USA v. Sams
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00126

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity DB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 2/12/2008
County Cook
Terminated 6/25/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 287.F
Offense Level 4
Count 11-12
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206C.F
Offense Level 4
Count 13
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2-10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 287.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag BROWN
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Leave to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Leave to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon:Defendant's agreed motion to continue surrender date from August 6, 2008 to September 8, 2008 [28] is granted. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (wyh, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Notice of Motion
            NOTICE of Motion by James I. Marcus for presentment of motion to continue[28] before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 7/29/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Marcus, James)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008, Terminated: 7/29/2008 Motion to Continue
              MOTION by Gregory B. Sams to continue Surrender Date (Marcus, James)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Judgment and Commitment Issued
                JUDGMENT and Commitment as to Gregory B. Sams issued to U.S. Marshal (las, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Sentencing
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory B. Sams: Sentencing hearing held. The government's motion to dismiss the remaining counts, 2 through 10, of the indictment is granted. Enter judgment. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (las, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Sentencing
                    JUDGMENT (Sentencing Order) as to Gregory B. Sams (1), Count(s) 1, 11-12, 13, The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 60 months as to count one. 18 months as to counts 11 and 12 to run consecutively with count one. 1 year as to count 13 to run concurrently with counts 11 and 12. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2 p.m. on 8/6/08. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 years as to count one; 1 year as to counts 11 and 12; and 1 year as to count 13 to run concurrently with count one. The defendant must pay the restitution of $571,331.00. Schedule of payments. Count(s) 2-10 are dismissed. Gregory B. Sams terminated. Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 6/25/08. Mailed notice (las, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of Service regarding sentencing memorandum[24] (Marcus, James)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Sentencing Memorandum
                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM as to Gregory B. Sams (Marcus, James)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Description not available
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon:On the court's own motion, sentencing set on June 25, 2008 at 1:00 p.m. is reset at 2:00 p.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (wyh, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Plea Agreement
                            PLEA Agreement as to Gregory B. Sams (las, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                              MINUTE entry before Judge Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory B. Sams: Change of plea hearing held. Defendant is present. Defendant advised of his rights. Defendant withdraws his plea of not guilty and enters a plea of guilty to counts one, eleven, twelve and thirteen of the indictment. A presentence investigation is ordered. The government shall submit its version of the offense to the probation office by 4/11/08. Sentencing is set on 6/25/08 at 1:00 p.m. Any objections to the presentence report shall be filed by 6/18/08 with a courtesy copy to chambers. Pretrial conference set on 4/10/08 and trial set on 5/5/08 are vacated. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (las, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 order on motion for notice of intentCourt Filing
                                MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon:Government's motion [19] for entry of defendant's change of plea and filing of the proposed plea agreement is entered and continued to 4/7/08 at 9:00 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (wyh, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 motion for notice of intent
                                  MOTION by USA for notice of intent as to Gregory B. Sams Government's Motion For Entry Of Defendant's Change Of Plea And Filing Of The Proposed Plea Agreement (King, Patrick)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory Sams: Status and motion hearings held. Defendant's motion for substitution of attorneys is granted[11]. If no plea agreement is reached, pretrial conference is reset on 4/10/08 at 1:30 p.m. Deadline for filing motions or to proffer a plea is set on 4/4/08. Trial on 5/5/08 stands. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (las, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Gregory B. Sams by James I. Marcus (Marcus, James)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory Sams: Defendant Sams' motion for substitution of attorneys and to continue trial date is entered and continued to 3/14/08 at 10:00 a.m. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (las, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                          AGREED ORDER as to Gregory B. Sams Signed by Judge Suzanne B. Conlon on 3/12/08. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (wyh, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE of Service regarding MOTION by Gregory B. Sams to substitute attorney & continue trial[11], notice of motion[12] (Marcus, James)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Notice of Motion
                                              NOTICE of Motion by James I. Marcus for presentment of motion to substitute attorney[11] before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 3/13/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Marcus, James)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                MOTION by Gregory B. Sams to substitute attorney & continue trial (Marcus, James)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 status hearingCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory B. Sams: Status hearing held. Defendant is present. Status hearing is continued to 3/14/08 at 10:00 a.m. If no plea agreement is reached, pretrial conference is set on 3/14/08 at 2:00 p.m. Deadline or filing motions or to proffer a plea is set on 3/14/08. Trial is set for 5/5/08 at 9:00 a.m. Notices mailed by judicial staff. (las, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Gregory B. Sams by Michael John Petro (Petro, Michael)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Bond
                                                      OWN recognizance Bond as to Gregory B. Sams in amount of $ 2500. (Redacted image) (las, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gregory B. Sams (1) own recognizance for $2500. (Redacted image) Signed by Judge Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/20/08. (las, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown as to Gregory Sams: Initial appearance proceedings held. Arraignment proceedings held. Defendant self surrenders on 2/20/08. Defendant informed of his rights. Defendant waives formal reading of indictment. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to each charge and all counts of the indictment. Status hearing before Judge Conlon is set for 2/28/08 at 9:00 a.m. On the government's motion and the defendant not objecting, the court finds that the time until the status hearing before the District Judge shall be excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(1) and U.S. v. Tibboel, 753 F.2d 608 (7th Cir. 1985). Government advises the court that early discovery will be provided to the defendant's counsel subject to the following protective order: social security numbers and dates of birth of any person identified will not be disclosed by defendant's counsel to any one, including the defendant. Defendant will not copy any tax returns, and all materials will be returned to the government at the conclusion of this case. Government and defendant agree on certain conditions of release. Enter order setting conditions of release. Defendant shall be released after processing. Mailed notice (las, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Suzanne B. Conlon as to Gregory B. Sams: Arraignment set on 2/20/08 is referred to magistrate judge. Status hearing is set on 2/28/08 at 9:00 a.m to set motion schedule and trial date. Government shall comply with Local Rule 16 by 2/28/08. Telephone notice (las, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 arrest2
                                                              SELF Surrender of defendant Gregory B. Sams (las, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Case Referred to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case as to Gregory B. Sams referred to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown. Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 for arraignment and/or detention hearing. (For Further Details See Order).(meg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 notice of arraignment
                                                                  NOTICE of Arraignment as to Gregory B. Sams before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 2/20/2008 at 9:00 A.M. (las, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Maria Valdezas to Gregory B. Sams : Notice to appear will be issued. The government will request issuance of a bench warrant if defendant fails to appear. Bond to be set at time of arraignment. (las, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 designation form
                                                                      DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (las, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Indictment
                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Gregory B. Sams (1) count(s) 1-10, 11-12, 13 (las, )
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?