Dish Network L.L.C. v. Bauder
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-01443

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 1:13 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER adopting 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 21 MOTION for default judgment against Robert Bauder filed by NagraStar LLC, EchoStar Technologies L.L.C., Dish Network L.L.C. The Court will enter final judgment separately. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/1/2015. (TKW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 21 MOTION for default judgment against Robert Bauder be granted. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file their notice dismissing Counts I and II with prejudice and a Proposed Default Judgment setting forth the injunctive relief within 14 days of entry of this Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 3/12/2015. (LAK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Clerk's default
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Fees Paid
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Fees Paid
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Appearance of non-resident counsel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Appearance of non-resident counsel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Interested persons order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Notice to counsel of Local Rule
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?