Elderberry of Weber City, LLC v. Living Centers - Southeast
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1894

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 8:28 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4230 - Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method:. Decision: Remanded. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Entered on Docket Date: 09/23/2015. [999665412] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [14-1894] (CT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
    COURT ORDER filed [999665152] granting Motion to remand case [18] Copies to all parties. [14-1894] (CT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated to remand case. Date and method of service: 09/09/2015 ecf. [999656685] [14-1894] James Segroves
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
        BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/14/2015. Response Brief due 11/16/2015. [14-1894] (TW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
          COURT ORDER filed [999445211] granting Motion for temporary administrative stay [15] Copies to all parties. [14-1894] (CT)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated for temporary administrative stay. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:10/22/2014.. Date and method of service: 09/18/2014 ecf. [999438612] [14-1894] James Segroves
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Elderberry of Weber City, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999435506] [14-1894] Milton Mantiply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Mallory Mantiply for Elderberry of Weber City, LLC.[999435504] [14-1894] Milton Mantiply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Travis A. Knobbe for Elderberry of Weber City, LLC.[999435498] [14-1894] Travis Knobbe
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                    BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/22/2014. Response Brief due 11/24/2014 [14-1894] (CT)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lori D. Thompson, Esq. for Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated.[999435222] [14-1894] Lori Thompson
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. [14-1894] James Segroves
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Mariner Health Care, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999435187] [14-1894] James Segroves
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999435185] [14-1894] James Segroves
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999435181] [14-1894] James Segroves
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999435180] [14-1894] James Segroves
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James F. Segroves for Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC, FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Incorporated and Mariner Health Care, Incorporated.[999435178] [14-1894] James Segroves
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. [14-1894] (CT)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:12-cv-00052-NKM-RSB. Case manager: CathyHerb. [14-1894] (CT)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?