Entrepreneur Media, Inc. v. Scott Smith
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-15332

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 8:15 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (209) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026235064 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time listed above with counsel to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Assistant immediately at Beatriz_Smith@ca9.uscourts.gov. On or before August 13, 2014, the parties shall provide the name and contact information of all counsel intending to participate in the conference to Beatriz_Smith@ca9.uscourts.gov. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. Date: August 20, 2014 Time: 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time [9182178] [14-16342, 14-16360, 14-16361, 14-16364] (OC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009025052598 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
    Lodged in camera and UNDER SEAL per 11/8/2012 order [38] Appellee USA in 10-50072 five copies of sealed district court records that the May 14, 2012 motion seeks to unseal. (to Records for merits panel) [8670377] [10-50029, 10-50052, 10-50058, 10-50059, 10-50062, 10-50064, 10-50072, 10-50076, 10-50113, 10-50115] (LA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009024519725 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
      Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on December 18, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [8443727] (WL)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009020507731 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [36] filed by Chinese Daily News, Inc. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [08-55483, 08-56740] (GLS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
          Filed Order for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH)The stay in the above matter is dissolved effective immediately. [8686084] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
            Received copy of Supreme Court opinion dated 06/26/2013. The judgment or mandate of this Court will not issue for at least twenty-five days pursuant to Rule 45. Should a petition for rehearing be filed timely, the judgment or mandate will be further stayed pending this Court's action on the petition for rehearing. Supreme Court No: 12-144. [8682306] [10-16696, 11-16577] (RR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/14/2014. [9168286] (MNS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/11/2014. [9164878]--[Edited: attached correct PDF of letter. 07/11/2014 by RY] (TLB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/09/2014. [9162204] (TLB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Staci J. Pratt, Esquire for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Hawaii and American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. [9161692] (SJP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/07/2014. [9158230] (TLB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Monte N. Stewart for Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage and Craig G. Taylor for Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. [9157665] (MNS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/4/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Tara L. Borelli for Appellants Beverly Sevcik, Mary Baranovich, Antioco Carrillo, Theodore Small, Karen Goody, Karen Vibe, Fletcher Whitwell, Greg Flamer, Mikyla Miller, Katrina Miller, Adele Terranova, Tara Newberry, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Megan Lanz and Sara Geiger. [9156905] (TLB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/03/2014. [9156241] (MNS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/03/2014. [9155509] (MNS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/02/2014. [9154529] (MNS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/27/2014. [9148663] (TLB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9125711] (TLB)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/28/2014. [9110183] (TLB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): Appellants’ motion to further expedite the calendaring of this appeal is granted. This appeal shall be placed on the September 2014 calendar. [9107944] (SM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell Motion for miscellaneous relief (motion requesting to schedule oral argument) . Date of service: 05/22/2014. [9106671]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 05/23/2014 by RY] (DP)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dimitri D. Portnoi for Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell. Date of service: 05/22/2014. [9106555] (DP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/21/2014. [9103718] (MNS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Counsel Mary E. McAlister has notified this court of Attorney Stephen M. Crampton’s departure from Liberty Counsel. Court records have been updated to reflect that Attorney Stephen M. Crampton is no longer counsel of record for amicus Liberty Counsel. Counsel Mary E. McAlister remains as counsel of record for amicus Liberty Counsel.[9103597] (WL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/20/2014. [9102183] (TLB)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Liberty Counsel Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 05/20/2014. [9101847] (MEM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/16/2014. [9098128] (TLB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/09/2014. [9089190] (TLB)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/06/2014. [9084929] (MNS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/02/2014. [9080577] (TLB)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078458] (MNS)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078454] (MNS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078406] (MNS)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9077354] (TLB)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/18/2014. [9063085] (TLB)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2014. [9042054] (MNS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/02/2014 [9040848]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 04/03/2014 by RY] (TLB)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/31/2014. [9037752] (MNS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/25/2014. [9030847] (TLB)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9017381] (TLB)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christian, Matthew J. for Appellee Diana Alba. Date of service: 03/04/2014. [9001654] (MJC)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [178] submitted by Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8996806] (WP)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/28/2014. [8996775] (TLB)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellants’ unopposed motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the brief. (Pro Mo) [8995953] (MS)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell. Date of service: 02/26/2014. [8993754] (TLB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [175] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8988515] (LA)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): The motion of the Coalition for the Protection of Marriage for leave to file a supplemental answering brief is granted. The brief previously received shall be filed. The optional reply brief is now due within 14 days after the date of this order. [8986657] (WL)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review and filed Motion to file supplemental brief. Submitted by Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. Date of service: 02/13/2014. [8978584] (MNS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: tah): The appellants’ unopposed motion to expedite calendaring of case No. 12-17668 is granted. This case will be calendared as soon as possible. Appellee Brian Sandoval’s motion to withdraw the previously filed answering brief for case No. 12-17668 is granted. The Clerk vacates the portion of the January 7, 2013 order that ordered this case to be assigned to the same panel that will consider Jackson v. Fuddy, case Nos. 12-16995 and 12-16698. In the event the Jackson cases are not dismissed, the parties may file a renewed request to have those cases assigned to the panel that will consider the above-captioned appeal. [8975693] [12-17668, 12-16995, 12-16998] (MS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Mary Baranovich, Caren Cafferata-Jenkins, Farrell Cafferata-Jenkins, Antioco Carrillo, Greg Flamer, Sara Geiger, Karen Goody, Megan Lanz, Katrina Miller, Mikyla Miller, Tara Newberry, Beverly Sevcik, Theodore Small, Adele Terranova, Karen Vibe and Fletcher Whitwell Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973540] (TLB)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Brian E. Sandoval Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Brief]. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973022] (CWH)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [141] submitted by Liberty Counsel is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8961048] (LA)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [144] submitted by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence and 27 Scholars of Federalism and Judicial Restraint is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960254] (LA)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [143] submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960247] (LA)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [140] submitted by Doctor Paul McHugh, M.D. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960242] (LA)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [139] submitted by Professors of Social Science is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960237] (LA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [138] submitted by the States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Idaho, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Utah is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960231] (LA)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [137] submitted by Alliance Defending Freedom is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960204] (LA)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [135] submitted by Concerned Women for America is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8960201] (LA)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The court has received appellee Alan Glover’s notice of nonopposition to the opening brief and motion for leave to withdraw his previously filed answering brief. The motion to withdraw the answering brief is granted. [8958653] (WL)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and 27 Scholars of Federalism and Judicial Restraint. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956713] (JCE)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by United States Conference of Catholic Bishops et al.. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956691] (AD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Withdraw Answering Brief; and Notice of Nonopposition to Appellants' Opening Brief]. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956630] (RRM)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Liberty Counsel. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956532]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Edited docket text to reflect brief submitted with consent. Resent NDA. 01/31/2014 by RY] (MEM)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Dr. Paul McHugh. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956177] (GVB)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Professors of Social Science. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956076] (AJP)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by STATES OF INDIANA, ALABAMA, ALASKA, ARIZONA, COLORADO, IDAHO, MONTANA, NEBRASKA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA AND UTAH. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956058] (TMF)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Alliance Defending Freedom. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8956032] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Coalition for the Protection of Marriage citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8955149] (MNS)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Concerned Women for America. Date of service: 01/28/2014. [8955118] (HC)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Alan Glover citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8954430] (RRM)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [123] submitted by Pacific Justice Institute is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954419] (LA)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [121] submitted by Helen M. Alvare is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954408] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [120] submitted by Institute for Marriage and Public Policy is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954405] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [119] submitted by Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George and Sherif Girgis is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954399] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [118] submitted by Marriage Law Foundation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954388] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The answering brief [112] submitted by Alan Glover is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8954379] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [110] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [110] submitted by Coalition for the Protection of Marriage. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8954371] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483, Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740 petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/04/2013 opinion). Date of service: 03/18/2013. [8555485] [08-55483, 08-56740] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) - Chingfang Chang, Shiang L. Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Shieh-Sheng Wei, Chenyang Yan and Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740, Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483 Correspondence: Re: Error in Counsel Listing. Date of service: 03/11/2013 [8546896] [08-56740, 08-55483] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Pacific Justice Institute in Support of Defendants-Appellees and Affirmance. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8953258] (KTS)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory D. Brown for Amicus Curiae State of California in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028. Date of service: 08/25/2014. [9217498] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (GDB)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Helen M. Alvare. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8952903] (DRB)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Patashnik for Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028. Date of service: 07/30/2014. [9187422] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (JP)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Robert P. George, Sherif Girgis, and Ryan T. Anderson. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8952585] (CSL)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Marriage Law Foundation. Date of service: 01/24/2014. [8952215] (WCD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [114] submitted by Coalition of African American Pastors USA, Frederick Douglass Foundation, Inc. and The Center for Urban Renewal and Education is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8949139] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [112] submitted by C.D. and K.D. in 13-16929 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9173262] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [113] submitted by H.L.S. in 13-16936 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9173126] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by CENTER FOR URBAN RENEWAL AND EDUCATION, THE COALITION OF AFRICAN-AMERICAN PASTORS USA, AND THE FREDERICK DOUGLASS FOUNDATION, INC.. Date of service: 01/22/2014. [8946656] (SKE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant H.L.S. in 13-16936. Date of service: 07/15/2014. [9170463] [13-16936, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-17028] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/17/2014 by TL] (AMZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants C.D. and K.D. in 13-16929. Date of service: 07/15/2014. [9170074] [13-16929, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-17028]--[Edited: Unapplied filing from 13-17097 (case closed). 07/15/2014 by RY] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 07/17/2014 by TL] (RCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [110] submitted by Jo Batman is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9168858] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Jo Batman in 13-16819. Date of service: 07/15/2014. [9168788] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed order (Deputy Clerk: EU) Dismissing case No. 13-17097 for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1) Pursuant to Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to file opening brief. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. [9167543] (EU)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757 response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies),motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9016387] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [106] submitted by Ann Leonard, Kim Parsons, R.P. and John Schachter is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9165085] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants J.C., Ann Leonard, Kim Parsons, R.P. and John Schachter in 13-16918. Date of service: 07/11/2014. [9165039] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: cb): Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file amicus brief is referred to panel. in 13-16819, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. in 13-16819, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097 (see attached PDF for complete order); Motion (ECF Filing) is referred to panel. in 13-16819, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097 [9162603] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (CB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Coalition for the Protection of Marriage, Alan Glover and Brian Sandoval Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 01/17/2014. Date of service: 12/04/2013. [8888706] (MNS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Angela Christine Agrusa, Esquire for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman and Tracey Hackwith in 12-15757. [8969252] [12-15757, 12-15782] (ACA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782. Date of service: 10/29/2012. [8969049] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 response opposing motion (,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 02/06/2014. [8968787] [12-15782, 12-15757] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [88] submitted by Facebook, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [91] submitted by Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9124744] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellee Facebook’s motion for leave to file an oversized answering brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the answering brief received May 30, 2014. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the last filed answering brief. (Pro Mo) [9124240] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 01/31/2014. [8961067] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740. Date of service: 12/09/2011. [7995687] [08-55483, 08-56740] (MMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (STEPHEN S. TROTT, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and CHARLES R. BREYER): Appellant’s motion for additional briefing is hereby GRANTED. The parties are ordered to file supplemental briefs in light of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Dukes, 564 U.S. ____ (2011). Appellant’s brief shall be filed no later than 30 days from the filing of this order. Appellees’ brief shall be filed within 21 days thereafter. Appellant may file a reply brief within 14 days after the filing of Appellee’s brief. Principal briefs may not exceed 7,000 words, and the optional reply brief may not exceed 3,500 words. Oral argument, if necessary, will be scheduled at a later date. [7960630] [08-55483, 08-56740] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740 Motion for miscellaneous relief [MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND ORAL ARGUMENT FOLLOWING SUPREME COURT REMAND]. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7958494] [08-55483, 08-56740] (MMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8936365] [12-15757, 12-15782] (SS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/25/2013. [8837234]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757. Resent NDA. 10/25/2013 by RY] (DM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/23/2013. [8833181] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 10/23/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae, Motion to extend time to file amicus brief until 06/06/2014 at 11:59 pm. Submitted by National Legal Aid and Defender Association, the Association of Pro Bono Counsel, the Los Angeles County Bar Association, and the Legal Aid Association of California and its Member Organizations. Date of service: 06/06/2014. [9122997] [13-16919, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WHB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/04/2013. [8767276] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Marie Newhouse, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/16/2013. [8746051] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers (Appellees only). Resent NDA. 08/16/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819. Date of service: 05/30/2014. [9115239] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (KLM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-17097 Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 05/30/2014. [9115222] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (KLM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [85] submitted by James H. Duval and Susan Mainzer William Tait in 13-16918 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [85] submitted by James H. Duval and Susan Mainzer in, William Tait. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9115123] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees James H. Duval, Susan Mainzer and William Tait in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097. Date of service: 05/30/2014. [9114889] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (JED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 05/28/2013. [8645310] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Chinese Daily News, Inc. in 08-55483, 08-56740 response opposing motion (,motion for attorney fees). Date of service: 12/10/2010. [7576914] [08-55483, 08-56740] (BGS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellees James H. Duval, William Tait and Susan Mainzer in 13-16819; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees James H. Duval, William Tait and Susan Mainzer in 13-16819 Appellees James H. Duval, Susan Mainzer and William Tait answering brief due 05/30/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9045361] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (LKK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees James H. Duval, Susan Mainzer and William Tait in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/30/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 04/03/2014. [9043924] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (JED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant Gaudet’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief for appellant Gaudet is due May 28, 2013. The reply brief for appellant Newhouse remains due April 26, 2013. (Pro Mo) [8574682] [12-15757, 12-15782] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819 Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 05/30/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. [9037104] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (LKK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/30/2014 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 03/28/2014. [9035644] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (DBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellees Chang Chingfang, Shiang Huang, Jenny Liu Hung, Lien Yi Jung, Yu Fang Kai, Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Lee, Hui Jung Pao, Yun Min Pao, Chih-Ming Sheu, Jeffrey Sun, Minh Vi-Huynh, Lynne Wang, Shieh-Sheng Wei and Chengyang Yan in 08-55483, Appellees Yu Fang Ines Kai, Hui Jung Pao and Lynne Wang in 08-56740 response to petition for panel and en banc rehearing. Date of service: 11/03/2010. [7533874] [08-55483, 08-56740]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text and event to reflect content of filing (response to PFR, not motion). Resent notice. 11/03/2010 by RY] (RR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/31/2013. [8845081] (MLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [24] submitted by Commonwealth of Massachusetts in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8845018] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of JOHN F. DALY for Amicus Curiae FTC. Date of service: 03/25/2014. [9029606] (JFD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [70] submitted by State of California is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9027279] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Daniel W. Bower for Appellant C. L. Otter, Mr. Thomas C Perry for Appellant C. L. Otter and Monte N. Stewart for Appellant C. L. Otter in 14-35420, Daniel W. Bower for - C. L. Otter, Mr. Thomas C Perry for - C. L. Otter and Monte N. Stewart for - C. L. Otter in 14-35421. [9160082] [14-35420, 14-35421] (MNS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [58] submitted by Thomas L Cox, Jr., Tracey Cox Klinge and Katie Sibley is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9026590] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by State of California. Date of service: 03/21/2014. [9026515] [13-16918, 13-16819]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097. Resent NDA. 03/21/2014 by RY] (CK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [67] submitted by FTC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9025248] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. W. Scott Zanzig for - Christopher Rich and State of Idaho in 14-35420, Attorney Mr. W. Scott Zanzig for Appellants Christopher Rich and State of Idaho in 14-35421. [9155805] [14-35420, 14-35421] (WSZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Federal Trade Commission. Date of service: 03/20/2014. [9025168] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (IDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants C.D. and K.D.. Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9016313]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097. Resent NDA. 03/20/2014 by RY] (RCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [41] submitted by National Women's Law Center, Williams Institute Scholars of Sexual Orientation and Gender Law and Women's Legal Groups in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8844045] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LA): The order filed on June 27, 2014 [58] was issued in error and is vacated. [9153287] [14-35420, 14-35421] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [54] submitted by Jason S. Carroll and Alan J. Hawkins is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9149946] [14-35420, 14-35421] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Matthew Tanner. Date of service: 11/06/2013. [8853839]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Spread docket text to 13-15754, 13-15751, 13-15759, 13-15723, 13-15734. Resent NDA. 11/08/2013 by RY] (CAK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [31] submitted by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR MARRIAGE AND FAMILY THERAPY, AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION, APA, Hawaii Psychological Association and NASW in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8843498] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Appellants’ Thomas L. Cox, Jr., Tracey Cox Klinge and Katie Sibley motion for an extension to file the opening brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the opening brief received March 17, 2014. Appellant Jo Batman’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is moot. Court records reflect that appellant has filed the opening brief on March 14, 2014. The answering brief is now due April 16, 2014. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9020806] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [29] submitted by Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8842526] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Thomas L Cox, Jr., Tracey Cox Klinge and Katie Sibley in 13-17028. Date of service: 03/17/2014. [9018058] [13-17028, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17097]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief (case numbers). Resent NDA. 03/21/2014 by RY] (TLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order: The opening brief [56] submitted by H.L.S. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [56] submitted by H.L.S. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9017452] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant H.L.S. in 13-16936. Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9017393] [13-16936, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-17028, 13-17097] (AMZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [66] submitted by C.D. and K.D is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [66] submitted by C.D. and K.D. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9017109] [13-16929, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (CT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [53] submitted by Jo Batman in 13-16819 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [53] submitted by Jo Batman in 13-16819. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9016304] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Jo Batman in 13-16819. Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9015824] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Jo Batman Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 04/14/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 03/07/2014. [9007150]--[COURTUPDATE: Spread docket text to 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-16918, 13-17028, 13-17097, 13-16929. Resent NDA. 03/07/2014 by RY] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [36] submitted by American Civil Liberties Union of Hawaii and American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green in 12-17668 only. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8841612] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellants Thomas L Cox, Jr., Tracey Cox Klinge and Katie Sibley in 13-17028 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/17/2014. Date of service: 03/05/2014. [9003655] [13-17028, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17097] (TLC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [30] submitted by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc in 12-17668 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green in the above Case Number only . The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8841434] (GV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Motion (ECF Filing) is referred to panel. in 13-16918; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. in 13-16918 (see attached PDF for complete order) [8997515] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (LKK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/08/2014. [9198348] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Motion (ECF Filing) is referred to panel. in 13-16918, 13-16819; Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. in 13-16918, 13-16819 (see attached PDF for complete order) [8988398] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (LKK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/12/2014. [9092115] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Center for Digital Democracy et al.. Date of service: 02/20/2014. [8984442]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected motion and brief. Spread docket text to 13-16919, 13-16819, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097, 13-16929. Resent NDA. 02/21/2014 by RY] (HBK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Mehdi Merred Motion for attorney fees in the amount of $26,865.50. Date of service: 07/11/2014. [9165335] (BAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Electronic Privacy Information Center. Date of service: 02/20/2014. [8986594] [13-16918, 13-16819]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and motion. Spread docket text to 13-16919, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097, 13-16929. Resent NDA. 02/24/2014 by RY] (MR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by - Ingenuity13 LLC and Appellant Paul Hansmeier, Esquire in 13-55859, Appellant Ingenuity13 LLC in 13-55880, - Ingenuity13 LLC and Appellant Prenda Law, Inc. in 13-55881, - Ingenuity13 LLC and Appellant AF Holdings, LLC in 13-55882, - Ingenuity13 LLC and Appellant Paul Duffy in 13-55883, - Ingenuity13 LLC and Appellant John Steele in 13-55884, - Ingenuity13 LLC, Appellant Prenda Law, Inc. and Appellee Paul Duffy in 13-56028. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075041] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (DJV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellees Eric Bakke, City of Quincy and Thomas Clark bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 41.20 USD. Date of service: 07/02/2014 [9154575] (JJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, PAUL J. WATFORD and BARBARA JACOBS ROTHSTEIN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9143234] (MM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed clerk order: The opening brief [37] submitted by J.C., Ann Leonard, Kim Parsons, R.P. and John Schachter in 13-16918 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [37] submitted by J.C., Ann Leonard, Kim Parsons, R.P. and John Schachter. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8979692] [13-16918, 13-16819, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants J.C., Ann Leonard, Kim Parsons, R.P. and John Schachter. Date of service: 02/13/2014. [8977306]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097, 13-16929, 13-16919, 13-16819. Resent NDA. 02/14/2014 by RY] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028. Date of service: 04/15/2014. [9059473] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellee’s motion to file an oversized answering brief is granted in part. Within 28 days after the date of this order, the appellee shall file an answering brief not to exceed 16,500 words. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after the service of the renewed answering brief. (Pro Mo) [9020955] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian A. Walker for Appellee Mehdi Merred. Date of service: 05/12/2014. [9092166] (BAW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Mr. Keith P. Scully for Appellant Gaston Cornu-Labat. [9030908] (KPS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received Appellants' supplemental excerpt of record [29] in 1 volume. Served on 02/25/2014. Deficiencies: excerpts lack an index. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [9003406] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Mr. Jerry J. Moberg for Appellees City of Quincy and Eric Bakke. [9029375] (JJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [29] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [29] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8991783] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (TLH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [28] submitted by appellees/cross-appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the further excerpts of record [28] submitted by appellees/cross-appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9177000] [13-17449, 13-17561]--[Edited: Removed duplicate order. 07/22/2014 by RY] (CT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief and further excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants ConnectionCentrals, Davison Design & Development, Inc., MediActivate, LLC, Prime Advertisers, LLC, Pro Advertisers, LLC, Spire Vision Holdings, Inc. and XL Marketing Corp. in 13-17561, Appellees ConnectionCentrals, Davison Design & Development, Inc., MediActivate, LLC, Prime Advertisers, LLC, Pro Advertisers, LLC, Spire Vision Holdings, Inc. and XL Marketing Corp. in 13-17449. Date of service: 07/21/2014. [9176696] [13-17561, 13-17449] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct brief type. 07/22/2014 by TL] (JDD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Seattle. Filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Early McFarland, Jr. for Appellees Grant County and Grant County Sheriffs Office. [9027924] (MEM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028 Motion to take judicial notice of Exhibit 1 - Email. Date of service: 01/17/2014. [8944289] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028. Date of service: 01/17/2014. [8944287] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028. Date of service: 01/17/2014. [8943274] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. Resent NDA. 01/22/2014 by RY] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order: The opening brief [22] submitted by Jonathan Bobak, Zachary Cochran, Alec Greenhouse and Wendy Lally in 13-16919 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [22] submitted by Jonathan Bobak, Zachary Cochran, Alec Greenhouse and Wendy Lally in 13-16919. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8972673] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (WP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Jonathan Bobak, Zachary Cochran, Alec Greenhouse and Wendy Lally in 13-16919. Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8972549] [13-16919, 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097]--[Edited: Removed duplicate excerpts. 02/19/2014 by RY] (JJP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): On December 3, 2013, appeal No. 13-17097 was dismissed for failure to prosecute under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1 because appellant failed to pay the filing fees. Appellant has since paid the fees and has moved to reinstate the appeal. The opposed motion to reinstate the appeal is granted. Appeal No. 13-17097 shall be consolidated with consolidated appeals Nos. 13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, and 13-17028. The briefing schedule set forth in the court’s December 12, 2013 consolidation order remains in effect for these consolidated appeals. (MOATT) [8944675] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028, 13-17097] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On December 5, 2013, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. At the request of the parties, these appeals are consolidated. The following briefing schedule shall govern these consolidated appeals: appellants shall file opening briefs on or before February 14, 2014; appellees shall file answering briefs on or before April 15, 2014; appellants may file optional reply briefs on or before May 15, 2014. The court has determined that these appeals will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeals are pending. [8898771] [13-16819, 13-16918, 13-16919, 13-16929, 13-16936, 13-17028] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed clerk order: The opening brief [17] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [17] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8873541] [13-55859, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SM) Appellant’s November 14, 2013 filing in appeal no. 13-55871 is construed as a motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal no. 13-55871 pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). So construed, the motion is granted. Appeal no. 13- 55871 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal no. 13-55871. The briefing schedule established on July 9, 2013 remains in effect for the remaining consolidated appeals. [8865660] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Facebook, Inc. Motion to consolidate cases 13-16819 13-16918 13-16919 13-16929 13-17028 13-16936 13-17097. Date of service: 11/22/2013. [8875311] (DBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee John Doe in 13-55859, 13-55871, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028 response non-opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 11/04/2013. [8849102] [13-55859, 13-55871, 13-55880, 13-55881, 13-55882, 13-55883, 13-55884, 13-56028] (MEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristin Linsley Myles for Appellee Facebook, Inc.. Date of service: 10/29/2013. [8841875] (KLM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellant’s late motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due August 4, 2014. Appellant’s counsel is reminded that a motion for an extension of time to file a brief should be filed at least seven calendar days before the expiration of the time prescribed for filing the brief. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(b). Appellant’s counsel is also reminded that all filings must be served on all parties and be accompanied by proof of service. See Fed. R. App. P. 25(b); 9th Cir. R. 25-5(f). The answering brief is due September 3, 2014. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9158424] (IV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Benjamin Levin for Appellee Facebook, Inc.. Date of service: 10/29/2013. [8841746] (DBL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Jason Deschaine Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 08/04/2014 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 07/02/2014. [9154852] (DAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8831435] (EL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Jo Batman Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/17/2013. [8825933]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached printed to PDF version of questionnaire to correct viewing error. Resent NDA. 10/18/2013 by RY] (CAB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [8] submitted by Scott Smith is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [8] submitted by Scott Smith. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9228305] (LA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed order (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): Appellee’s opposed motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction is granted. See Richmark Corp. v. Timber Falling Consultants, Inc., 937 F.2d 1444, 1449 (9th Cir. 1991) (order granting post-judgment motion to compel discovery is not appealable until a contempt citation issues). All other pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [9330908] (AF) [Entered: 12/01/2014 11:28 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Scott Smith. Date of service: 08/29/2014. [9224861] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and excerpts of record. 09/03/2014 by TL] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 09/04/2014 by TL] (EJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Entrepreneur Media, Inc. reply to response (). Date of service: 10/29/2014. [9295371] [14-15332] (DJC) [Entered: 10/29/2014 05:55 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Scott Smith; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Scott Smith Appellant Scott Smith opening brief due 08/29/2014. Appellee Entrepreneur Media, Inc. answering brief due 09/29/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9200769] (LKK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Scott Smith response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 10/24/2014. [9289088] (EJM) [Entered: 10/24/2014 09:58 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Scott Smith Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 08/29/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 08/08/2014. [9199511] (EJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Scott Smith response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 10/23/2014. [9287317] (EJM) [Entered: 10/23/2014 04:11 AM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Appellant’s late motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due August 15, 2014. The answering brief is due September 15, 2014. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Movant is informed that a motion for an extension of time to file a brief should include the position of opposing counsel. 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(b)(6). . Movant is reminded that any request for extension of time to file a brief should include a statement that the court reporter is not in default with regard to any designated transcripts. 9th Cir. 31-2.2(b)(7). [9176381] (AF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Entrepreneur Media, Inc. Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/21/2014 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 10/21/2014. [9284957] (DJC) [Entered: 10/21/2014 02:28 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Entrepreneur Media, Inc. Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/14/2014. [9275837] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of motion. 10/14/2014 by TL] (DJC) [Entered: 10/14/2014 01:42 PM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Scott Smith Motion to file a late brief. Date of service: 06/30/2014. [9151649] (EJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order MEDIATION: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [9009859] (BS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Scott Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/03/2014. [9000145] (EJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/03/2014. Transcript ordered by 03/10/2014. Transcript due 04/07/2014. Appellant Scott Smith opening brief due 05/19/2014. Appellee Entrepreneur Media, Inc. answering brief due 06/16/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8989208] (IV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 483 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?