Del Webb Communities, Inc. v. Roger Carlson
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1759

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 7, 2018 at 12:40 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
Mandate issued. Referencing: [27] Judgment Order , [26] court Order. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB.. [14-1759] (JB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method:. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Entered on Docket Date: 10/17/2014. [999457191] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [14-1759] (SAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
      COURT ORDER filed [999457168] granting Motion to dismiss appeal [15]; denying Motion to impose sanctions [22] Copies to all parties. [14-1759] (SAW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
        REPLY by Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to Motion to impose sanctions [22], Response [24]. [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
          RESPONSE/ANSWER by Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson to Motion to impose sanctions [22]. [14-1759] William Leath
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. William Jefferson Leath, Jr. for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson requesting response to Motion to impose sanctions [22]Response due: 10/09/2014.[999447052]. [14-1759] (SAW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION by Appellees Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to impose sanctions. Date and method of service: 09/26/2014 ecf. [999447042] [14-1759] (SAW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY by Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to Motion to dismiss appeal [15], Response [20]. [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE/ANSWER by Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson to Motion to dismiss appeal [15]. Nature of response: in opposition. [14-1759] Michael Seekings
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Henry W. Frampton, IV for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[999432820] [14-1759] Henry Frampton
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                      ORDER filed [999426948] terminating Motion for other relief [16], suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [14-1759] (SAW)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. William Jefferson Leath, Jr. for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [15]Response due: 09/22/2014.[999426938]. [14-1759] (SAW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                          CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellees Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated for Joint Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule Pending Disposition of Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION by Appellees Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated to dismiss appeal [15]. Date and method of service: 08/29/2014 ecf, US mail. [999426720] [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Chakeris, Segui. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/24/2014. Response Brief due 10/27/2014 [14-1759] (TAF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee PulteGroup, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999414986] [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Del Webb Communities, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999414985] [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by A. Victor Rawl, Jr. for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[999414983] [14-1759] Alfred Rawl
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1759] (LP)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Amy Diaz. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: 7/8/14 Motions Hearing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Roger and Mary Jo Carlson.. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Transcript due from Amy Diaz, Official Court Reporter on 10/20/2014. [14-1759] (DL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          Corrected TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson for Amy Diaz. [14-1759] William Leath
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by W. Jefferson Leath, Jr. Michael S. Seekings for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[999414141] [14-1759] William Leath
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                              Docket correction requested from John T. Chakeris for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson, Mr. William Jefferson Leath, Jr. for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson, Mr. Michael S. Seekings for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson and Phillip W. Segui, Jr. for Roger F. Carlson and Mary Jo Carlson... Mailed to: John Chakeris, A. Victor Rawl, Phillip W. Sequi, Jr.. [14-1759] (DL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. [14-1759] William Leath
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999414116] [14-1759] William Leath
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Mailed to: J. Chakeris, A. Rawl, P. Segui, Jr.. [14-1759] (SAW)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-SB. Case manager: SWiley. [14-1759] (SAW)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 94 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?