USA v. Balderas-Figueroa
Federal Court Proceeding New Mexico District Court, Case No. 2:07-po-00044
Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 2:44 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo J.A.B., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Earl & Earl, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard L Anderson +1 505 980 4090 +1 575 541 9818 howard.anderson2@comcast.net
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to J.A.B. by Judge Carmen E. Garza (bc) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Judge Carmen E. Garza :Sentencing held on 1/24/2007 for J.A.B. (1), 17 DAYS TIME SERVED. (Tape #FTR LCS.) (bc) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      Clerk's Minutes for Plea Hearing proceedings held before Judge Karen B. Molzen : as to J.A.B. held on 1/12/2007; Sentencing set for 1/24/2007 @ 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - Judge Leslie C. Smith Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (Tape #FTR LCS.) (bc) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        CJA 20 as to J.A.B.: Appointment of Attorney Howard L Anderson by Judge William P Lynch. (klg) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER OF DETENTION as to J.A.B. by Judge Karen B. Molzen. (klg) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO OTHER DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. NOTICE OF HEARING as to J.A.B. Preliminary Examination set for 1/12/2007 at 09:32 AM in Las Cruces - Judge Leslie C. Smith Courtroom before Karen B. Molzen. (vrd) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Judge Karen B. Molzen: Initial Appearance/Detention hrg as to J.A.B. held on 1/10/2007; atty Don Morrison standing in; deft detained as a flight risk; (Tape #FTR-LCS) (klg) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT as to J.A.B. (1). (klg) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 604 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?