as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. Sentencing RESET for 4/19/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2E before Honorable Myron H. Thompson. (snc)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Order on Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying [169] motion for judgment of acquittal as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1); denying [169] motion for new trial as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1). Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/9/2004. (snc)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [172-1] motion for Transcript (Trial) and directing the clerk to make the arrangement for the 2/2/04 to 2/04/04 trial transcript at government's expense (Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: counsel, Copies furnished to: usa, counsel, Reisner, yg (snc)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION by Calvin Lavalle Couch for Transcript (Trial) [172-1] referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (snc)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                RESPONSE by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch re [169-1] motion for Judgment of Acquittal, [169-2] motion for New Trial referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (snc)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch Response to Motion reset for 3/11/04 re [169-1] motion for Judgment of Acquittal, and [169-2] motion for New Trial ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa (snc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Motion for Acquittal Court Filing
                                                                    MOTION by Calvin Lavalle Couch for Judgment of Acquittal , or, in the alternative, for New Trial [169-1] referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson, [169-2] referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (snc)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (follows oral order denying [0-0] oral motion to Suppress (statement & drugs) entered 2/2/04 ) ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspts (snc)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch that the hearsay statements of the coconspirators were and are admissible against defendant Calvin Lavalle Couch with regard to the methamphetamine-distribution conspiracy ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: usa, usm, uspo, usptso (snc)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          Courtroom Deputy's Minutes of JURY TRIAL before Judge Myron Thompson as to Calvin Lavalle Couch; witness and exhibit lists attached; non-sensitive exhibits located in expansion folder with case file; sensitive exhibits returned to AUSA at conclusion of trial. Mitchell Reisner, Court Reporter (snc) Modified on 03/22/2004
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch setting Sentencing for 9:00 4/20/04 before Judge Myron H. Thompson in Courtroom 2E , directing counsel to communicate in writing to the PO by 3/30/04 any objections to the PSR, and directing that parties shall be available for a conference with the PO on 3/31/04 at 10, as outlined in order. ( Signed Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspts, yg, hc (snc)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Jury Verdict
                                                                              JURY VERDICT of Guilty: Calvin Lavalle Couch (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 13, 14 (Copy furnished PO) (snc)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Jury Notes
                                                                                Jury note/question filed as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (snc)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Docket AnnotationCourt Filing
                                                                                  United States Proposed Finding on Scope of Conspiracy (as directed by the Court) as to defendant Calvin Lavalle Couch. Referred to Judge Myron Thompson (snc) Modified on 02/05/2004
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Docket Annotation
                                                                                    Court's INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (snc)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Docket Annotation
                                                                                      REDACTED INDICTMENT by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for trial purposes. (snc)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                        Courtroom Deputy's Minutes as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Change of plea hearing NOT HELD; Deft does not wish to enter a guilty plea. (ws)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          Courtroom Deputy's Minutes of 1/26/04 Jury Selection before Judge Myron Thompson as to Calvin Lavalle Couch: Mitchell Reisner, Court Reporter (snc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch setting Change of Plea Hearing for 8:30 1/30/04 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody in Courtroom 4B , directing the Clerk to provide a court reporter for this proceeding , and directing the USM to Produce the defendant, if in custody ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspto, ws, yg, hc (snc)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Proposed Jury InstructionsCourt Filing
                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch Referred to Judge Thompson (snc)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                TRIAL NOTICE as to Calvin Lavalle Couch; Jury Selection 1/26/04 with Trial set for 9:00 2/2/04 for Calvin Lavalle Couch at Courtroom 2E; TRIAL Notice to defenant and to counsel and usa with Juror Profile and Clothing Notices (snc)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch setting Change of Plea Hearing for 2:30 1/16/04 before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody in Courtroom 4B , directing the clerk to provide a court reporter, and directing the USM to produce the defendant, if in custody ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspsto, ws, yg, hc (snc)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch referring the defendant to the Magistrate Judge for guilty plea proceedings ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspts (snc)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [149-1] motion for an Order directing the USM to Release Custody of prisoner Markeith Yarbrough into the custody of SA Tom Halasz and/or David DeJohn on 1/9/04 through 3/31/04 and directing the agents to return said prisoner when they have finished with him ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, (snc)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Sealed Document +Court Filing
                                                                                                        PETITION (MOTION) by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for an Order directing the USM to Release Custody of prisoner Markeith Yarbrough into the custody of SA Tom Halasz and/or David DeJohn on 1/9/04 through 3/31/04 so that said agents can take such prisoner into custody for the purpose of transporting him to the office of the USA without the necessity of the presence of a Deputy USM and to return said prisoner to said USM when they have finished with him. [149-1] referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (ws)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 1/7/2004 CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay Court Filing
                                                                                                          CJA 20 Authorization to pay Crowell Pate DeBardeleben for defendant Calvin Lavalle Couch , Amount: $ 3,037.49 Voucher # 031204000077 ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: Counsel, (ws)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Calvin Lavalle Couch by Attorney Debra Hollis (snc)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch, Joseph Adam Sullivan, Jason Agles, Daniel O'Sullivan, Brian Sexton granting [133-1] motion to Strike Forfeiture Allegations 2-5 ([1-1] indictment) as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1), Jason Agles (3) ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dfts, Copies furnished to: usa, counsel, uspo, uspts (snc)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch, Joseph Adam Sullivan, Jason Agles, Daniel O'Sullivan, Brian Sexton setting Response to Motion for 11/7/03 for [133-1] motion to Strike Forfeiture Allegations 2-5 ([1-1] indictment) ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dfts, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa (snc)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CJA 20, effective 10/15/03, as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Appointng Attorney Debra Hollis to represent the defendant ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies furnished to: Atty Hollis (snc)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [0-0] oral motion to Continue Trial in Interests of Justice Time Excluded from 10/16/03 to 1/26/04 as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1) resetting Jury Trial on 1/26/04 for Calvin Lavalle Couch before Judge Myron H. Thompson in Courtroom 2E ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, upso,uspts, yg, hc (snc)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (follows oral order granting [126-1] motion for Pate DeBardeleben to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Crowell Pate DeBardeleben and entered 10/15/03 ) ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspts (snc)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Courtroom Deputy's Minutes of Motion Hearing before Judge Myron Thompson as to Calvin Lavalle Couch. Portion of Hearing held in camera and ordered sealed. Mitchell Reisner, Court Reporter (snc)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion Hearing Scheduled for 10/15/03, 2:00 p.m., before Judge Myron Thompson furnished USA, USM, counsel (DeBardeleben, Hollis), YG, HC (snc)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Courtroom Deputy's Minutes of Telephone Conference before Judge Myron Thompson as to Calvin Lavalle Couch re Atty DeBardeleben's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Mitchell Reisner, Court Reporter (snc)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Calvin Lavalle Couch for Pate DeBardeleben to Withdraw as Attorney [126-1] referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (ws)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch Setting Jury Selection for 10/20/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch at U.S. before Judge Myron H. Thompson in Courtroom 2E ; Setting Jury Trial on 10/20/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch before Judge Myron H. Thompson in Courtroom 2E and is expected to last two trial days ; there are no motions currently pending; Setitng voir dire questions due on 10/14/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch ; all motions in limine are due by 10/14/03; Setting proposed jury instructions due on 10/14/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch , Setting Plea Agreement deadline for 10/14/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: Counsel, Deft, Copies furnished to: USA, USM, USPO, USPTS, SC, WS, YG, HC, WR (ws)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                  Courtroom Deputy's Minutes as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Pretrial Conference (3:32 - 3:33) (ws)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 (effective 9/3/03) as to Calvin Lavalle Couch : Appointment of Attorney Crowell Pate DeBardeleben ( Signed by Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd ) , Copies furnished to: Atty C Pate DeBardeleben (snc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Information to Establish Prior Conviction by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (Copy furnished Probation) (snc)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch, Joseph Adam Sullivan, Jason Agles, Daniel O'Sullivan, Brian Sexton granting [57-1] motion to Strike Forfeiture Allegation 1 of the [1-1] indictment as to Brian Sexton (5) ( Signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson ) Copies mailed to: dfts, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, uspo, usptso (snc)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [62-1] motion for an Order directing the USM to Release Custody of prisoner as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1) ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: Counsel, Deft, Copies furnished to: USA, USM, USPO, USPTS, SC, WS (ws)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Sealed Document +Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            PETITION (MOTION) by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for an Order directing the USM to Release Custody of prisoner [62-1] referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody (ws)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                              WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum returned unexecuted as to Calvin Lavalle Couch - Picked up previous writ (ws)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed as to Calvin Lavalle Couch on 9/3/03 (ws)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Order on ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on Arraignment as to Calvin Lavalle Couch that all discovery shall be conducted according to the requirements of this court's standing order on criminal discovery; directing that Discovery by the government is due on or before 9/5/03 at to Calvin Couch; that the defendant shall provide disclosures on or before 9/12/03; Pretrial Motions due by 9/27/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch ; Pretrial Conference is set for 3:30 p.m. on 9/29/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch in U.S. Courthouse before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody; that any requested voir dire questions and jury instructions must be filed no later than one week before jury selection; Jury Trial set for 10/20/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch in U.S. Courthouse before Unassigned Judge ; setting Jury Selection for 10/20/03 for Calvin Lavalle Couch in U.S. Courthouse before Unassigned Judge and government response to pretrial motions due 10 days from motion filing date. ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: Counsel, Deft, Copies furnished to: USA, USM, USPO, USPTS, SC, WS, YG, HC, WR (ws)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    DETENTION ORDER granting government's motion for detention hearing to the extent that parties agreed that no detention hearing is warranted upon notice of defendant's current DETENTION on STATE CHARGES as to Calvin Lavalle Couch ( Signed by Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies furnished to: counsel, usa, usm, uspo, uspts (snc)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Motion for Hearing Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for Detention Hearing [30-1] referred to Mag. Judge Delores R. Boyd (snc)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                        Courtroom Deputy's Minutes as to Calvin Lavalle Couch of initial appearance and arraignment.: (sql)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                          CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Calvin Lavalle Couch (sql)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                            WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for 9/4/03 (ws)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [17-1] petition as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1)directing the Clerk of this court to issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum addressed to Montgomery County Jail commanding them to deliver said defentant to any USM or Deputy USM and directing said Marshal or Deputy to bring said prisoner before this court for arraignment on 9/4/03 at 10:00 a.m. and to return said defendant to said official when the court has finished with him. ( Signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker ) Copies mailed to: deft, Copies furnished to: USA, USM, USPO, USPTS, SC, WS, YG, HC (ws)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                PETITION by USA for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Calvin Lavalle Couch ( referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker ) (ws)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                  WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued as to Calvin Lavalle Couch for Initial Appearance on 9/2/03, 3:00 p.m. (snc)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Calvin Lavalle Couch granting [7-1] petition as to Calvin Lavalle Couch (1) directing Clerk to issue WHCAP to Montgomery County Jail for 9/2/03 at 3:00 p.m. ( Signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) Copies mailed to: dft, Copies to: usa, usm (snc)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION by USA for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Calvin Lavalle Couch ( referred to Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody ) (snc)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest WARRANT issued as to Sealed Dft #1 (snc)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Dft #1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 13, 14, Sealed Dft #2 (2) count(s) 1, 3-4, 5, 6, Sealed Dft #3 (3) count(s) 1, 3-4, 11, 15, 16, Sealed Dft #4 (4) count(s) 1, 5, Sealed Dft #5 (5) count(s) 1, 6, 10 [FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS 2-5 STRUCK; SEE DN 144] (snc) Modified on 11/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,204 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?