Janice Leaman v. Gregg Wolfe
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-3511

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2016 at 11:41 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011716013 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Janice M. Leaman, received. (BAA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712960 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David M. Burkholder on behalf of Appellant(s) Janice M. Leaman. (DMB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712925 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Janice M. Leaman advising this court that no transcripts are available. (BAA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712919 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Janice M. Leaman, filed. (BAA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712914 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Janice M. Leaman, filed. (BAA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712828 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
            ECF FILER: Certificate of Service for ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin A. Andersen on behalf of Appellant(s) Janice Leaman.--[Edited 08/19/2014 by PDB] (BAA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011712771 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin A. Andersen on behalf of Appellant(s) Janice Leaman. (BAA)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011710044 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven E. Wolfe on behalf of Appellee(s) Gregg Wolfe. (SEW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011703147 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                  CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Janice M. Leaman in District Court No. 2-13-cv-00975. (PDB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 72 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?